Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/09/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
02/09/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-03936
|
02/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-03938
|
02/10/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Erich N. Storm. (SC) | | |
02/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-04112
|
02/17/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley. (SC) | | 21-04652
|
03/05/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-06479
|
03/15/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Firm Name (Storm Legal Group has changed its name to Desert Ridge Legal Group). (SC) | | 21-07509
|
03/15/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Ryan M. Venci, Danielle A. Kolkoski, Robert L. Thompson and Israel P. Whitbeck of Desert Ridge Legal Group (formerly known as Storm Legal Group) have joined representation of Appellants, Holga Flores-Reyes and Anthony Verdon, in this action). (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL 03/15/21). (SC) | | |
03/15/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL 03/15/21). (SC) | | |
03/15/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Erich N. Storm is no longer with Desert Ridge Legal Group. New appellant counsel Ryan M. Venci, Danielle A. Kolkoski, Robert L. Thompson and Israel P. Whitbeck of Desert Ridge Legal Group). (SC) | | 21-07516
|
03/15/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 03/17/21). (SC) | | |
03/17/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-07721
|
03/18/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. The premediation conference has not been conducted. The Settlement Judge requests a 30 day extension to file Early Case Assessment Report. (SC) | | 21-07888
|
03/19/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-08024
|
04/19/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. The premediation conference is continued because after lengthy initial delays due to one side's law firm reconstruction, Settlement Judge is starting to make some progress. SJ requests additional time to see if can be settled first without a formal settlement conference via negotiations: until May 31st. (SC) | | 21-11219
|
05/12/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. (SC) | | 21-13652
|
05/12/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-13674
|
05/25/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel (Desert Ridge Legal Group does hereby associates the law firm of Pyatt Silvestri, as counsel for Appellants, Holga Flores-Reyes and Anthony Verdon). (SC) | | 21-14998
|
05/26/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/03/20. To Court Reporter: Brynn White. (SC) | | 21-15157
|
06/30/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The law firm of Pyatt Silvestri has filed a notice informing this court that it has associated with counsel for appellants, Desert Ridge Legal Group. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall add attorneys Ali R. Iqbal and James P.C. Silvestri and the law firm of Pyatt Silvestri to the docket as counsel for appellants in this appeal. (SC) | | 21-18779
|
07/27/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' opening brief and appendix due: August 24, 2021. (SC) | | 21-21745
|
08/24/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Chronological Index to Appendix. (SC) | | 21-24633
|
08/24/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-24634
|
09/22/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-27419
|
10/20/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: November 5, 2021. (SC) | | 21-30196
|
11/05/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 21-31836
|
11/05/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
12/06/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-34636
|
12/06/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
12/06/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court | | |
01/13/2022 | Other | Judge Bonnie A. Bulla disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms | | |
01/24/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1[The Honorable Bonnie A. Bulla, Judge did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) | | 22-02329
|
01/24/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn1[The Honorable Bonnie A. Bulla, Judge did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
02/02/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Entry of Order of Affirmation. (COA) | | 22-03522
|
02/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
02/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
02/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
02/18/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-05455
|
02/18/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
02/22/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice Satisfaction of Judgment. (COA) | | 22-05656
|
03/04/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 22, 2022. (SC) | | 22-05455
|