Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/27/2022 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Due. (SC) | | |
05/27/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed SEALED Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | |
05/27/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 22-16913
|
06/02/2022 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Evan D. Schwab. (SC) | | |
06/02/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 22-17520
|
06/07/2022 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (SC) | | 22-18028
|
06/17/2022 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC) | | 22-19191
|
06/17/2022 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 22-19251
|
06/23/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's docketing statement due: July 7, 2022. (SC) | | 22-20013
|
07/01/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: July 15, 2022. (SC) | | 22-20831
|
07/07/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 22-21476
|
07/08/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Certification. The clerk of the Nevada Supreme Court certifies to the Honorable Aaron D. Ford, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, that on July 7, 2022, filed with the Supreme Court a notice that this appeal draws into question the constitutionality of NRS 125.110 and EDCR 5.210. See NRAP 44. (SC) | | 22-21540
|
07/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC) | | 22-21645
|
07/09/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent's Response to Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 22-21646
|
07/15/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 22-22421
|
07/19/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until August 1, 2022, to file and serve an opposition to the motion to dismiss filed on July 9, 2022. (SC) | | 22-22593
|
08/01/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.(SC) | | 22-24123
|
08/02/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave to Amend Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 22-24124
|
08/03/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Response to Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 22-24389
|
08/03/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Docketing Statement and Countermotion for Sanctions Against Mr. Schwab. (SC) | | 22-24391
|
08/03/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Amended Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Docketing Statement and Countermotion for Sanctions Against Mr. Schwab. (SC) | | 22-24392
|
08/10/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply in support of the motion for leave to amend docketing statement and opposition to the countermotion for sanctions against Mr. Schwab due: August 24, 2022. (SC) | | 22-25042
|
08/24/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to Motion for Leave to Amend Docketing Statement & Response to Counter-Motion for Sanctions Against Mr. Schwab. (SC) | | 22-26508
|
09/15/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 29, 2022. (SC) | | 22-28873
|
09/29/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-30828
|
09/30/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-30829
|
10/06/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The motion to dismiss is denied at this time. The motion for leave to file an amended docketing statement and the motion for sanctions are also denied. fn2[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in this matter under a general order of assignment.] (SC) | | 22-31530
|
10/14/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: November 14, 2022. (SC) | | 22-32393
|
11/15/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Volume I. (SC) | | 22-35792
|
11/15/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Amended Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-35794
|
11/15/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Volume III. (SC) | | 22-35795
|
11/15/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief and Appendix No Later than November 15, 2022. (SC) | | 22-35796
|
11/15/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER 11/16/22 ORDER). (SC) | | |
11/15/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Volume II. (SC) | | 22-35801
|
11/16/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The amended answering brief and appendix were filed on November 15, 2022. The clerk shall reject the answering brief filed on November 15, 2022. Appellant shall have until December 15, 2022, to file and serve any reply brief. (SC) | | 22-36010
|
12/14/2022 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Continue Reply Brief Deadline. (REJECTED FILED IN WRONG CASE)(SC) | | |
12/15/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: December 29, 2022. (SC) | | 22-39324
|
12/29/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC). | | 22-40917
|
12/30/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC). | | |
01/05/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Strike Appellant's Reply Brief and Disregard the Arguments Therein and for Attorney's Fees, Costs, and Sanctions Imposed on Appellant and/or Her Attorney. (SC). | | 23-00268
|
01/12/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opposition to motion to strike due: January 26, 2023. (SC) | | 23-01043
|
01/26/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Respondent's Motion to Strike Appellant's Reply Brief and Disregard the Argument Therein and for Attorney's Fees, Costs, and Sanctions Imposed on Appellant and/or Her Attorney. (SC). | | 23-02633
|
02/13/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent's motion to strike appellant's reply brief, disregard arguments therein, and for attorney fees, costs, and sanctions is denied at this time. (SC) | | 23-04317
|
02/24/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 23-05683
|
02/24/2023 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
03/22/2024 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." COA-MG/BB/DW (SC) | | |
04/16/2024 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals.(SC) | | |
04/16/2024 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur.(SC) | | 24-13189
|
04/16/2024 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) | | |
04/23/2024 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 4/17/24. (SC) | | 24-13189
|