Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/12/2019 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
03/12/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 19-10850
|
04/01/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time for Filing of Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 19-14115
|
04/11/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Susan Schofield stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/03/18, 12/04/18, 12/05/18, 12/06/18, 12/07/18, 12/10/18, 12/11/18, 12/13/18. (SC) | | 19-15966
|
04/17/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Docketing Statement due: 7 days. (SC). | | 19-16845
|
04/17/2019 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on March 8, 2019. Request for Transcript. (SC) | | 19-16957
|
04/26/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC) (STRICKEN PER 05/06/19 ORDER). | | |
04/26/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time for Filing of Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 19-18475
|
05/06/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Directing Appellant to File Proper Docketing Statement. The clerk of this court shall strike the docketing statement filed on April 26, 2019. Docketing Statement due: 7 days. (SC). | | 19-19763
|
05/13/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED MAY 13, 2019). (SC) | | |
05/13/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 19-20897
|
05/20/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC) | | 19-21933
|
07/26/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Due Date: 15 days. (SC) | | 19-31624
|
08/05/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Clarification for Due Date of Opening Brief and in the Alternative, Motion for Enlargement of Time. (SC) | | 19-32816
|
08/13/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have until September 17, 2019, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 19-33962
|
09/17/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) (REJECTED PER 10/10/19 ORDER). | | |
09/17/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix. (SC) (REJECTED PER 10/10/19 ORDER). | | |
09/17/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Exceed Page Limit or Type-Volume Limitation. (SC) | | 19-38808
|
10/10/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion in Part. Appellant has filed a motion for leave to file an opening brief in excess of 30 pages. The motion is denied. The clerk of this court shall reject the opening brief and appendix filed on September 17, 2019. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file a brief of no more than 60 pages and the appendix. (SC). | | 19-42003
|
10/25/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Amended Opening Brief (REJECTED PER PHONE CONVERSATION WITH JEANNIE HUA). (SC) | | |
10/25/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volumes 1-4. (SC) | | 19-44166
|
10/25/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volumes 5-6. (SC) | | 19-44167
|
10/25/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volumes 7-8. (SC) | | 19-44168
|
10/25/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume 9. (SC) | | 19-44169
|
10/25/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Amended Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER ORDER 11/5/19). (SC) | | |
10/25/2019 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Amended Opening Brief). (SC) | | 19-44171
|
11/05/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Rejecting Brief. The motion for an extension of time filed on October 25, 2019, is granted. Appellant's appendix and amended opening brief were filed on October 25, 2019. The clerk of this court shall reject the amended opening brief. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a brief that complies with the requirements of NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32 and that includes proof of service of the brief on respondent. (SC) | | 19-45386
|
11/06/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Amended Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-45632
|
12/06/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief). (SC) | | 19-49476
|
12/19/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: February 6, 2020. (SC). | | 19-51345
|
02/05/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-04991
|
02/05/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-04992
|
03/10/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-09519
|
03/10/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-09529
|
03/13/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's untimely motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. NRAP 31(b)(3). The reply brief was filed on March 10, 2020. (SC) | | 20-09966
|
03/13/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
06/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Remove Counsel Request to Receive Records and Documents. (SC). | | 20-23962
|
07/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to remove counsel and for the transfer of his records. The motion is denied. (SC) | | 20-25239
|
07/24/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Counsel/Transfer of Records. (SC) | | 20-27023
|
07/24/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Request for Court Records and Transcripts Points and Authorities. (SC) | | 20-27025
|
07/24/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service - Proper Person Appellants' Notice of Counsel/Transfer of Records and Proper Person Appellant's Request for Court Records and Transcripts Points and Authorities. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-27028
|
07/31/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. Appellant has filed a "Notice of Counsel/Transfer of Records" and a "Request for Court Records and Transcripts Points and Authorities," which this court construes as a motion for reconsideration. The motions are denied. (SC) | | 20-28058
|
08/12/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Response to Notice to Provide Proof of Service. (SC) | | 20-29827
|
08/19/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a "notice" in which he informs this court that counsel has given him a thumb drive containing his file, but that he is unable to access the contents because the prison does not permit use of electronics and has confiscated the thumb drive as contraband. While this court is concerned that the electronic format in this context is effectively not giving the client his file, the obligation to comply with the Rules of Professional Conduct is on counsel, and this court takes no action on the "notice" at this time. (SC). | | 20-30554
|
08/27/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Mailing. (SC) | | 20-31600
|
09/18/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP20-RP/JH/EC (SC) | | 20-34474
|
10/13/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-37471
|
10/13/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
11/05/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 10/15/2020. (SC) | | 20-37471
|