Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 84134
Short Caption:STATE VS. DIST. CT. (DOANE (JOHN))Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C346036Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/13/2022How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/26/2022Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC)
01/26/2022Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition. (SC)22-02605
01/26/2022AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1. (SC)22-02606
01/26/2022AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (SC)22-02607
02/04/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real party in interest's answer due: 28 days. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)22-03868
03/03/2022MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Petition for Writ. (SC)22-06761
03/08/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The motion filed by real party in interest for an extension of time to file an answer to the petition is granted. Real party shall have until April 5, 2022, to file and serve the answer. (SC)22-07307
04/05/2022Petition/WritFiled Real Party In Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and or Prohibition. (SC)22-10508
04/19/2022MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply. (SC)22-12225
05/02/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Petitioner shall have until May 19, 2022, to file and serve the reply. (SC)22-13890
05/19/2022Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition. (SC)22-15863
10/13/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. (SC)22-32336
12/30/2022Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 90. SNP22-JH/LS/DH. (SC).22-40932
12/30/2022WritFiled Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of mailed to for service upon Judge Tierra Danielle Jones. (SC)22-40972
01/17/2023Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Real Party in Interest's Petition for Rehearing. (SC).23-01448
01/17/2023WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Tierra Danielle Jones on January 11, 2023.23-01533
01/30/2023Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." fn1 [The Honorable Justice Hardesty having retired did not participate in the decision on rehearing.] NRAP 40(c). SNP22 - LS/DH. (SC)23-02832