Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/13/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
02/13/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
02/13/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-05971
|
02/19/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ford & Friedman. Check no. 1450. (SC) | | |
02/19/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 20-06840
|
02/24/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert E. Gaston. (SC) | | 20-07351
|
03/11/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Docketing Statement - Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-09740
|
03/12/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement). (SC) | | 20-09788
|
03/12/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Certificate of Service - Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-09809
|
03/16/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 25, 2020, at 1:00 PM. (SC) | | 20-10253
|
04/02/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Amended ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for May 19, 2020, at 10:00 AM. (SC) | | 20-12673
|
06/10/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 24, 2020, at 10:00 AM. There is a pending matter with the abuse and neglect courts that will have an influence on this matter. The parties requested a continuance until that matter is completed. (SC) | | 20-21787
|
06/15/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge shall file the Final Settlement Program Status Report by August 24, 2020. (SC). | | 20-22237
|
08/27/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 20-31704
|
08/31/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated Pursuant to NRAP3E. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 40 days fast track statement and appendix. Respondent(s): 21 days from fast track statement to file fast track response. (SC) | | 20-31985
|
10/08/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Fast Track) (SC) | | 20-37007
|
10/19/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Quentin Mansfield stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/26/2019 and 12/18/2019. (SC) | | 20-38268
|
10/19/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Regarding Transcript Request Form. Appellant's Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: November 23, 2020; Transcript Request Form due: 7 days. (SC). | | 20-38272
|
10/21/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/26/19 and 12/18/19. To Court Reporter: Quentin Mansfield. (SC) | | 20-38640
|
11/19/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Remand Pursuant to Huneycutt. (REJECTED PER 11/20/20 NOTICE). (SC). | | |
11/20/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Appellant's Motion for Remand Pursuant to Huneycutt). (SC). | | 20-42433
|
11/20/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Remand Pursuant to Huneycutt vs. Huneycutt, or in the Alternative, for an Order Identifying the Remaining Issues to be Considered by this Court, and for an Extension of Time to File Appellant's Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 20-42522
|
12/10/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Limited Remand. This appeal is hereby remanded to the district court for the limited purpose of deciding appellant's motion and any related pending custody claims. Appellant and respondent shall have 60 days from the date of this order to either (1) notify this court of the district court's decision on appellant's motion or (2) otherwise inform this court of the status of the district court proceedings. In light of the limited remand, briefing of this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. Appellant's request for an extension of time to file the fast track statement is denied as moot. (SC) | | 20-44954
|
02/08/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant William Dimonaco's Limited Remand Status Report. (SC) | | 21-03742
|
02/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The parties shall have until May 28, 2021, to either (1) notify this court of the district court's decision on appellant's motion or (2) otherwise inform this court of the status of the district court proceedings. (SC) | | 21-04314
|
05/28/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice Limited Remand Status Report. (SC) | | 21-15363
|
06/11/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has now filed a second status report informing this court that the evidentiary hearing on this matter has been continued until July 14, 2021. Accordingly, the parties shall have until July 28, 2021, to either (1) notify this court of the district court's decision on appellant's motion or (2) otherwise inform this court of the status of the district court proceedings. (SC) | | 21-16824
|
07/28/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant William Dimonaco's Limited Remand Status Report. (SC) | | 21-21932
|
07/29/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/1/20. (SC) | | 21-22069
|
08/13/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has now filed a third status report informing this court that the district court issued a minute order declaring the subject of the limited remand to be moot and vacated the scheduled evidentiary hearing. We extend the suspension of briefing in this matter. Status report due: 30 days. (SC) | | 21-23649
|
09/10/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Limited Remand Status Report. (SC) | | 21-26308
|
09/15/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant has now filed a status report in which he represents that the district court has orally denied his motion and will not be conducting an evidentiary hearing as previously indicated. Accordingly, briefing of this appeal is reinstated. Appellant's fast track statement and appendix due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-26649
|
10/06/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's fast track statement and appendix due: October 13, 2021. (SC) | | 21-28684
|
10/13/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Fast Track Statement. (SC) | | 21-29453
|
10/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-29455
|
10/13/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-29456
|
11/03/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's fast track response due: November 10, 2021. (SC) | | 21-31617
|
11/10/2021 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Respondent's Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 21-32379
|
11/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Fast Track Response. (SC) | | 21-32380
|
12/28/2021 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. No Reply to Fast Track Response Filed. (SC). | | |
01/21/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-02188
|
01/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
01/21/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
04/28/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "We reverse the amended order and remand for the district court to conduct an evidentiary hearing on the after-school care issue." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (COA) | | 22-13553
|
04/28/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "We reverse the amended order and remand for the district court to conduct an evidentiary hearing on the after-school care issue." Court of Appeals- MG/JT/BB. (SC) | | |
05/23/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
05/23/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
05/23/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals | | |
05/23/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-16185
|
05/23/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/10/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 24, 2022. (SC) | | 22-16185
|