Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/29/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
12/29/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-37027
|
12/29/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-37030
|
12/29/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-37032
|
12/29/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Confidential Cover Sheet. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
12/31/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. (SC) | | 21-37279
|
12/31/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Molly S. Rosenblum. (SC) | | |
01/03/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 22-00024
|
01/04/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Exhibit List. (SC) | | 22-00177
|
01/04/2022 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 40 days fast track statement and appendix. (SC) | | 22-00232
|
01/04/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/3/21, 11/4/21, and 11/5/21. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. (SC) | | 22-00278
|
01/24/2022 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 22-02443
|
01/28/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal Under NRAP 27(e). Action Requested By Friday February 11th, 2022. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 02/04/22 NOTICE) | | 22-02934
|
01/31/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Emergency Motion to Stay. (SC) (TRANSFERRED TO THE COURT OF APPEALS PER 02/04/22 NOTICE) | | 22-03276
|
02/04/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-03954
|
02/04/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
02/04/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
02/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal Under NRAP 27(e). Action Requested By Friday February 11th, 2022. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 02/04/22 NOTICE). (COA) | | 22-03955
|
02/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Emergency Motion to Stay. (TRANSFERRED FROM THE SUPREME COURT PER 02/04/22 NOTICE). (COA) | | 22-03956
|
02/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Court Reporter's Motion to Extend Time to File Transcripts'. (COA) | | 22-04019
|
02/09/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Karla Soto of Verbatim Reporting & Transcription (VRT) has filed a motion for an extension of time to prepare the transcripts requested in this appeal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. Court reporter certificate due: February 15, 2022. Fast track statement and appendix due: March 7, 2022. (COA) | | 22-04379
|
02/10/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Stay. We deny the stay motion. (COA) | | 22-04487
|
02/14/2022 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/3/21, 11/4/21, and 11/5/21. (COA) | | 22-04913
|
02/21/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Excess Pages for Fast Track Statement. (COA) | | 22-05584
|
02/24/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for leave to file a fast track statement in excess of 16 pages is granted. Appellant shall have until March 7, 2022, to file a fast track statement of no more than 21 pages. (SC) | | 22-06003
|
02/25/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Substitution of Attorneys from Molly S. Rosenblum to Emily McFarling. (COA) | | 22-06271
|
03/03/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk of this court shall remove attorneys Molly S. Rosenblum and Sheila Tajbakhsh, and Rosenblum Law Offices from the docket and shall substitute Emily McFarling and McFarling Law Group as counsel for appellant. (COA) | | 22-06829
|
03/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Permission to Enlarge the Type-Volume Limitation on Fast Track Statement. (COA) | | 22-06982
|
03/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Submit Certain Volumes of Appendix Under Seal. (COA) | | 22-07092
|
03/07/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 14, 2022. (COA) | | 22-07229
|
03/11/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Direct the District Court to Transmit Court Exhibit 2 to the Court of Appeals. (COA) | | 22-07832
|
03/14/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Fast Track Statement. (COA) | | 22-08077
|
03/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vol. 1. (COA) | | 22-08084
|
03/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 2-15.(COA) | | 22-08088
|
03/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 16-20. (SC) | | 22-08090
|
03/21/2022 | Transcript | Filed Amended Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/3/21 and 11/5/21. (COA) | | 22-08820
|
03/24/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Leave to Correct Transcripts and for the Court to Accept Respondent's Correction to Evidentiary Hearing Transcripts and to Include in the Joint Appendix. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 3/24/22) (SC) | | |
03/24/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 22-09273
|
03/24/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Leave to Correct Transcripts and for the Court to Accept Respondent's Correction to Evidentiary Hearing Transcripts and to Include in the Joint Appendix. (COA) | | 22-09288
|
03/28/2022 | Appendix | Filed Amended Joint Appendix. Vol. 15-17 (COA) | | 22-09618
|
04/20/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's motion for leave to file a fast track statement in excess of 7,267 words is granted. The fast track statement was filed on March 14, 2022. Respondent shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. The clerk of this court shall file Volumes 2, 3, and 4, received on March 18, 2022, under seal. The district court clerk shall have 14 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court Exhibit 2, admitted at the evidentiary hearing, which consists of the entirety of the "OurFamilyWizard" communications between the parties. Respondent's motion for leave to correct transcripts and for the court to accept respondent's corrections of the transcripts is denied. (COA) | | 22-12554
|
04/20/2022 | Appendix | Filed Under Seal - Appellant's Appendix Vols. 2, 3, and 4. (COA) | | |
04/25/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Excess Word Count/Pages Limit. (COA) | | 22-13107
|
04/26/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's fast track response due: May 18, 2022. (COA) | | 22-13140
|
05/06/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall file a fast track response of no more than 12,000 words on or before May 18, 2022. (COA) | | 22-14570
|
05/14/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Respondent's Fast Track Response. (COA) | | 22-15327
|
05/31/2022 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply to Fast Track Response. (COA) | | 22-17260
|
06/01/2022 | Case Status Update | Fast Track Briefing Completed. (COA) | | |
08/17/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings on child support arrearages consistent with this order." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) | | 22-25740
|
08/17/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings on child support arrearages consistent with this order." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
09/12/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
09/12/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
09/12/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
09/12/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Original Court's Exhibit(s) 2 this day. (SC) | | 22-28392
|
09/12/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
09/23/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 19, 2022. (SC) | | 22-28392
|