Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/11/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
08/11/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-23379
|
08/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-23381
|
08/11/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Carl M. Hebert. (SC) | | |
08/12/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 21-23435
|
08/13/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC). | | 21-23602
|
09/16/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 9/16/21) (SC) | | |
09/16/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-26784
|
09/16/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (SC) | | 21-26794
|
09/16/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion for extension of time to file Civil Appeals Docketing Statement. (DOCKETING STATEMENT DETACHED AND FILED SEPARATELY PER 9/21/21 ORDER). (SC) | | 21-26920
|
09/21/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall detach the docketing statement from the motion filed on September 16, 2021, and file it separately. (SC) | | 21-27224
|
09/21/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeal. (SC) | | 21-27225
|
11/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-33749
|
11/24/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Opening Brief and Appendix. Due date January 12, 2022. (SC) | | 21-33754
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-00966
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. (SC) | | 22-00968
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. (SC) | | 22-00969
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4. (SC) | | 22-00970
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5. (SC) | | 22-00971
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6. (SC) | | 22-00972
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 7. (SC) | | 22-00973
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 8. (SC) | | 22-00974
|
01/10/2022 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 9. (SC) | | 22-00975
|
01/12/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-01288
|
02/10/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents' answering brief due: February 25, 2022. (SC) | | 22-04524
|
02/14/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE FILED ON 2/14/22) (SC) | | |
02/14/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. (SC) | | 22-04868
|
02/14/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-04890
|
02/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-04892
|
03/09/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-07555
|
03/09/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved for Reply Brief. Due date April 15, 2022. (SC) | | 22-07583
|
04/15/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 22-11988
|
04/15/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
06/01/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-17350
|
06/01/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
06/01/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
07/21/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Tao, J., concurring. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (COA) | | 22-22980
|
07/21/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Tao, J., concurring. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB (SC) | | |
08/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time for Filing a Petition for Rehearing. (COA) | | 22-24405
|
08/10/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 7, 2022, to file and serve any petition for rehearing. If no petition for rehearing is timely filed, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (COA) | | 22-25059
|
09/07/2022 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Carl M. Hebert. E-Payment Ref. no. 22090734694801. (COA) | | |
09/08/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (COA) | | 22-28155
|
10/20/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). COA- MG/JT/BB (COA) | | 22-33056
|
11/04/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time To File Petition for Review under NRAP 40B. (REJECTED PER 11/7/22 NOTICE) (COA) | | |
11/07/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (COA) | | 22-34883
|
11/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time To File Petition for Review under NRAP 40B (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL). (SC) | | |
11/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
11/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time To File Petition for Review under NRAP 40B. (SC) | | 22-34937
|
11/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
11/07/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
11/09/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until December 7, 2022, to file and serve any petition for review. If no petition for review is timely filed, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC) | | 22-35358
|
12/07/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Review. (SC) | | 22-38492
|
01/17/2023 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Order Denying Petition for Review. (SC) | | 23-01421
|
01/17/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-01431
|
01/17/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
01/27/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court County Clerk on January 19, 2022. (SC) | | 23-01431
|