Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/20/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
04/20/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 16-12338
|
04/20/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 16-12340
|
04/21/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Case Appeal Statement. Corrected case appeal statement due: 10 days. | | 16-12504
|
04/21/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Steven M. Burris, LLC. Check No. 09921. | | |
04/21/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. | | 16-12636
|
04/29/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Corrected Case Appeal Statement. | | 16-13538
|
05/02/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for Wed., May 11th @ 1:30 pm. | | 16-13694
|
05/11/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 16-14698
|
05/11/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement). | | 16-14702
|
05/16/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 16-15297
|
05/17/2016 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 16-15475
|
05/18/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | | 16-15631
|
05/19/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. | | 16-15831
|
05/20/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: No dates listed. To Court Reporter: Sara Richardson. | | 16-16020
|
05/20/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/10/16. To Court Reporter: Sara Richardson. | | 16-16032
|
06/08/2016 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sara Richardson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/10/16. | | 16-17823
|
08/12/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 29, 2016. | | 16-25145
|
08/29/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vols. 1-2. | | 16-26786
|
08/30/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 16-26938
|
09/20/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief October 13, 2016. | | 16-29145
|
10/13/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 16-31922
|
11/14/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 16-35264
|
11/14/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
12/02/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals. | | 16-37277
|
02/28/2017 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order. Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG. | | |
03/16/2017 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. | | |
03/16/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Review. | | 17-08851
|
04/07/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Strike Petition for Review. | | 17-11686
|
04/10/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Strike Petition for Review. | | 17-11725
|
04/10/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Strike Petition for Review. | | 17-11827
|
04/19/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to strike respondent's petition for review. We deny it. | | 17-12880
|
04/20/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Petition for Review. Answer due: 15 days. | | 17-13079
|
05/04/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Answer to Petition for Review. | | 17-14910
|
06/27/2017 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting Petition for Review and Directing Supplemental Briefing. Respondents' Supplemental Opening Brief due: 30 days. Appellant's Supplemental Answering Brief due: 30 days after appellant's brief is served. Respondents' Supplemental Reply Brief due: 15 days after respondent's brief is served. fn1[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] | | 17-21289
|
06/28/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. You are hereby notified that the undersigned, Mark Gibbons, Justice, is directly related to Michael Gibbons, Judge who presided over this appeal in the Court of Appeals. The Supreme Court has vacated the decision of the Court of Appeals and granted de novo review of the district court decision. The undersigned has no bias for or against any party to this appeal. The undersigned makes this disclosure, however, so that any party who believes it is appropriate to request recusal may do so. Any recusal request should be made in writing within seven (7) days of the filing date of this Voluntary Disclosure. | | 17-21421
|
07/26/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Opening Brief. | | 17-24820
|
08/25/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Brief. | | 17-28517
|
09/01/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents' Supplemental Reply Brief due: September 25, 2017. | | 17-29446
|
09/21/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Reply Brief. | | 17-32051
|
09/22/2017 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
12/27/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 17-44551
|
12/28/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, February 5, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 17-44827
|
01/22/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 18-02858
|
01/31/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument. Scott M. Mahoney, Esq. of the law firm of Fisher & Phillips, LLP participating in oral argument for respondents. | | 18-04303
|
02/05/2018 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
07/12/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Change of Law Firm (Jeffrey Galliher). | | 18-26674
|
09/13/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Pickeirng, J. Majority: Pickering/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 71. EN BANC | | 18-35747
|
10/09/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 18-39497
|
10/09/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
11/02/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 16, 2018. | | 18-39497
|