Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/06/2020 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
05/06/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 20-17154
|
05/11/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (SC) | | 20-17668
|
05/13/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes, (SEALED). (SC) | | |
05/15/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes (SEALED). (SC) | | |
05/19/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/14/18, 03/27/18, 03/29/18, 04/03/18, 07/19/18, 10/30/18, 11/08/18, 01/29/19, 02/05/19, 02/07/19, 05/07/19, 05/09/19, 05/13/19, 08/13/19, 10/01/19, 12/03/19, 12/17/19, 01/14/20, 02/25/20, 02/26/20, 02/27/20, 02/28/20, 03/02/20, 03/03/20, 04/23/20.To Court Reporter: Sharon Nichols, Norma Ramirez, Matt Yarbrough. Request for Certified Transcripts. (SC) | | 20-19090
|
05/20/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-19170
|
06/22/2020 | Motion | Filed Court Recorder Matthew Yarbrough's Errata to Affidavit & Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File the Requested Transcripts. (SC) | | 20-23150
|
06/25/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Court Reporter Matthew Yarbrough's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: July 20, 2020. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 2, 2020. (SC). | | 20-23640
|
07/22/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kristine Santi stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/14/18. (SC) | | 20-26721
|
07/23/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Matthew Yarbrough stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/19/18, 10/30/18, 11/08/18, 01/29/19, 02/05/19, 02/07/19, 05/07/19, 05/09/19, 08/13/19, 10/01/19, 12/03/19, 12/17/19, 01/14/20, 04/23/20, 2/25/20, 2/26/20, 2/27/20, 3/02/20, 3/03/20. (SC) | | 20-26888
|
09/24/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-35246
|
10/01/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 2, 2020. (SC). | | 20-35986
|
10/28/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to file Opening Brief due to Missing Sealed Transcript. (SC) | | 20-39563
|
11/06/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 6, 2021. (SC). | | 20-40711
|
01/06/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (Third Request). (SC) | | 21-00340
|
01/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motion. Appellant shall have until January 27, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-01389
|
01/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-02350
|
01/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-02351
|
01/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-02353
|
01/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4 (SC) | | 21-02355
|
01/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-02360
|
01/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 21-02361
|
01/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 21-02362
|
01/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 8. (SC) | | 21-02364
|
01/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Opening Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitation. (SC) | | 21-02378
|
01/26/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-02379
|
01/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 9. (SC) | | 21-02386
|
01/29/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for leave to file an opening brief in excess of the type-volume limitation is granted. The opening brief was filed on January 26, 2021. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-02845
|
02/22/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Supplement Opening Brief to Reference a Newly Discovered Bar Complaint Against Mitchell L. Posin That Was Pending During Both Young Hearings. (SC) | | 21-05233
|
02/25/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for John T. Niman. (SC) | | 21-05651
|
02/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-05652
|
02/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Supplement Opening Brief to Reference a Newly Discovered Bar Complaint Against Mitchell Posin that was Pending During Both Young Hearings. (SC) | | 21-05653
|
03/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Supplement Opening Brief to Reference a Newly Discovered Bar Complaint Against Mitchell L. Posin That Was Pending During Both Young Hearings. (SC) | | 21-05984
|
03/05/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a motion to supplement the opening brief. The motion is denied. Respondent shall have until April 30, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-06454
|
04/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-12405
|
05/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: June 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-13034
|
06/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time To File Answering Brief. (3rd Request). (SC) | | 21-15535
|
06/04/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent shall have until June 8, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-16088
|
06/04/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Leave to File Answering Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitations. (SC) | | 21-16110
|
06/04/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-16111
|
06/07/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Partial Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Answering Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitations. (SC) | | 21-16169
|
06/10/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent has filed a motion for leave to file an answering brief that exceeds the type-volume limitations of NRAP 32(a)(7)(A) by 10,147 words. Appellant opposes the motion in part. The motion is granted. The answering brief was filed on June 4, 2021. Appellant shall have until July 6, 2021, to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 21-16761
|
06/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-18727
|
06/30/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Reply Brief. Due date August 5, 2021. (SC) | | 21-18748
|
08/05/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-22705
|
08/10/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief With Excess Pages. (SC) | | 21-23231
|
08/10/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-23232
|
08/20/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant's motions requesting a second extension of time to file the reply brief and for leave to file a reply brief in excess of the type-volume limitation are granted. The reply brief was filed on August 10, 2021. (SC) | | 21-24358
|
08/20/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
11/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for December 16, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 21-31499
|
12/01/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 21-34249
|
12/14/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Oral Argument. Oral Argument in this matter is currently scheduled for December 16, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. in Carson City. Given the inclement weather in Carson City and health concerns related to the pandemic, counsel may appear in person in the Carson City or Las Vegas courtroom or by videoconference. At least one Justice will be in the Carson City and Las Vegas courtrooms. If counsel appears by videoconference, the court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. Counsel shall notify the clerk of court no later than 3:00 p.m. on December 14, 2021, if counsel intends to appear for oral argument by videoconference or in person and which courtroom. Counsel may notice the clerk of court by telephone at (775) 684-1600 or by email at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. (SC) | | 21-35577
|
12/16/2021 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. EC/KP/DH. (SC). | | |
04/07/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Cadish/Pickering/Herndon. Author: Cadish, J. Majority: Cadish/Pickering/Herndon.138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 23. NNP21-EC/KP/DH. (SC). | | 22-10815
|
05/02/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-13831
|
05/02/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
05/20/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 3, 2022. (SC) | | 22-13831
|
10/06/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Investigative Report. Investigative Report from the State Bar of Nevada re: attorney Mitchell Posin. Original report was placed in attorney's bar file. (SC). | | |
01/24/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Investigative Report. Investigative Report from the State Bar of Nevada re: attorney Mitchell Posin. Original report was placed in attorney's bar file. (SC). | | |
05/03/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Supplemental Investigative Report. Investigative Report from the State Bar of Nevada re: attorney Mitchell Posin. Original report was placed in attorney's bar file. | | |