Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/07/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
06/07/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-16219
|
06/07/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-16221
|
06/07/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Confidential Cover Sheet. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
06/07/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of Bradley J. Hofland. Check no. 5026. (SC) | | |
06/07/2021 | Filing Fee | Returned Bond Fee ($500). Check No. 5027 returned to Law Offices of Bradley J. Hofland. (SC) | | |
06/07/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-16274
|
06/09/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. (SC) | | 21-16488
|
06/24/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for July 26, 2021, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 21-18248
|
06/28/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 06/28/21). (SC) | | |
06/28/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement due: 5 days. | | 21-18600
|
07/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Appellant to File Corrected Docketing Statement. Appellant's corrected docketing statement due: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-19578
|
07/08/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-19598
|
07/08/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Attachment to No. 27 Pt. 2 (SC) | | 21-19599
|
07/08/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Attachment to No. 27 Pt. 3. (SC) | | 21-19602
|
07/27/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-21746
|
07/28/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated Pursuant to NRAP3E. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 40 days fast track statement and appendix. Respondent(s): 21 days from fast track statement to file fast track response. (SC) | | 21-21852
|
07/29/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/27/20 and 01/03/21. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 07/29/21). (SC) | | |
07/29/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-22027
|
08/09/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/10/15. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 08/09/21). (SC) | | |
08/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC) | | 21-23145
|
08/10/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/10/15. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL - NOT A FILE-STAMPED COPY). (SC) | | |
08/10/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/10/15. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. (SC) | | 21-23197
|
08/10/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/27/20 and 01/13/21. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. (SC) | | 21-23198
|
08/10/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/27/20; 01/13/21. (SC) | | 21-23264
|
08/19/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/10/15. (SC) | | 21-24215
|
09/07/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Child Custody Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 21-25879
|
09/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 1 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-25882
|
09/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 1 Part 6. (SC) | | 21-25883
|
09/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 2 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-25884
|
09/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 3 Part 1. (SC) | | 21-25886
|
09/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement - Volume 4. (SC) | | 21-25887
|
09/27/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's fast track response due: October 5, 2021. (SC) | | 21-27720
|
10/04/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Respondent's Child Custody Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 21-28455
|
10/14/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply to Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 21-29601
|
10/15/2021 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. (SC) | | |
11/05/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-31947
|
11/05/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
11/05/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
01/24/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) | | 22-02340
|
01/24/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
02/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
02/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
02/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
02/18/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-05490
|
02/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
03/04/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 22, 2022. (SC) | | 22-05490
|