Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 85590
Short Caption:FRED VS. DIST. CT. (STATE, DEP'T OF PUB. SAFETY INVESTIGATION DIV.)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):80194, 86323
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 15CR003841C004, 15OC000741BClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Screening Completed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/02/2022Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis. (SC)
11/02/2022Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition and Writ of Mandamus. (SC)Y22-34498
11/02/2022AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ. (SC)22-34504
11/09/2022MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (SC)22-35431
11/09/2022BriefFiled Amicus Brief of the Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice in Support of Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Prohibition and Writ of Mandamus. (SC)22-35433
11/28/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice (NACJ) has filed a motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of respondent. The motion for leave to file an amicus brief is granted. The amicus brief was filed on November 9, 2022. (SC)22-36993
01/12/2023Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 28 days. Petitioner shall have 14 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply. (SC)23-01115
02/08/2023Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Real Party in Interest's answer to petition due: February 23, 2023. (SC)23-03841
02/23/2023Petition/WritFiled Real Part in Interest Investigation Division of the Department of Public Safety of the State of Nevada's Answer to Writ. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 2/24/23) (SC)
02/24/2023Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Answer to Petition. Due date: 5 days.(SC)23-05693
02/24/2023Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition and Writ of Mandamus. (SC)23-05752
03/10/2023Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petitioner's reply to answer to writ due: March 24, 2023. (SC)23-07439
03/17/2023Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition and Writ of Mandamus. (SC)23-08332
03/17/2023AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix to Reply to Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition and Writ of Mandamus. (SC)23-08334
03/17/2023Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/07/2023Order/ProceduralFiled Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. The parties shall have seven days from the date of this order to file a motion for disqualification pursuant to NRAP 35 based on my disclosures. (SC)23-10608