Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/14/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
04/14/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-10820
|
04/14/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-10823
|
04/16/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Jacqueline Gilbert. E-Payment Ref. no. 21041639147358. (SC) | | |
04/16/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-11118
|
04/19/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley. (SC) | | 21-11174
|
04/30/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | |
04/30/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 21-12452
|
04/30/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Cross-Appeal) (SC) | | 21-12455
|
05/04/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from David J. Merrill. E-Payment Ref. no. 21050442142487. (SC) | | |
05/04/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Settlement Program. (SC) | | 21-12783
|
05/07/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-13203
|
05/19/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. The premediation conference is continued. The Settlement Judge has been in communication with counsel but needs more time to communicate and evaluate. Requests up to June 30, 2021. (SC) | | 21-14422
|
05/20/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-14532
|
06/30/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. Case Nos. 82771/83069. (SC) | | 21-18778
|
07/02/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant and Cross-Appellant's transcript request due: 14 days. Appellant's opening brief due: 90 days. Cross-appellant shall have 30 days from service of appellant's opening brief to file and serve an answering brief on appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days from service of cross-appellant's answering brief to file and serve a reply brief on appeal. Cross/appellant's opening brief due: 90 days. Cross-respondent Wyeth Ranch Community Association (cross-respondent) shall have 30 days from service of cross-appellant's opening brief on cross-appeal to file and serve an answering brief on cross-appeal. Cross-appellant shall have 30 days from service of cross-respondent's answering brief to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal. (SC) | | 21-19103
|
07/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Case Nos. 82771 and 83175. (SC) | | 21-19758
|
07/16/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-20645
|
08/05/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this cross-appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Cross-respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date the response is served. This court defers ruling on the motion to consolidate pending resolution of this perceived jurisdictional defect. Briefing is suspended. (SC) | | 21-22761
|
08/06/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Amended Cross-Appeal/Marchai B.T.) (SC) | | 21-22870
|
09/07/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant Marchai, B.T.'s Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 21-25944
|
09/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing and Granting Motions to Consolidate. Briefing in Docket No. 82771 is hereby reinstated. Appellant's unopposed motions to consolidate Docket Nos. 82771 and 83175 are granted. Appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 30 days from service of the opening brief to file and serve a single combined answering brief and opening brief on cross-appeal. Cross-respondent shall then have 30 days from service of the combined brief to file an answering brief on cross-appeal, and appellant shall have 30 days from service of the combined brief to file a reply brief on appeal. Respondent/cross-appellant shall have 14 days from service of the answering brief on cross-appeal to file a reply brief on cross-appeal. Nos 82771/83175. (SC) | | 21-27929
|
11/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief (First Request). Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 21-33791
|
11/24/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 29, 2021) Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 21-33796
|
12/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief (Second Request). Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 21-36694
|
01/07/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 28, 2022. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | 22-00766
|
01/28/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 1. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-02994
|
01/28/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 2. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-02995
|
01/28/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 3. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-02997
|
01/28/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 4. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-02998
|
01/28/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Volume 5. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-02999
|
01/28/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-03042
|
01/31/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Substitution of Attorneys. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-03286
|
02/22/2022 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross- Appeal. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-05824
|
02/22/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (Combined Answering Brief/Opening Brief due: March 30, 2022) Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-05826
|
03/23/2022 | Motion | Filed Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Respondent's Combined Answering Brief and Opening Brief. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-09104
|
03/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Cross-Respondent Marchai B.T.'s combined brief due: April 18, 2022. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | 22-09371
|
04/18/2022 | Brief | Filed Cross-Appellant Marchai B.T.'s Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-12219
|
04/18/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix (Volume 1). Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-12220
|
04/18/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix (Volume 2). Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-12221
|
05/18/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Reply Brief due: June 1, 2022. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | 22-15703
|
05/18/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Cross-Respondent Wyeth Ranch Community Association's Answering Brief due: June 1, 2022. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | 22-15705
|
06/01/2022 | Brief | Filed Cross-Respondent Wyeth Ranch Community Association's Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-17342
|
06/01/2022 | Appendix | Filed Cross-Respondent Wyeth Ranch Community Association's Appendix on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-17343
|
06/01/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-17382
|
06/14/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent/cross-appellant Marchai B.T.'s reply brief on cross-appeal due: June 29, 2022. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-18885
|
06/15/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until August 2, 2022, to file and serve a reply brief on appeal. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | 22-18970
|
06/29/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross Appellant Marchai, B.T.'s Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-20598
|
08/02/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | 22-24231
|
08/09/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief on appeal. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | 22-24870
|
08/16/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 82771/83175 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 8/16/22) (SC) | | |
08/16/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-25600
|
08/16/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-25633
|
08/16/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | |
11/16/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." RP/LS/MG fn5 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under general order of assignment] Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-36091
|
12/12/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | 22-38812
|
12/12/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 82771/83175. (SC) | | |
12/29/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court County Clerk on December 13, 2022. Nos. 82771/83175 (SC) | | 22-38812
|