Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 83334
Short Caption:ZALYAUL (HAMZA) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C354047Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:En Banc Reconsider Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/15/2022 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Courtroom
Submission Date:09/15/2022How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/2021Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
08/06/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)21-22910
08/09/2021Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Minutes. (SC)21-23105
08/20/2021Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 03/09/21, 07/01/21, 07/27/21 and 08/03/21. To Court Reporter: R. Page, Eighth Judicial District Court Department 21. (SC)21-24384
08/27/2021Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC)21-25088
10/19/2021Notice/IncomingFiled Court Reporter's Notice of Appellant's Failure to Pay Deposit. (SC).21-30051
10/22/2021TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/9/21, 7/1/21, 7/27/21, and 8/3/21. (SC)21-30540
12/06/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: December 20, 2021. (SC)21-34680
12/20/2021BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)21-36275
12/21/2021Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Appendix to Opening Brief. Due date: 7 days. (SC)21-36367
12/21/2021AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC)21-36379
01/18/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Appearance for John Afshar. (SC)22-01720
01/18/2022MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)22-01722
01/19/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Answering Brief. Due date February 22, 2022. (SC)22-01851
02/18/2022BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)22-05408
02/18/2022AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC)22-05409
02/18/2022MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. (SC)22-05410
02/28/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report. Due: 14 days. (SC)22-06336
03/07/2022Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled (SEALED) Presentence Investigation Report from District Court Clerk. (SC)
03/23/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)22-09192
03/25/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 7 days. (SC)22-09396
04/13/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (DETACHED REPLY BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER ORDER FILED 4/19/22). (SC)22-11738
04/19/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall detach the reply brief from the motion filed on April 13, 2022, and file it separately. (SC)22-12310
04/19/2022BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)22-12311
04/19/2022Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
08/18/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for September 15, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC)22-25887
08/22/2022MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument. (SC)22-26174
08/22/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Reschedule Oral Argument. (SC)22-26209
08/22/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Alexis E. Minichini. (SC)22-26213
08/26/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a motion to reschedule oral argument in this appeal. Appellant opposed the motion. The motion is denied. Oral argument remains scheduled in this appeal for September 15, 2022, at 10:00 a.m., in Las Vegas. (SC)22-26873
08/31/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)22-27383
09/01/2022Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Baylie A. Hellman. (SC)22-27544
09/15/2022Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/DH. (SC).
11/23/2022Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Vacated." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 74. SNP22-JH/LS/DH. (SC).22-36844
12/09/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Request for Expedited Remittitur. (SC)22-38695
12/09/2022MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Petition for Expedited Remittitur. (SC)22-38704
12/09/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Response to Appellant's request for Expedited Remittitur. (SC)22-38755
12/12/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents petition for rehearing due: December 27, 2022. (SC)22-38813
12/14/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Motion For Release Pending Further Review. (SC)22-39256
12/14/2022MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Release Pending Review Pursuant to NRAP 23(c). (SC)22-39286
12/16/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions. Appellant has filed a motion requesting expedited issuance of the remittitur and a motion requesting his release pending further review. Respondent opposes the motions. The motions are denied. (SC)22-39457
12/27/2022Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)22-40501
12/27/2022Filing FeeRehearing Filing fee waived. (SC)
12/29/2022Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). SNP22 - JH/LS/DH. (SC)22-40882
01/09/2023Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y23-00697
01/25/2023Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Answer due: 14 days. (SC)23-02419
02/08/2023Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration23-03964