Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Administrative Case: ADKT 0577
Short Caption:IN RE: THE MATTER OF AMENDMENTS TO SCR 208 AND SCR 211 REGARDING THE ADMINISTRATION OF THE STATE OF NEVADA BOARD OF CONTINUING LEGAL EDUCATIONCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:ADKT Order Filed
Filed Date:02/10/2021Public Hearing:
Closed Date:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/10/2021Administrative CaseFiled Petition.
02/11/2021Administrative CaseFiled Amended Petition.21-04123
02/11/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing.21-04131
02/23/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Daniel Bogden.21-05357
02/23/2021Administrative CaseFiled Comments from Francis Flaherty.21-05359
03/03/2021Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. (SC)
03/22/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Supreme Court Rules 208 and 211.21-08178
05/12/2021Administrative CaseA Clean Copy of Exhibit A, Order Amending Supreme Court Rules 208 and 211.21-13616
06/11/2021Administrative CaseFiled Status Report on Transfer of CLE Board Operations.21-16851
09/07/2021Administrative CaseFiled Petition.21-25913
09/08/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing and Requesting Public Comment. (SC)21-26076
09/23/2021Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. (SC)
10/04/2021Administrative CaseFiled State Bar's MCLE Board Reserve Funds.21-28386
10/05/2021Administrative CaseFiled Order Scheduling Public Hearing.21-28456
10/27/2021Administrative CaseFiled MCLE Board Reserve Funds.21-30987
10/28/2021Administrative CaseFiled MCLE Reserves Grant Program Guidelines.21-31081
11/12/2021Administrative CaseFiled Statement from Nevada's Legal Aid Providers Regarding ADKT 0577.21-32433
11/18/2021Administrative CasePublic Hearing Held. Public Hearing held on the Administrative Docket. (SC)
01/05/2022Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Supreme Court Rules 79, 115, 121.1, 205, 206, 207, 208, 210, 211, 212, 213, 214, and 215.22-00385
03/18/2022Administrative CaseFiled Nevada Board of Continuing Legal Education Annual Report.22-08624
03/30/2022Administrative CaseClean Copy of Exhibit A to the Order Amending Supreme Court Rules 79, 115, 121.1, 205, 206, 207, 208, 210, 211, 212, 213, 214, and 215.22-09896
10/03/2022Administrative CaseFiled MCLE Reserve Funds Grant Program.22-31151