Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/10/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
08/10/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-29265
|
08/10/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-29267
|
08/11/2020 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Brenoch R. Wirthlin. (SC) | | |
08/11/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 20-29638
|
08/13/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld. (SC). | | 20-29958
|
09/01/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Docketing Statement Due: September 15, 2020. (SC) | | 20-32296
|
09/04/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 20, 2020, at 9:00 AM via Zoom. (SC) | | 20-32773
|
09/09/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 20-33277
|
09/15/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-33976
|
09/16/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Motion of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 20-34163
|
09/22/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to Response in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 20-34826
|
10/09/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a motion requesting this court to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant has opposed the motion. The motion is denied. (SC) | | 20-37109
|
10/16/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 20, 2021, at 9:00 am. (SC). | | 20-38138
|
01/21/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The January 20, 2021 settlement conference was vacated at the request of the parties' counsel with their further request that the conference be rescheduled for a date following the Court's resolution of a writ of mandate proceeding in case no. 81220. The Settlement Judge recommends to the Court that this matter should be extended for an additional 90 days. (SC) | | 21-01755
|
01/22/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to May 10, 2021. (SC) | | 21-01982
|
06/07/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-16208
|
06/07/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice That No Settlement Has Been Reached In This Matter. (SC) | | 21-16235
|
06/08/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. In light of the undersigned's having become aware of appellant's counsel's filing that no settlement has been reached in this matter, it now appears that, while diligently discussing the same, the parties have not as yet reached a final settlement of this matter. It is recommended that this matter should remain in the Court's settlement program, and the time for filing a final report should be extended for an additional 30 days. (SC). | | 21-16300
|
06/10/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On June 8, 2021, the settlement judge filed a status report recommending that this matter remain assigned to the settlement program for an additional amount of time beyond the time allowed by NRAP 16(f)(2). The settlement judge's recommendation is approved. Accordingly, the settlement judge shall file the Final Settlement Program Status Report by July 8, 2021. (SC) | | 21-16658
|
07/08/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement judge requests a 30 day extension to file the final report. (SC) | | 21-19617
|
07/15/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to August 9, 2021. (SC) | | 21-20417
|
07/19/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. A resumed telephonic Settlement Conference in this matter has been set, by agreement during today's telephonic Settlement Conference, for August 6, 2021, at 8:15 AM - following and in light of a hearing and an anticipated decision by the District Court on August 5, 2021. (SC) | | 21-20744
|
08/06/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-22946
|
08/10/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-23203
|
08/20/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended. (SC) | | 21-24317
|
08/24/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/30/20, 6/1/21, and 8/5/21. To Court Reporter: Brittany Amoroso and Melissa Burgener. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 8/24/21) (SC) | | |
08/24/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-24707
|
08/27/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/30/20, 6/1/21, and 8/5/21. To Court Reporter: Brittany Amoroso and Melissa Burgener. (SC) | | 21-25074
|
09/02/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jessica Kirkpatrick stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/30/20. (SC) | | 21-25622
|
09/02/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Melissa Burgener stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/1/21 and 8/5/21. (SC) | | 21-25623
|
09/13/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's response to order to show cause due: October 4, 2021. (SC) | | 21-26423
|
10/04/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 21-28452
|
10/12/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (SC) | | 21-29300
|
11/10/2021 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDERS this appeal DISMISSED." SNP21-EC/KP/DH (SC) | | 21-32296
|
12/07/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 21-34844
|
12/07/2021 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
01/04/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 8, 2021. (SC) | | 21-34844
|