Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/01/2021 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived - Criminal. (SC). | | |
10/01/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-28246
|
10/14/2021 | Other | Justice Douglas W. Herndon disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings. (SC) | | |
11/02/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Criminal and Docketing Statement. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-31471
|
11/05/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-31819
|
11/09/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-32270
|
11/09/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Criminal Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 21-32271
|
11/12/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/21/21. To Court Reporter: Victoria Boyd. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 11/15/21) (SC) | | |
11/15/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 21-32587
|
11/15/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 7/21/21. To Court Reporter: Victoria Boyd. (SC) | | 21-32648
|
01/31/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time (First Request). (SC) | | 22-03279
|
02/03/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: April 1, 2022. (SC) | | 22-03652
|
04/02/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 22-10257
|
04/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 11, 2022. (SC) | | 22-11142
|
04/11/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 22-11459
|
04/18/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 21, 2022. (SC) | | 22-12194
|
04/21/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (Fourth Request) (SC) | | 22-12731
|
04/22/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-12861
|
04/22/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Appendix. (SC) | | 22-12862
|
04/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-12864
|
04/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 22-12883
|
04/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 22-12865
|
04/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 22-12867
|
04/24/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 22-12884
|
04/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 22-12869
|
04/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 22-12870
|
04/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 8. (SC) | | 22-12871
|
04/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 9. (SC) | | 22-12872
|
04/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 10. (SC) | | 22-12873
|
04/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 11. (SC) | | 22-12874
|
04/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 12. (SC) | | 22-12875
|
04/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 13. (SC) | | 22-12876
|
04/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 14. (SC) | | 22-12877
|
04/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 15. (SC) | | 22-12878
|
04/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 16. (SC) | | 22-12879
|
04/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 17. (SC) | | 22-12880
|
04/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 18. (SC) | | 22-12882
|
04/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 19. (SC) | | 22-12885
|
04/25/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 20. (SC) | | 22-12881
|
04/25/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant's motion for a fourth extension of time to file to the opening brief is granted. The opening brief was filed on April 22, 2022. The motion for an extension of time to file the appendix is also granted. The appendix was filed on April 24 and 25, 2022. Respondent shall have until May 25, 2022, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 22-12963
|
05/25/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: June 8, 2022. (SC) | | 22-16615
|
06/08/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Taleen R, Pandukht. (SC) | | 22-18231
|
06/08/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Transmit Exhibits. (SC) | | 22-18232
|
06/08/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-18233
|
06/16/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Transmit Exhibits. The clerk of the district court shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court State's Exhibits 147 and 149. (SC) | | 22-19128
|
06/17/2022 | Order/Incoming | Filed District court order. In Regards to Order Granting Motion to Transmit Exhibits, dated June 16, 2022, Exhibits have been submitted in Case 80361. (SC) | | 22-19199
|
06/30/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. the clerk of this court shall transfer State's Exhibits 147 and 149 from Docket No. 80318 to Docket No. 83552. (SC) | | 22-20763
|
06/30/2022 | Exhibit | Filed Received District Court **Exhibit 147 & 149.** (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 80318 PER THE ORDER FILED 6/30/22). (SC) | | |
07/08/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-21641
|
07/11/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Reply Brief. Due date is July 25, 2022. (SC) | | 22-21666
|
07/25/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-23392
|
07/28/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until August 15, 2022, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC) | | 22-23745
|
08/15/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (Third)(SC) | | 22-25534
|
08/16/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until August 17, 2022, to file and serve the reply brief. (SC) | | 22-25615
|
08/17/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-25780
|
08/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
12/15/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn3 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under a general order of assignment.] RP/LS/MG. (SC) | | 22-39369
|
01/09/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
01/09/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-00667
|
01/27/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court County Clerk on January 10, 2022. (SC) | | 23-00667
|