Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/06/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | | |
04/06/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. MCCARTY - C224572 | | 11-10290
|
04/11/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 11-10686
|
04/12/2011 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 11-10867
|
05/09/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Volumes 1-49 (Via FTP). | | 11-13560
|
05/11/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Pre-Sentence Investigation (PSI) Report (SEALED). | | |
08/04/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 11-23484
|
08/05/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief due: November 2, 2011. | | 11-23584
|
11/02/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 11-33761
|
11/07/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: December 2, 2011. | | 11-34205
|
11/29/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 11-36627
|
12/02/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: January 31, 2012. | | 11-37062
|
01/30/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (90 days). | | 12-03255
|
02/13/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion In Part. Appelant shall have until April 2, 2012, to file and serve the opening brief. | | 12-04713
|
04/02/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of time to file Opening Brief. | | 12-10355
|
04/10/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 2, 2012. | | 12-11403
|
05/02/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion to transmit exhibits. | | 12-13853
|
05/02/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Page Limitation. | | 12-13862
|
05/02/2012 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 1. | | 12-13863
|
05/21/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions and Directing District Court Clerk to Transmit Exhibits. District Court Clerk: Supplemental Record due: 30 days. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on May 2, 2012. Respondent: Answering Brief due: 60 days. | | 12-16021
|
05/21/2012 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 12-16022
|
06/04/2012 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibit (original). State's Exhibits: 213; 214; 219; 221 and 248 also enclosed State's Proposed Exhibits: 208; 220; 223; 236; 247; 251 and 252. | | |
07/20/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time. | | 12-22919
|
07/27/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Answering brief due: October 18, 2012. | | 12-23829
|
10/17/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). | | 12-32993
|
10/29/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Answering Brief due: December 17, 2012. | | 12-34018
|
12/14/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time (Third Request - Answering Brief). | | 12-39711
|
12/21/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Answering Brief due: February 15, 2013. | | 12-40496
|
02/13/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time Fourth Request. (Answering Brief) | | 13-04585
|
02/15/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Answering Brief due: April 16, 2013. | | 13-04911
|
04/16/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief (Fifth Request). | | 13-11271
|
04/19/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent: Answering brief due: April 22, 2013. | | 13-11555
|
04/23/2013 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 13-11854
|
05/23/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (90 days). | | 13-15291
|
05/28/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record. District Court: Supplemental Record due: June 24, 2013. | | 13-15537
|
05/29/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Reply brief due: August 21, 2013. | | 13-15823
|
06/05/2013 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Supplemental Record on Appeal - Death Direct. Volumes 50-57(Via FTP) | | 13-16406
|
08/21/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | 13-24733
|
08/30/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until October 7, 2013, to file and serve the reply brief. | | 13-25735
|
10/07/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | 13-29891
|
10/11/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant: Reply Brief due: October 25, 2013. | | 13-30446
|
10/28/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of time to file Reply Brief. | | 13-32212
|
11/01/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have until November 4, 2013, to file the reply brief. | | 13-32874
|
11/01/2013 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargment of Page Limitation of Reply Brief. | | 13-32927
|
11/12/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court shall reject the reply brief received on November 1, 2013. Appellant: Reply brief due: 15 days. | | 13-33762
|
11/14/2013 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 13-34340
|
11/14/2013 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
12/31/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Statement Pursuant to NRS 177.267. | | 13-39669
|
01/17/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to Supplement Answering Brief. | | 14-01785
|
01/24/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the supplemental answering brief received via E-Flex on January 17, 2014. Appellant shall have 11 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental reply brief that is double-spaced and does not exceed 5 pages or 2,500 words and complies with the formatting requirements in NRAP 32(a) in all other respects. | | 14-02602
|
01/24/2014 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief. | | 14-02603
|
02/24/2014 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 14-05930
|
04/23/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled Tuesday, June 3, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limitied to 60 minutes. | | 14-13079
|
05/20/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 14-16370
|
06/03/2014 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
06/05/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Counsel to Request Transcripts. Appellant: 10 days to file a transcript request form (5/27/06, 5/30/06, and 6/07/06 proceedings). If these transcripts cannot be produced, counsel shall so inform this court. | | 14-18301
|
06/16/2014 | Motion | Filed Response to June 5, 2014 Order to Request Transcripts. | | 14-19780
|
07/02/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Supplement in Response to New Claim Raised in Reply Brief and at Oral Argument. | | 14-21705
|
07/30/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court is directed to file the document received via E-Flex on July 2, 2014. | | 14-24917
|
07/30/2014 | Motion | Filed Supplemental Response to New Claim Raised in Reply and at Oral Argument. | | 14-24919
|
08/04/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion to File Response to State's Supplemental Response Filed July 30,2014. | | 14-25456
|
08/15/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: 11 days to file a response that is no longer than 5 pages in length or its equivalent number of words. | | 14-26837
|
08/26/2014 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Brief. (In response to order issued on 8/15/2014). | | 14-28211
|
03/31/2016 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Parraguirre/Saitta. Douglas, J., concurring. Pickering, J., with whom Hardesty and Gibbons, JJ., agree, concurring in part and dissenting in part. 132 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 20. EN BANC | | 16-10013
|
04/18/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time. (Petition for Rehearing) | | 16-12034
|
04/20/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Petition for Rehearing due: May 2, 2016. | | 16-12335
|
05/02/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time Second Request (Petition for Rehearing). | | 16-13717
|
05/17/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the petition for rehearing received on May 10, 2016. | | 16-15414
|
05/17/2016 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. | | 16-15415
|
06/24/2016 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). PICKERING, J., with whom, HARDESTY, J., agrees, dissenting. | | 16-19789
|
06/29/2016 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Stay Remittitur. | | 16-20319
|
07/14/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Stay Remittitur. We hereby stay issuance of the remittitur until October 27, 2016. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by October 27, 2016, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by October 27, 2016, the remittitur shall issue forthwith. | | 16-21945
|
08/24/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to Publishers regarding corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 58101/67835/67519/65598/67786/65364 | | 16-26404
|
11/07/2016 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Original State's Exhibits 213, 214, 219, 221, 248 and Original State's Proposed Exhibits 208, 220, 223, 236, 247, 251, 252 | | 16-34650
|
11/07/2016 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
11/29/2016 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 16, 2016. | | 16-34650
|