Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/27/2018 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. | | |
09/27/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 18-37959
|
09/27/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. (Second NOA) (Filed by appellant counsel Jonell Thomas/Special PD). | | 18-37962
|
10/30/2018 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volumes 1-16 (Via FTP). | | 18-42440
|
10/30/2018 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volumes 17-32 (Via FTP). | | 18-42441
|
11/01/2018 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Pages 338-340 (SEALED). | | |
11/01/2018 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (Supp. PSI) Pages 3871-3882 (SEALED). | | |
11/01/2018 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (PSI) Pages 3837-3848 (SEALED). | | |
11/15/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statment Criminal Appeals. (SC) | | 18-904482
|
02/27/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 19-08927
|
03/06/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief due: May 28, 2019. (SC). | | 19-10077
|
04/12/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Supplement Record on Appeal. (SC). | | 19-16133
|
05/23/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Supplement Record on Appeal and Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (2nd Request). (SC) | | 19-22490
|
07/11/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. District Court's (1) Jury List of the final venire panel with peremptory challenges marked; (2) 2. Notice of Motion and Motion to Correct the Record filed March 29, 2019, with exhibits attached; (3) Minute order of the district court granting the Motion to Correct the Record on April 9, 2019; (4) Court Exhibit #17 (State's Closing Powerpoint) admitted June 28, 2018; (5) Court Exhibit #18 (State's Closing Powerpoint (Penalty)) admitted July 6, 2018; and (6) State's Exhibit 51 (Crime Scene Photo Danielle at Scene) admitted June 5, 2018 due: 30 days. Appellant's Opening Brief due: 60 days. (SC). | | 19-29479
|
07/19/2019 | Motion | Filed Jury List of the Final Venire Panel. (STRICKEN AND RETURNED PER ORDER 11/7/19). (SC) | | |
07/19/2019 | Motion | Filed Notice of Motion and Motion to Correct the Record. (STRICKEN AND RETURNED PER ORDER 11/7/19). (SC) | | |
07/19/2019 | Motion | Filed District Court Minutes April 9, 2019. (STRICKEN AND RETURNED PER ORDER 11/7/19). (SC) | | |
08/14/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Clarify Order and Motion For Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (3rd Request) (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED AUGUST 15, 2019). (SC) | | |
08/15/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Appellant's Motion to Clarify Order and Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (3rd Request). (SC) | | 19-34367
|
08/15/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Clarify Order and Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (3rd Request). (SC) | | 19-34424
|
11/07/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. The clerk of this court shall strike and return to the district court the following exhibits filed on July 19, 2019: 1. Jury List of the final venire panel with peremptory challenges marked; 2. Notice of Motion and Motion to Correct the Record filed March 29, 2019, with exhibits attached; 3. Minute order of the district court granting the Motion to Correct the Record on April 9, 2019. The clerk of this court shall return exhibits 17, 18, and 51, received on July 19, 2019, unfiled. The clerk of the district court shall have 14 days from the date of this order to paginate, index, and add the exhibits to the district court record and to transmit them to this court as volume 33 of the record on appeal. Appellant shall have 45 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief. (SC) | | 19-45766
|
11/15/2019 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - VOL 33. (SC). | | 19-46962
|
11/20/2019 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal pages 7227-7232 (SEALED). (SC). | | |
11/20/2019 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal pages 7233-7244 (SEALED). (SC). | | |
12/18/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-51166
|
02/18/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC) | | 20-06470
|
03/05/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: April 20, 2020. (SC). | | 20-08789
|
04/20/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time Second Request. (SC). | | 20-14847
|
04/23/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until June 19, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 20-15395
|
06/16/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-22503
|
07/20/2020 | Other | Returned Unfiled Documents - Appellant's Motion to Stay Proceedings. (SC) | | 20-26471
|
07/30/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 20-27721
|
07/30/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Dismiss Counsel and Appointment of Alternate Counsel. (SC) | | 20-27828
|
07/30/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service - Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Dismiss Counsel and Appointment of Alternate Counsel. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-27830
|
08/05/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. Appellant's motion for a 60-day extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. Reply brief due: September 29, 2020. Appellant's motion for the discharge of his counsel and for the appointment of new appellate counsel is denied. (SC) | | 20-28795
|
08/10/2020 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. "Motion to Supplement the Argument for Record on Appeal". | | 20-29263
|
09/29/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-35688
|
02/10/2021 | Other | Justice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings. (SC). | | |
10/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, oral argument is scheduled for December 7, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 60 minutes. (SC) | | 21-28899
|
11/04/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice for Change of Attorneys for Appellant. (SC) | | 21-31694
|
11/18/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 21-33268
|
11/24/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 21-33772
|
12/07/2021 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day before the en banc court. Case submitted for decision. (SC) | | |
04/14/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the court En Banc. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver/Pickering. fn1 [The Honorable Douglas W. Herndon, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 25. En Banc. (SC). | | 22-11773
|
05/02/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) | | 22-13911
|
05/17/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). fn1[The Honorable Douglas W. Herndon, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] (SC) | | 22-15535
|
06/13/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-18713
|
06/13/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/24/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 15, 2022. (SC) | | 22-18713
|