Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 80838
Short Caption:EGGLESTON VS. STUARTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):77168
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A748919Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/30/2021How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/23/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
03/23/2020Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)20-11121
03/23/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC)20-11123
04/08/2020Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Junes Legal Service, Inc. Check no. 11138. (SC)
04/08/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC)20-13319
04/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC).20-13688
04/27/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Vol. 1. (SC)20-15938
04/27/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Vol. 2. (SC)20-15941
04/27/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Vol. 3. (SC)20-15943
04/27/2020Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal - Vol. 4. (SC)20-15944
04/28/2020Transcript RequestFiled Proper Person Appellant's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC)20-15996
05/01/2020Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-16643
05/08/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)20-17589
05/08/2020Docketing StatementFiled Respondents' Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 5/11/20). (SC)
05/11/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Response to Docketing Statement - Exceeds Page Limit. (SC)20-17687
05/13/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Gina Villani stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/11/17, 9/24/19, 12/10/19. (SC)20-18207
05/14/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Pro Se Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss. (SC)20-18480
05/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service for Appellant's "Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss." Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-18486
05/15/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Reply to Appellant's Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss. (SC)20-18690
05/20/2020Docketing StatementFiled Respondents' Response to Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC)20-19123
06/04/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proof of Service (Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss). (SC)20-21089
06/10/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Dismiss. The motion to dismiss is denied. Respondents Georgina Stuart and Clark County, Nevada have filed a motion to dismiss this appeal in part. Appellant's motion to sanction respondents is also denied. (SC)20-21761
08/03/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief due: August 20. 2020. (SC)20-28115
09/11/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Appearance of Emily McFarling, Esq. (SC)20-33622
09/14/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-33723
09/15/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk shall add attorney Emily McFarling as counsel of record for appellant. If she requires the production of additional transcripts, Ms. McFarling shall have 7 days from the date of this order to serve and file a file-stamped transcript request form in this court. Opening Brief due: 40 days. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix is denied as moot. (SC)20-33860
09/22/2020Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/7/2018 and 10/29/2019 To Court Reporter: Gina Villani (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 9/23/2020) (SC)
09/23/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC)20-34975
09/24/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Disqualify Appellant's Attorney. (SC)20-35251
09/24/2020MotionFiled Exhibits to Disqualify Appellant's Attorney (Part 2-1) (SC)20-35253
09/24/2020MotionFiled Exhibits to Disqualify Appellant's Attorney (Part 2-2) (SC)20-35255
09/25/2020Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request (SC)20-35464
09/28/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Disqualify Appellant's Attorney. (SC)20-35620
09/28/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice NRAP 26.1 Disclosure (SC)20-35625
10/05/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Reply to Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Disqualify Appellant's Attorney. (SC)20-36541
10/26/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-39199
10/26/2020AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC)20-39200
11/20/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' answering brief due: December 9, 2020. (SC)20-42469
12/07/2020MotionFiled Respondents' Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)20-44222
01/08/2021BriefFiled Clark County and Georgina Stuart's Answering Brief. (SC)21-00609
01/12/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion and Regarding Answering Brief. Respondent Georgina Stuart and respondent Clark County's motion for an extension of time to file their answering brief is granted. NRAP 31(b)(3). The answering brief was filed on January 8, 2021. To date, the Callahans have not filed their answering brief or otherwise communicated with this court. Lisa and Brian Callahan shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve their answering brief. Appellant shall have 30 days from service of the Callahans' answering brief to file and serve his reply brief. (SC)21-00987
02/03/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondents Georgina Stuart and Clark County, Nevada, have filed a motion to disqualify appellant's attorney in this appeal. The motion is denied. (SC)21-03291
02/09/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)21-03948
02/10/2021Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
06/30/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC)21-18879
09/23/2021Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 51. SNP21-RP/LS/AS. (SC).21-27488
10/18/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).21-29858
10/18/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
11/04/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 20, 2021. (SC)21-29858