Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/26/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
07/26/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
07/26/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-21468
|
08/05/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from F. Peter James. (SC) | | |
08/06/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-22828
|
08/09/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC) | | 21-23037
|
08/20/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 26, 2021, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 21-24383
|
08/27/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-25058
|
10/26/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.(SC) | | 21-30925
|
10/28/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated Pursuant to NRAP3E. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 40 days fast track statement and appendix. (SC) | | 21-31045
|
11/10/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/22/19; 8/26/19; 12/16/20; 1/15/20; 1/22/20; 2/4/21; 2/11/21; 6/10/21. To Court Reporter: Verbatim Reporting & Transcription. (SC) | | 21-32369
|
12/08/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's fast track statement and appendix due: December 14, 2021. (SC) | | 21-34966
|
12/08/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to file Transcripts. (SC) | | 21-35032
|
12/14/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time for Briefing (First Written Request). (SC) | | 21-35667
|
12/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Verbatim Reporting & Transcription's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: January 10, 2022. Appellant shall have until February 7, 2022, to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. (SC) | | 21-36848
|
01/18/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:7/22/19, 8/26/19, 12/16/19, 1/22/20, 2/4/21, 2/11/21, and 6/10/21. (SC) | | 22-01731
|
02/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time for Briefing (Second Written Request). (SC) | | 22-04188
|
02/11/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until February 28, 2022, to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. (SC) | | 22-04656
|
02/26/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-06276
|
02/26/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 2. (SC) | | 22-06277
|
02/26/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 3. (SC) | | 22-06278
|
02/26/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 4. (SC) | | 22-06279
|
02/26/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 5. (SC) | | 22-06280
|
02/26/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 6. (SC) | | 22-06281
|
02/26/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 7. (SC) | | 22-06282
|
02/26/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 8. (SC) | | 22-06283
|
02/28/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time for Briefing (Third Written Request). (SC) | | 22-06477
|
03/02/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix (Revised) Volume 1. (SC) | | 22-06728
|
03/02/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix (Revised) Volume 2. (SC) | | 22-06729
|
03/02/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix (Revised) Volume 3. (SC) | | 22-06730
|
03/02/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix (Revised) Volume 5. (SC) | | 22-06732
|
03/02/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix (Revised) Volume 6. (SC) | | 22-06733
|
03/02/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix (Revised) Volume 7. (SC) | | 22-06734
|
03/02/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix (Revised) Volume 8. (SC) | | 22-06735
|
03/02/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 22-06736
|
03/03/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix (Revised) Volume 4. (SC) | | 22-06852
|
03/04/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion for a fourth extension of time to file the fast track statement and appendix is granted. The fast track statement and appendix were filed on March 2 and 3, 2022. Respondent shall have until March 24, 2022, to file and serve the fast track response. (SC) | | 22-06904
|
04/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Ex Parte Motion for Additional Time to Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 22-10296
|
04/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Response to Motion. Notice of Non-Opposition. (SC) | | 22-10311
|
04/05/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's fast track response due: April 18, 2022. (SC) | | 22-10573
|
04/18/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 22-12204
|
04/19/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service (Fast Track Response). Due date: 7 days. | | 22-12231
|
04/22/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service (Fast Track Response) (SC) | | 22-12858
|
05/02/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply to Fast Track Response due: May 9, 2022. (SC) | | 22-13854
|
05/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief (First Written Request). (SC) | | 22-14765
|
05/11/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Fast Track Reply due: May 23, 2022. (SC) | | 22-14903
|
05/24/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Ex Parte Motion to File Untimely Brief - Fast Track Reply. (DETACHED FAST TRACK REPLY AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER FILED 5/25/22). (SC) | | 22-16448
|
05/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall detach the fast track reply from the motion and shall file it separately. (SC) | | 22-16601
|
05/25/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Reply to Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 22-16602
|
05/25/2022 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
06/29/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-20433
|
06/29/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
08/19/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Vacating in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND VACATED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals-MG.JT/BB (SC) | | |
09/13/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
09/13/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-28594
|
09/13/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
09/22/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 14, 2022. (SC) | | 22-28594
|