Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/20/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
08/20/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-30742
|
08/20/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-30744
|
08/20/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-30746
|
08/28/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Atkinson Watkins & Hoffmann. Check no. 11634. (SC) | | |
08/28/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-31787
|
08/28/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 08/31/20). (SC) | | |
08/31/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance. (Justin L. Watkins). (SC) | | 20-31955
|
08/31/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley. (SC) | | 20-32013
|
08/31/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Matthew W. Hoffmann and E. Breen Arntz as counsel for appellants). (SC) | | 20-32086
|
08/31/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 20-32087
|
09/25/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC). | | 20-35477
|
09/30/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for TBA. (SC). | | 20-35894
|
10/09/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 10/12/20). (SC) | | |
10/12/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-37302
|
10/16/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-38150
|
10/16/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-38159
|
10/26/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants' unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement is granted. The docketing statement was filed on October 16, 2020. (SC) | | 20-39160
|
12/17/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 20-45711
|
12/22/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-46216
|
01/04/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Timothy A. Wiseman and Brian A. Morris of Morris Law Center will appear as co-counsel of record). (SC) | | 21-00111
|
01/07/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: January 19, 2021. (SC) | | 21-00369
|
01/19/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC) | | 21-01585
|
02/05/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/27/2020, 01/28/2020, 01/29/2020, 01/30/2020, 02/03/2020, 02/04/2020, 02/05/2020, 02/06/2020, 02/07/2020, 02/10/2020, 02/11/2020, 02/12/2020, 02/13/2020, 06/11/2020. To Court Reporter: Bill Nelson, Robert Cangemi, Dana Tavaglione. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 02/05/21) (SC) | | |
02/05/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-03614
|
02/10/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/27/20, 1/28/20, 1/29/20, 1/30/20, 2/3/20, 2/4/20, 2/5/20, 2/6/20, 2/7/20, 2/10/20, 2/11/20, 2/12/20, 2/13/20, and 6/11/20. (SC) | | 21-04052
|
03/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-07991
|
03/19/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellants' opening brief and appendix due: April 21, 2021. (SC) | | 21-08039
|
04/20/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Substitution of Attorneys from Brian A Morris and Timothy A. Wiseman, of Morris Law to E. Breen Arntz of Breen Arntz, Chtd. (SC) | | 21-11460
|
04/21/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC) | | 21-11490
|
04/30/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Disapproving Substitution of Counsel and Granting Extension Motion. Appellants shall have until June 21, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-12470
|
05/18/2021 | Motion | Filed Attorneys Timothy A. Wiseman and Brian A. Morris of respectfully request permission to withdraw as counsel for appellants. (SC) | | 21-14293
|
05/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. The motion of Brian A. Morris and Timothy A. Wiseman to withdraw as counsel for appellants is granted. The clerk shall remove Mr. Morris and Mr. Wiseman as counsel of record for appellants. (SC) | | 21-14912
|
06/21/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Third Request). (SC) | | 21-17794
|
07/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 21, 2021. (SC) | | 21-20622
|
07/21/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-21106
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume I. (SC) | | 21-21107
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume II. (SC) | | 21-21108
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume III. (SC) | | 21-21109
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume IV. (SC) | | 21-21110
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume V. (SC) | | 21-21111
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume VI. (SC) | | 21-21112
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume VII. (SC) | | 21-21113
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume VIII. (SC) | | 21-21114
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume IX. (SC) | | 21-21115
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume X. (SC) | | 21-21116
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume XI. (SC) | | 21-21117
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume XII. (SC) | | 21-21119
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume XIII. (SC) | | 21-21120
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume XIV. (SC) | | 21-21121
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume XV. (SC) | | 21-21122
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume XVI. (SC) | | 21-21123
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume XVII. (SC) | | 21-21124
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume XVIII. (SC) | | 21-21125
|
07/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume XIX. (SC) | | 21-21126
|
08/20/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent Terry Bartmus shall have until September 3, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-24324
|
08/20/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent Jason Lasry, M.D. shall have until September 3, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-24325
|
08/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Brief. (SC) | | 21-24646
|
08/27/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Disapproving Stipulation. The parties have filed a stipulation for a second extension of time for respondents to file their answering briefs. The stipulation is disapproved. The answering briefs remain due to be filed by September 3, 2021. (SC) | | 21-25005
|
08/27/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Terry Bartmus, RN, APRN). (SC) | | 21-25078
|
08/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent, Jason Lasry, M.D.'s Joinder to Terry Bartmus, RN, APRN's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 08/31/21). (SC) | | |
08/31/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance (Heather S. Hall). (SC) | | 21-25445
|
08/31/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent, Jason Lasry, M.D.'s Joinder to Terry Bartmus, RN APRN's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-25450
|
09/03/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion and Joinder. Respondent Terry Bartmus has filed a motion for a second extension of time to file the answering brief. Respondent Jason Lasry, M.D, has filed a joinder to the motion. The motion and joinder are denied. Bartmus and Lasry shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve their answering briefs. (SC) | | 21-25744
|
09/10/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief (Terry Bartmus, RN, APRN). (SC) | | 21-26271
|
09/10/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent, Jason Lasry, M.D.'s Joinder to Respondent Terry Bartmus, RN, APRN's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-26300
|
10/11/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-29182
|
10/12/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
11/16/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-32903
|
11/16/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
03/16/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
04/11/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
04/11/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-11251
|
04/11/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/29/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 12, 2022. (SC) | | 22-11251
|