Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/08/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
07/08/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-25101
|
07/08/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-25103
|
07/10/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Edward J. Lemons and Alice Campos Mercado). (SC) | | 20-25567
|
07/14/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellants' Copy of District Court Orders. (SC) | | 20-25915
|
07/15/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC). | | 20-26035
|
07/23/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Enter Written Judgment or Order. District Court Order due: 30 days. (SC). | | 20-26887
|
07/29/2020 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Appellants' "No transcript Request Certification and Docketing Statement and Appellants' No Transcript Request Certification." (SC) | | 20-27548
|
07/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellants' Response to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC) | | 20-27550
|
07/31/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Joinder in Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC) | | 20-28051
|
08/05/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC) | | 20-28580
|
08/05/2020 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Order Granting Motion to Proceed Informa Pauperis. (SC) | | 20-28802
|
08/06/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Waiving Filing Fee. (SC) | | 20-28971
|
08/06/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines.(SC) | | 20-29020
|
08/14/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellants' Response to Respondent Mark McCallister's Joinder in Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC) | | 20-30179
|
08/27/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss and Directing Transmission of Record. The clerk of this court shall add Mark McCallister, M.D. as a respondent to the caption on this appeal to conform to the caption on this order and shall add attorneys Edward J. Lemons and Alice Campos Mercado and the law firm of Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg as counsel on the docket. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC) | | 20-31657
|
09/03/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal CV2000422 (VOL 1) (SC) | | 20-32514
|
09/03/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal CV2000422 (VOL 2) (SC) | | 20-32515
|
09/03/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal CV2000422 (VOL 3) (SC) | | 20-32516
|
09/09/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (SEALED Vol 4) (SC) | | |
10/20/2020 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Informal Brief. (SC) | | 20-38437
|
12/11/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision/To Screening. (SC) | | |
12/31/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 20-47065
|
12/31/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
12/31/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
01/07/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. The clerk of this court is directed to transmit a copy of this order and the attached district court order and case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. Appellants' Notices of Appearance or LACSN's Notice due: 60 days. (COA) | | 21-00407
|
03/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Notice of Determination of Eligibility for Pro Bono Representation. (COA) | | 21-06791
|
03/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The Legal Aid Center and appointed counsel shall have until March 16, 2021, to file the notice designating counsel and the notice of appearance. | | 21-07377
|
03/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File a Notice of Appearance. (COA) | | 21-07544
|
03/16/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Notice of Appearance for Don Springmeyer. (COA) | | 21-07559
|
03/18/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Attorney Don Springmeyer of Kemp Jones, LLP, has filed a statement of legal aid representation indicating that he will be appearing as appellants' pro bono counsel. Transcript request form due: 14 days. Opening brief due: 90 days. fn1 [The Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada, Inc.'s motion for an extension of time is denied as moot.] (COA) | | 21-07782
|
03/30/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellants' Certificate of No Transcript Request. (COA) | | 21-09264
|
06/07/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellants' Certificate of No Transcript Request. (COA) | | 21-16265
|
06/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time for Appellants to File Their Opening Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 21-17200
|
06/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief due: August 16, 2021. (COA) | | 21-17776
|
08/16/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (COA) | | 21-23898
|
09/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief. (COA) | | 21-25530
|
09/01/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date October 15, 2021. (COA) | | 21-25548
|
10/11/2021 | Motion | Filed Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief. (COA) | | 21-29036
|
10/14/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Mark McAllister, M.D.'s Answering Brief. (COA) | | 21-29596
|
10/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Joint Appendix. Vol. 1. (COA) | | 21-29598
|
10/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondents St. Mary's Regional Medical Center, Tammy Evans, Prem Reddy, M.D., Tanzeel Islam, M.D., and Sridevi Challapalli, M.D.'s Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-29677
|
10/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court takes no action in regard to the parties' second stipulation filed on October 11, 2021. Appellants shall have until November 15, 2021, to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. (COA) | | 21-30345
|
11/10/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants shall have until November 29, 2021, to file and serve the reply brief. (COA) | | 21-32405
|
11/29/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Notice to the Clerk of the Supreme Court Pursuant to NRAP Rule 44. (COA) | | 21-33940
|
11/29/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (COA) | | 21-33943
|
11/29/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant' Amended Reply Brief. (COA) | | 21-33960
|
11/30/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (COA) | | |
12/01/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Certification of Constitutional Issue Pursuant to NRAP 44. The clerk of this court certifies to the Honorable Aaron D. Ford, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, that on November 29, 2021, appellants filed with this court a notice that this appeal draws into question the constitutionality of NRS 41A.071. See NRAP 44. (COA) | | 21-34234
|
12/23/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Appellants shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental brief. Respondents shall have 21 days from filing of the supplemental opening brief to file and serve a supplemental answering brief. Appellants shall have 14 days from filing of the supplemental answering brief(s) to file and serve any supplemental reply brief. The supplemental briefs shall comply with the type volume limitations in NRAP 32(a)(7)(A). (COA) | | 21-36593
|
01/13/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Supplemental Opening Brief. (COA) | | 22-01379
|
01/26/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on March 29, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Oral argument will be held by videoconference. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. On or before March 4, 2022, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the landline and cellular phone numbers and email address of that attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test the capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (COA) | | 22-02647
|
02/03/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's (Mark McCallister, M.D.) Supplemental Answering Brief. (COA) | | 22-03702
|
02/03/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Supplemental Answering Brief. (COA) | | 22-03739
|
03/03/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' (Sridevi Challapalli, M.D.,Tammy Evans, Tanzeel Islam, M.D., Prem Reddy, M.D, and St. Mary's Regional Medical Center) Notice of Appearance for Jacob Zvi Goldstein. (COA) | | 22-06766
|
03/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondents have filed a motion to associate attorney Jacob Zvi Goldstein of Hall, Prangle & Schoonveld, pursuant to SCR 42. Mr. Goldstein shall be permitted to appear on behalf of respondents in this matter. Nevada attorney Michael Prangle of Hall, Prangle & Schoonveld shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Goldstein in this matter. (COA) | | 22-07348
|
03/14/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Notice of Appearance for Jackson Wong. (COA) | | 22-08042
|
03/24/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Oral Argument Reminder Notice | | |
03/29/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Court of Appeals. (COA) | | |
04/20/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) | | 22-12498
|
04/20/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
05/09/2022 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. (Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.) (COA) | | 22-14751
|
05/10/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (COA) | | 22-14873
|
05/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall remove attorneys Don Springmeyer and Jackson Wong and the law firm of Kemp Jones, LLP, from the docket in this appeal. Appellants shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file a petition for rehearing or review, if deemed warranted. If no petition is filed within this time period, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (COA) | | 22-16670
|
06/01/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Persons' Petition for Rehearing. (COA) | | 22-17356
|
07/21/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (COA) | | 22-22937
|
08/05/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
08/05/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
08/05/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
08/05/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-24590
|
08/15/2022 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." EN BANC (SC) | | 22-25403
|
08/15/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-25404
|
08/15/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
09/06/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 16, 2022. (SC) | | 22-25404
|