Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/22/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
12/22/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
12/22/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-46209
|
12/22/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-46211
|
12/30/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Order Following Objection. (SC) | | |
01/01/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Alex B. Ghibaudo. (SC) | | |
01/04/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Cory Reade Dows and Shafer. Check no. 16719. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | |
01/04/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (SEALED) (SC) | | |
01/04/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statements mailed to counsel for appellant/cross-respondent and respondent/cross-appellant - due: 21 days. (SC | | 21-00035
|
01/07/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC) | | 21-00427
|
01/07/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Appellant/Cross-Respondent to File Case Appeal Statement. Due: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-00438
|
01/14/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-01303
|
01/21/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 2, 2021, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 21-01831
|
01/25/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-02320
|
01/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-02326
|
02/10/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-04055
|
02/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement is granted. The docketing statement was filed on February 10, 2021. (SC) | | 21-04468
|
02/24/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/03/2021. (SC) | | 21-05452
|
02/26/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 10, 2021, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 21-05827
|
02/26/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Amended Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 12, 2021, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 21-05853
|
03/12/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC). | | 21-07296
|
03/18/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated For Appeal and Cross-Appeal. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s) and Respondent(s): 14 days transcript request; Appellant(s): 90 days opening brief and appendix. Respondent(s): 30 days from opening brief to file combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant(s): 30 days from that combined brief to file combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondent(s): 14 days from that combined brief to file reply brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 21-07787
|
03/30/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. The parties shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Briefing is suspended. (SC) | | 21-09122
|
03/31/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/8/19. To Court Reporter: Kathleen Prock. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 3/31/21) (SC) | | |
03/31/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/8/19. To Court Reporter: Kathleen Prock. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 3/31/21) (SC) | | |
03/31/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-09313
|
03/31/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/8/19. To Court Reporter: Kathleen Prock. (SC) | | 21-09338
|
04/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 21-12326
|
04/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 21-12360
|
05/14/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. It appears that this court does have jurisdiction and this appeal and cross-appeal may proceed. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to serve and file in this court, a file-stamped transcript request form. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 28.1(f)(1). (SC) | | 21-14043
|
05/21/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time To File A Transcript Request Form. (SC) | | 21-14724
|
05/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Tara Kellogg's Response in Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Transcript Request Form. (SC) | | 21-14862
|
05/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to serve and file, in this court, a file-stamped transcript request form. (SC) | | 21-15428
|
06/07/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/17/20 and 09/24/20. To Court Reporter: Kathleen Prock. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 06/08/21). (SC) | | |
06/08/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC) | | 21-16337
|
06/14/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/8/19. (SC) | | 21-17094
|
06/21/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time To File A Transcript Request Form. (SC) | | 21-17828
|
06/24/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/02/21. (SC) | | 21-18233
|
07/06/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 7 days from the date of this order to serve and file, in this court, a file-stamped transcript request form. (SC) | | 21-19242
|
07/13/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/17/20. To Court Reporter: Verbatim Reporting and Transcription. (SC) | | 21-20184
|
08/10/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/cross-respondent's opening brief and appendix due: August 26, 2021. (SC) | | 21-23214
|
08/10/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Respondent/Cross-Appellant Tara Kellogg Pursuant to N.R.A.P. 46. (SC) | | 21-23288
|
08/13/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. Cause appearing, the motion of R. Christopher Reade to withdraw as counsel for respondent/cross-appellant is granted. The clerk shall remove Mr. Reade as counsel of record for respondent/cross-appellant. Respondent/cross-appellant's notice of appearance due: 30 days. (SC) | | 21-23630
|
08/26/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/30/21. (SC) | | 21-24882
|
08/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-24940
|
08/30/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/17/20. (SC) | | 21-25206
|
08/31/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Jonathan K. Nelson. (SC) | | 21-25320
|
08/31/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have until September 10, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-25365
|
09/10/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-26329
|
09/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 9/13/21)(SC) | | |
09/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 9/13/21)(SC) | | |
09/13/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-26337
|
09/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Amended Appendix - Volume I. (SC) | | 21-27195
|
09/20/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Amended Appendix - Volume II. (SC) | | 21-27196
|
10/14/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent-cross appellant's answering brief due: November 3, 2021. (SC) | | 21-29528
|
11/03/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Opening Brief/Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-31682
|
11/03/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-31683
|
12/02/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant/cross-respondent's combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal due: December 17, 2021. (SC) | | 21-34412
|
12/17/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-36124
|
12/23/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent/cross-appellant's reply brief due: January 18, 2022. (SC) | | 21-36655
|
01/18/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 22-01801
|
01/18/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix to Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-01802
|
01/19/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
01/31/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-03080
|
01/31/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
04/21/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
08/08/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
08/08/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have until August 22, 2022, to file and serve a petition for review. (SC) | | 22-24765
|
08/22/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-26229
|
09/07/2022 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." EN BANC (SC) | | 22-27952
|
09/07/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-27953
|
09/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
09/22/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 13, 2022. (SC) | | 22-27953
|