Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/09/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
07/09/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-19727
|
07/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-19730
|
07/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-19733
|
07/09/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Jacqueline A. Gilbert. (SC) | | |
07/09/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-19756
|
07/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Case Nos. 82771 and 83175. (SC) | | 21-19757
|
07/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-19776
|
07/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. (SC) | | 21-19834
|
07/12/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-19951
|
07/26/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-21522
|
07/26/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-21627
|
09/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing and Granting Motions to Consolidate. Briefing in Docket No. 82771 is hereby reinstated. Appellant's unopposed motions to consolidate Docket Nos. 82771 and 83175 are granted. Appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 30 days from service of the opening brief to file and serve a single combined answering brief and opening brief on cross-appeal. Cross-respondent shall then have 30 days from service of the combined brief to file an answering brief on cross-appeal, and appellant shall have 30 days from service of the combined brief to file a reply brief on appeal. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 14 days from service of the answering brief on cross-appeal to file a reply brief on cross-appeal. Nos 82771/83175. (SC) | | 21-27929
|
11/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief (First Request). Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 21-33791
|
11/24/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 29, 2021) Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 21-33796
|
12/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief (Second Request). Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 21-36694
|
01/07/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 28, 2022. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | 22-00766
|
01/28/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 1. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-02994
|
01/28/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 2. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-02995
|
01/28/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 3. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-02997
|
01/28/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 4. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-02998
|
01/28/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 5. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-02999
|
01/28/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-03042
|
01/31/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Substitution of Attorneys. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-03286
|
02/22/2022 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross- Appeal. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-05824
|
02/22/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (Combined Answering Brief/Opening Brief due: March 30, 2022) Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-05826
|
03/23/2022 | Motion | Filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Respondent's Combined Answering Brief and Opening Brief. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-09104
|
03/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Cross-Respondent Marchai B.T.'s combined brief due: April 18, 2022. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | 22-09371
|
04/18/2022 | Brief | Filed Cross-Appellant Marchai B.T.'s Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-12219
|
04/18/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix (Volume 1). Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-12220
|
04/18/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix (Volume 2). Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-12221
|
05/18/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Reply Brief due: June 1, 2022. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | 22-15703
|
05/18/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Cross-Respondent Wyeth Ranch Community Association's Answering Brief due: June 1, 2022. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | 22-15705
|
06/01/2022 | Brief | Filed Cross-Respondent Wyeth Ranch Community Association's Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-17342
|
06/01/2022 | Appendix | Filed Cross-Respondent Wyeth Ranch Community Association's Appendix on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-17343
|
06/01/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-17382
|
06/14/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent/cross-appellant Marchai B.T.'s reply brief on cross-appeal due: June 29, 2022. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-18885
|
06/15/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until August 2, 2022, to file and serve a reply brief on appeal. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | 22-18970
|
06/29/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross Appellant Marchai, B.T.'s Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-20598
|
08/02/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | 22-24231
|
08/09/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief on appeal. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | 22-24870
|
08/16/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 82771/83175 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 8/16/22) (SC) | | |
08/16/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-25600
|
08/16/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-25633
|
08/16/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | |
11/16/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." RP/LS/MG fn5 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under general order of assignment] Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-36091
|
12/12/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | 22-38812
|
12/12/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | |
12/29/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court County Clerk on December 13, 2022. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-38812
|