Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/09/2020 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
11/09/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-40872
|
11/24/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 11/04/20. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. (SC). | | 20-42755
|
11/25/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days.
Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. (SC) | | 20-42962
|
12/07/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Entry of Findings of Fact. Conclusions of Law and Order. (SC) | | 20-44326
|
12/08/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Ex Parte Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Request for Evidentiary Hearing and to File Opening Brief for Appeal. (SC) | | 20-44588
|
12/15/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. A818971. Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-45414
|
12/15/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (C-18-329699-1)Via FTP. Vols. 1-9. (SC) | | 20-45457
|
12/21/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (C329699) - SEALED Pages 1-26, 1916-1917, 1923-1929, and 1930-1931; Pages 419-429 (PSI Report). (SC) | | |
12/31/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for appointment of counsel, request for an evidentiary hearing, and to file opening brief for appeal. The motion is denied. The opening brief or informal brief is due by March 25, 2021. (SC) | | 20-47048
|
03/02/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Jean J. Schwartzer. (SC) | | 21-06124
|
03/10/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. As appellant is now represented by counsel, this court sets the following deadlines for filing documents. Docketing statement and transcript request form due: 14 days. Opening brief due: 90 days. (SC) | | 21-06930
|
03/24/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-08481
|
03/24/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-08482
|
06/08/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-16464
|
06/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: July 23, 2021. (SC) | | 21-17159
|
07/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (Second Request)(SC) | | 21-21367
|
08/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: August 23, 2021. (SC) | | 21-22880
|
08/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-24611
|
08/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. (Fourth)(SC) | | 21-24937
|
08/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief (Fifth). (SC) | | 21-25274
|
09/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-25560
|
09/02/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED 9/3/21) (SC) | | |
09/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-25671
|
09/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-25672
|
09/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-25673
|
09/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 21-25674
|
09/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-25675
|
09/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 21-25676
|
09/02/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 21-25677
|
09/03/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due. (SC) | | 21-25692
|
09/06/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-25802
|
09/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant's motions requesting third, fourth, fifth, and sixth extensions of time to file the opening brief are granted. NRAP 31(b)(3)(B). The appendix was filed on September 2, 2021, and the opening brief was filed on September 6, 2021. Respondent shall have until October 7, 2021, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 21-25990
|
10/06/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Karen Mishler. (SC) | | 21-28706
|
10/06/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-28707
|
11/05/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to file Reply. (SC) | | 21-31975
|
11/08/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Reply Brief. Due December 6th, 2021. (SC) | | 21-32011
|
12/06/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-34789
|
12/08/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-35057
|
12/20/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion requesting a second extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief was filed on December 8, 2021. (SC) | | 21-36180
|
12/20/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
01/20/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-02093
|
01/20/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
03/04/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
06/06/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
06/07/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Petition for Review due: June 20, 2022. (SC) | | 22-18018
|
06/20/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-19495
|
07/06/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Petition for Review. Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-21171
|
07/14/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Answer to Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-22264
|
08/04/2022 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." EN BANC (SC) | | 22-24411
|
08/04/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-24413
|
08/04/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
09/06/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 5, 2022. (SC) | | 22-24413
|