Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/04/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
02/04/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-03490
|
02/04/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-03493
|
02/04/2021 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC) | | 21-03495
|
02/04/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (Informal Brief) (SC) | | 21-03497
|
02/04/2021 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for Stay form (Child Custody). (SC) | | 21-03498
|
02/04/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Pro Se Child Custody Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 21-03499
|
02/11/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ashlee Jackson. Money Order no. 26949366134. (SC) | | |
02/11/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice. Certificate of Service. (SC) | | 21-04151
|
02/12/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines/Fast Track Child Custody. (SC) | | 21-04223
|
02/18/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-04780
|
02/18/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-04783
|
02/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion for Stay, Regarding Pro Bono Counsel, and Directing Transmission of Record. The clerk of this court is directed to transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary and district court order to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. Appellant's Notice of Appearance of Counsel or LACSN's Notice due: 60 days. Briefing is suspended. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. (SC) | | 21-05832
|
03/29/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Record on Appeal due: April 12, 2021. (SC) | | 21-08884
|
04/12/2021 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (Via FTP) Vols. 1-5. (SC) | | 21-10448
|
04/27/2021 | Motion | Filed Legal Aid Center's Motion to Extend Time to File a Notice of Appearance. (SC) | | 21-12004
|
04/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The Legal Aid Center Of Southern Nevada, Inc., has filed a notice stating that appellant is eligible for pro bono representation and requesting an extension of time for pro bono counsel to file a notice of appearance. The motion is granted. Notice of appearance due: May 26, 2021. (SC) | | 21-12135
|
05/05/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Alex B. Ghibaudo. (SC) | | 21-12902
|
05/07/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. The clerk of this court shall remove this appeal from the NRAP 3E child custody fast track. Appellant: Transcript Request Form due: 14 days; Opening Brief due: 90 days. (SC) | | 21-13173
|
05/21/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time To File A Transcript Request Form. (SC) | | 21-14723
|
05/25/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until June 1, 2021, to file and serve a transcript request form. (SC) | | 21-14958
|
06/04/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate and Notice That No Transcript is Requested. (SC) | | 21-16135
|
07/23/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-21361
|
07/27/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-21668
|
08/05/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief due: August 19, 2021. (SC) | | 21-22735
|
08/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-24298
|
08/23/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall have until August 26, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-24498
|
08/26/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-24936
|
08/26/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-24939
|
09/22/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-27443
|
09/23/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Respondent's (Appellant's) Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-27451
|
09/27/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief due: October 18, 2021. (SC) | | 21-27776
|
10/01/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-28282
|
10/13/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-29429
|
10/14/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-29520
|
10/18/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 10/18/21) (SC) | | |
10/18/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-29887
|
10/18/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-29965
|
10/18/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1 (SC) | | 21-29969
|
10/19/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-30094
|
10/20/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-30131
|
10/26/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-30857
|
10/28/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-31058
|
12/01/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
12/15/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-35733
|
12/15/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-35780
|
12/20/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-36129
|
12/20/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
12/20/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
12/22/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 21-36476
|
12/27/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (COA) | | 21-36719
|
01/18/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (COA) | | 22-01647
|
01/20/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (COA) | | 22-02097
|
01/26/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (COA) | | 22-02640
|
01/26/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on March 29, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Oral argument will be held by videoconference. The court will use the BlueJeans videoconferencing system, which requires laptop/desktop/videoconferencing computer internet access and audio and video (web camera) capability. In case technical difficulties develop at any time, the court will conduct the oral argument by teleconference, which will require counsel to have immediate access to a landline phone connection. On or before March 4, 2022, the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a notice identifying the attorney(s) who will argue the case and the landline and cellular phone numbers and email address of that attorney(s). The notice may be emailed to the court at nvscclerk@nvcourts.nv.gov. The attorneys will be required to schedule a session with the Clerk of the Court to test the capabilities of the connection and video equipment approximately one week prior to argument. (COA) | | 22-02650
|
01/27/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. (COA) | | 22-02771
|
01/31/2022 | Motion | Filed Alexander M. Falconi/Our Nevada Judges Administrator's Request Permission to Record and Publish the Oral Argument. (COA) | | 22-03173
|
02/18/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Our Nevada Judges has submitted a request seeking access to the Court of Appeals of Nevada oral argument in the above entitled matter for the purpose of photographic or electronic coverage of the hearing to be held March 29, 2022, beginning at 11:00 a.m. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings, for news purposes and not for commercial exploitation;
IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all persons participating in such photographic or electronic coverage shall observe the standards set forth in the Supreme Court Rules in all respects, and Alexander Falconi of Our Nevada Judges is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. (COA) | | 22-05550
|
03/21/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Possible Mootness. (COA) | | 22-08853
|
03/21/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Joinder of Notice of Possible Mootness. (COA) | | 22-08890
|
03/23/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause and Vacating Oral Agurment. Appellant shall have seven days to show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed as moot or to file a notice of voluntary dismissal after obtaining appellant's consent. Respondent shall have seven days to file a reply to appellant's response, if applicable. The oral argument currently scheduled for March 29, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. is hereby vacated. (COA) | | 22-09089
|
03/31/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. (COA) | | 22-10142
|
04/18/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant has filed a motion to voluntarily withdraw. The motion is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA) | | 22-12130
|
04/18/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant has filed a motion to voluntarily withdraw. The motion is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
04/19/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney. (SC) | | 22-12384
|
05/11/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Pursuant to the notice of withdrawal of counsel filed April 19, 2022, the clerk of this court shall remove attorney Steven E. Evenson from the docket as counsel for respondent. (SC) | | 22-14936
|