Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/24/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
12/24/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-46537
|
12/24/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-46539
|
01/05/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Ryan M. Venci. (SC) | | |
01/05/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-00289
|
01/07/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick N. Chapin. (SC) | | 21-00380
|
01/25/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for April 22, 2021, at 9:00 AM. (SC) | | 21-02204
|
01/26/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-02400
|
04/22/2021 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 21-11634
|
04/23/2021 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-11761
|
08/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Documents. To date, appellant has failed to file the transcript request form and the opening brief and appendix or otherwise communicate with this court. Transcript request form and opening brief and appendix due: 14 days. (SC) | | 21-23463
|
08/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to: (1) Forgive Late Filing of Request for Transcript of Proceedings and Opening Brief and Appendix; or, Alternatively (2) Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Request for Transcript of Proceedings and Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-24922
|
08/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to: (1) Forgive Late Filing of Request for Transcript of Proceedings and Opening Brief and Appendix; or, alternatively (2) Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Request for Transcript of Proceedings and Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-24923
|
08/26/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to: (1) Forgive Late Filing of Request for Transcript of Proceedings and Opening Brief and Appendix; or, alternatively (2) Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Request for Transcript of Proceedings and Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-24933
|
09/14/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a motion to forgive the failure to timely file the transcript request form and opening brief and appendix and for an extension of time to file those documents. No motion to forgive an untimely filing is necessary and thus no action will be taken on that portion of the motion. Regarding the motion for an extension of time, the motion is denied. Transcript request form and opening brief and appendix due: 7 days. (SC) | | 21-26520
|
09/21/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/21/21). (SC) | | |
09/21/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volumes 1-5. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/21/21). (SC) | | |
09/21/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Of Rejection - No Notice Of Appearance (Thomas A. Larmore). (SC) | | 21-27311
|
09/22/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Thomas A. Larmore of Desert Ridge Legal Group (formerly known as Storm Legal Group) has joined representation with Ryan M. Venci, Danielle A. Kolkoski and Robert L. Thompson as counsel for Appellant). (SC) | | 21-27340
|
11/02/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Transcript Request Form and Opening Brief and Appendix. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to serve and file, in this court, a file-stamped transcript request form in compliance with NRAP 9(a), and the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-31520
|
11/09/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 11/9/21) (SC) | | |
11/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. | | 21-32232
|
11/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-32233
|
11/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 2. (SC) | | 21-32234
|
11/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 3. (SC) | | 21-32241
|
11/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 5. (SC) | | 21-32242
|
11/09/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix, Vol. 4. (SC) | | 21-32243
|
11/15/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 11/15/21) (SC) | | |
11/15/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 21-32775
|
01/06/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $500 or Transcript Request Form, Compliant Opening Brief due: 14 days. (SC) | | 22-00601
|
01/13/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 22-01421
|
01/13/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 22-01422
|
02/14/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 22-04991
|
02/14/2022 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix. (SC) | | 22-04994
|
04/27/2022 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC) | | |
06/06/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 22-17906
|
06/06/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
06/06/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA). | | |
08/17/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BNB (SC) | | |
08/17/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BNB (COA) | | 22-25744
|
09/12/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
09/12/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
09/12/2022 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
09/12/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 22-28360
|
09/12/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
09/22/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 13, 2022. (SC) | | 22-28360
|