Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/14/2020 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
08/14/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-30041
|
08/24/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Limited Remand for Designation of Counsel. District Court Order due: 35 days. (SC) | | 20-31145
|
08/27/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in the district court on August 27, 2020. This matter of appointment of counsel is hereby referred to the Appointed Counsel Administrator, Krista M. Meier, Esq. (SC) | | 20-31745
|
09/01/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on 08/31/20 appointing Thomas Lloyd Qualls, as counsel for appellant. (SC) | | 20-32183
|
09/09/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Setting Briefing Schedule. The clerk of this court shall add attorney Thomas L. Qualls as counsel for appellant. Appellant shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form and a docketing statement. Appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-33196
|
09/30/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC) | | 20-35829
|
09/30/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/24/20, 02/25/20, 02/26/20, 02/27/20, 02/28/20 and 03/02/20. To Court Reporter: Cori Wolden, Susan Kiger, Julie Kernan, Lori Urmston, Debora Cecere and Erin Ferretto. (SC) | | 20-35884
|
12/22/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-46166
|
12/22/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: February 8, 2021. (SC) | | 20-46186
|
02/05/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-03536
|
02/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until March 25, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-04244
|
03/03/2021 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter Re: Transcripts (Debora L. Cecere, Court Reporter). (SC) | | 21-06246
|
03/09/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lori Urmston stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/27/20. (SC) | | 21-06876
|
03/09/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Debora L. Cecere stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/28/20. (SC) | | 21-06879
|
03/17/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Erin T. Ferretto stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/02/20. (SC) | | 21-07698
|
03/17/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Corrie L. Wolden stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/24/20. (SC) | | 21-07701
|
03/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-08509
|
04/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Due to Employment with State of Nevada. (SC) | | 21-09401
|
04/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw and Remanding to Secure Appellate Counsel. Appellant's appointed counsel, Thomas L. Qualls, has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for appellant. The motion is granted. The clerk shall remove Mr. Qualls as counsel of record for appellant. This appeal is remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. Order appointing counsel due: 35 days. Briefing is suspended. fn1 [Given this order, this court takes no action on the pending motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief.] (SC) | | 21-09891
|
04/13/2021 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. The matter of appointment of replacement counsel is likewise referred to the Appointed Counsel Administrator, Krista M. Meier, Esq. Filed in district court on 4/12/21. (SC) | | 21-10595
|
05/07/2021 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on May 4, 2021 appointing Victoria T. Oldenburg as counsel for appellant. (SC) | | 21-13161
|
05/11/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. The clerk shall add Victoria T. Oldenburg as counsel of record for appellant. Appellant: Transcript Request Form due: 7 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. (SC) | | 21-13508
|
05/17/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/20/19 To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation Services. (SC) | | 21-14094
|
05/17/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/10/20, 2/21/20 To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation Services. (SC) | | 21-14095
|
05/17/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/4/19, 2/24/20, and 8/3/20. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Litigation Services. (SC) | | 21-14096
|
05/17/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Susan Kiger stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/25/20. (SC) | | 21-14196
|
05/24/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Julie Ann Kernan stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/26/20. (SC) | | 21-14761
|
07/02/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Carol Hummel stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/20/19. (SC) | | 21-19143
|
07/02/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Susan Kiger stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/10/20 and 02/21/20. (SC) | | 21-19144
|
07/02/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Corrie L. Wolden stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/04/19. (SC) | | 21-19145
|
07/14/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Corrie L. Wolden stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/04/19. (SC) | | 21-20250
|
07/14/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Carol Hummel stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/20/19. (SC) | | 21-20251
|
07/14/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Corrie L. Wolden stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/24/20. (SC) | | 21-20253
|
07/14/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Susan Kiger stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/10/20 and 02/21/20. (SC) | | 21-20254
|
08/09/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: August 23, 2021. (SC) | | 21-23053
|
08/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time (Opening Brief). (SC) | | 21-24274
|
08/23/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: September 22, 2021. (SC) | | 21-24496
|
09/22/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-27387
|
09/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC) | | 21-27388
|
09/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. (SC) | | 21-27389
|
09/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. (SC) | | 21-27390
|
09/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. (SC) | | 21-27392
|
09/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 5. (SC) | | 21-27393
|
09/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 6. (SC) | | 21-27395
|
09/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 7. (SC) | | 21-27397
|
09/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 8. (SC) | | 21-27398
|
09/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. (SC) | | 21-27409
|
10/22/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Kevin Naughton, Appellate Deputy, and hereby gives notice of appearance as counsel for Respondent. (SC) | | 21-30599
|
10/22/2021 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-30600
|
10/22/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-30601
|
11/22/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of No Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-33514
|
11/22/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
12/14/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-35496
|
12/14/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
02/24/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
03/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
03/21/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Original Exhibits 1 and 137 returned to 2nd Judicial District Court. (SC) | | 22-08748
|
03/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/11/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 22, 2022. (SC) | | 22-08748
|