Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 85051
Short Caption:ZION WOOD OBI WAN TR. VS. MMAWC, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):75596
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A764118Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Reinstated
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/29/2022 / Kohl, JamesSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/21/2022Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (SC)
07/21/2022Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC)22-22949
07/21/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Case Appeal Statement. Corrected case appeal statement due: 5 days. (SC)22-22953
07/21/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC)22-22956
07/26/2022Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Amended Case Appeal Statement. (SC)22-23541
07/28/2022Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Vince Hesser. E-Payment Ref. no. 22072827020909. (SC)
07/28/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC).22-23695
07/29/2022Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: James A. Kohl. (SC).22-23919
08/19/2022Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Docketing Statement due: September 1, 2022. (SC)22-25931
08/26/2022Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 10, 2022, at 9:00 AM. (SC)22-26857
09/07/2022MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement. (SC)22-28093
09/07/2022Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC)22-28094
09/09/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants' motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement is granted. The docketing statement was filed on September 7, 2022. (SC)22-28217
11/04/2022Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC)22-34705
11/07/2022Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC)22-35039
11/28/2022Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/08/22. To Court Reporter: Brynn Griffiths. (SC).22-37068
01/18/2023TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Brynn White stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/08/22. (SC).23-01625
02/03/2023MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Answering Brief. (SC)23-03495
02/06/2023Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Appellants' opening brief and appendix due: March 8, 2023. Respondents' answering briefs due: April 14, 2023. (SC)23-03572
03/08/2023MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request). (SC)23-07144
03/13/2023Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants shall have until March 22, 2023, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondents shall have 30 days from service of the opening brief and appendix to file and serve their answering briefs. (SC)23-07612