Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/03/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
06/03/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-15959
|
06/03/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-15961
|
06/10/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Bret O. Whipple. (SC) | | |
06/10/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC) | | 21-16769
|
06/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-16790
|
06/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-16792
|
06/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-16811
|
06/11/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Proof of Service for Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 21-16837
|
06/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 21-17552
|
06/18/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (SC) | | 21-17624
|
06/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a motion requesting this court to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. Appellants have opposed the motion. The motion is denied. This denial is without prejudice to respondent's right to renew the motion, if necessary, upon completion of settlement proceedings. (SC) | | 21-17661
|
06/21/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellants' Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-17858
|
06/22/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. (SC) | | 21-18012
|
07/02/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-19164
|
08/06/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. The settlement judge and counsel request that this appeal remain in the settlement program until October 31, 2021. Case Nos. 81972/82964/82994. (SC) | | 21-22963
|
08/12/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to November 1, 2021. (SC) | | 21-23509
|
09/24/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Minutes. (SC) | | 21-27626
|
11/03/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 29, 2021, at 10:00 AM. The settlement judge requests that this appeal remain in the settlement program an additional 60 days in order to complete the settlement process. Case Nos. 81972/82964/82994. (SC) | | 21-31623
|
11/10/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to January 3, 2022. (SC) | | 21-32381
|
12/09/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Case Nos. 81972/82964/82994. (SC). | | 21-35112
|
12/14/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-35618
|
12/28/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/1/19 and 1/14/21. To Court Reporter: Stacy Ray. (SC) | | 21-36876
|
01/05/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. (SC) | | 22-00382
|
01/05/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Correcting Previous Order and Directing District Court Clerk to File the Record on Appeal. On December 14, 2021, this court entered an order that, among other things, reinstated the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Because this is a venue appeal, the directive to file briefs was entered in error and the briefing schedule set forth in that order is vacated. No further documents are due from the parties at this time. District court record on appeal due: 30 days. (SC) | | 22-00441
|
01/12/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 22-01336
|
01/17/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Reinstate Briefing. (SC) | | 22-01581
|
01/26/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (A790929) Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-02653
|
01/26/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volumes 1-37 (Via FTP) (SC) | | 22-02661
|
01/31/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal (SEALED PAGES 5615-6146 AND 6411-6431, 6611-7134 AND 7192-7336. (SC) | | |
02/14/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. (SC) | | 22-04897
|
04/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "The appeal in Docket No. 82964 is dismissed." The appeal in Docket No. 82994 challenging the order granting reconsideration and denying change of venue shall proceed pursuant to NRAP 3A(b)(6)(B). The motion to reinstate briefing is denied. See NRAP 3A(b)(6)(B) (providing that an appeal of an order denying a motion to change venue is not subject to briefing by the parties). Nos 82964/82994. (SC) | | 22-11075
|
05/20/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-16052
|
05/20/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
09/22/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
10/17/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
10/17/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 22-32507
|
10/17/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
11/04/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 19, 2022. (SC) | | 22-32507
|