Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
07/17/2023 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
07/17/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day (A853203). (Docketing statement and notice of briefing schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 23-22695
|
07/21/2023 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Second NOA. (SC) | | 23-23446
|
07/31/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/28/2023. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins. (SC) | | 23-24551
|
08/07/2023 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. (SC) | | 23-25321
|
08/07/2023 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 23-25424
|
08/08/2023 | Other | Returned Unfiled Document. (SC) | | 23-25509
|
08/08/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Alexis Duecker. (SC) | | 23-25540
|
08/09/2023 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified Copy of Order Denying Defendant's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Filed in District Court on 8/3/2023. (SC) | | 23-25643
|
08/09/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person's Document - Motions for Extension of Time to File Rehearing and to Reinstate All Briefing Schedules in All Cases.. (SC) | | 23-25790
|
08/10/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Proper Person's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/20/2016 and 9/30/2016; 7/14/2021 to present. To Court Reporter: 8th District Court. (STRIKEN PER 8/25/23 ORDER) (SC) | | |
08/10/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person's Motion to Reinstate All Briefings and Motion to Appoint Counsel. (SC) | | 23-25920
|
08/10/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Appoint Counsel. (SC) | | 23-25929
|
08/25/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. Appellant's appointed counsel, Alexis M. Duecker, has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for appellant.The motion does not include an affidavit or statement signed by appellant confirming that he "wants to proceed without counsel or with substitute counsel retained by defendant," or any explanation for that omission, as required by NRAP 46(d)(3)(B). The motion is therefore denied. No cause appearing, appellant's "Motions [sic] for Extension of Time to File Rehearing and to Reinstate All Briefing Schedules in All Cases," "Motion to Reinstate All Briefings and Motion to Appoint Counsel," and "Motion to Appoint Counsel" are denied. The clerk shall strike the transcript request form filed pro se on August 10, 2023. Appellant shall proceed through counsel. (SC) | | 23-27861
|
09/05/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Alexis Duecker. (SC) | | 23-28871
|
09/15/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's appointed counsel, Alexis M. Duecker, has filed a motion to withdraw as counsel for appellant. The motion to withdraw is denied. (SC) | | 23-30231
|
10/09/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Emergency Letter of Motion in Ex Parte on a Hearing Requested.(SC) | | |
10/13/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Motion. Renewed Emergency Letter of Motion in Ex Parte Oral Arguments Req. "Hearing Requested". (SC) | | |
10/17/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Documents. (SC) | | 23-33889
|
11/02/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals and Regarding Briefing. As Docket No. 86972 and Docket No. 87443 involve the same issues on appeal, the appeals are hereby consolidated. The consolidated appeals shall proceed through counsel of record in, and with the briefing schedule set forth in, Docket No. 86972. Nos. 86972/87443. (SC) | | 23-35694
|
11/14/2023 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's opening brief and appendix due: November 28, 2023. Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-36972
|
11/28/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Reconsideration or Alternatively, Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Third Request) Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-38587
|
12/11/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Directing Transmission of Record. The motion to withdraw as counsel of record filed by appellant's counsel on November 28, 2023, is granted. The clerk of this court shall remove Alexis M. Duecker and SDS Chartered, LLC as counsel of record for appellant, and appellant shall proceed pro se. District court record due: 30 days. Appellant's opening brief due: 90 days. (SC) | | 23-39984
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - C357927 RELATED CASE A853203 - VOL 1 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40788
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Volumes 1-14 Nos. 86972/87443 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40842
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - C357927 RELATED CASE A853203 - VOL 3 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40791
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal C357927 RELATED CASE A853203 - VOL 2 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40792
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - C357927 RELATED CASE A853203 - VOL 4 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40793
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - C357927 RELATED CASE A853203 - VOL 5 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40794
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - C357927 RELATED CASE A853203 - VOL 6 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40795
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal C357927 RELATED CASE A853203 - VOL 8 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40796
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal C357927 RELATED CASE A853203 - VOL 7 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40798
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - C357927 RELATED CASE A853203 - VOL 1 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40801
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - C357927 RELATED CASE A853203 - VOL 2 PT 1 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40803
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - C357927 RELATED CASE A853203 - VOL 3 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40804
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - C357927 RELATED CASE A853203 - VOL 4 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40805
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - C357927 RELATED CASE A853203 - VOL 5 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40806
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - C357927 RELATED CASE A853203 - VOL 6 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40807
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal C357927 RELATED CASE A853203 - VOL 7 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40809
|
12/15/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - C357927 RELATED CASE A853203 - VOL 8 Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 23-40810
|
12/22/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Filed District Court Documents. Document: (Sealed)(Nos. 86972 Consolidated with 87443)
Added to Record on Appeal as pages:2993 to 2997 and 3004 to 3008. | | |
12/22/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Filed Filed District Court Documents. Document: (Sealed)(Nos. 86972 Consolidated with 87443)
Added to Record on Appeal as pages:13 to 35, 76 to 78 and 1804 to 1806.(SC) | | |
12/22/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Filed Filed District Court Documents. Document: (Sealed)(Nos. 86972 Consolidated with 87443)
Added to Record on Appeal as pages:86 to 93.(SC) | | |
12/22/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed (SEALED) Confidential District Court Documents. Added to Record on Appeal as pages: 13-35, 76-78, and 1804-1806. Nos. 86972/87443. (SC) | | |
12/22/2023 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed (SEALED) Confidential District Court Documents. Added to Record on Appeal as pages: 2993-2997 and 3004-3008. Nos. 86972/87443. (SC) | | |
01/10/2024 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion - Objection and Opposition to Order Granting Motion and Directing Transmission of Record Filed December 11, 2023. Nos. 86972/87443. (SC) | | 24-01053
|
01/18/2024 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Informal Brief Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 24-02087
|
01/24/2024 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Emergency Motion for Appointment of the Unit for The Investigation and Prosecution of Crimes Against Vulnerable Persons. Nos. 86972/87443(SC) | | 24-02759
|
01/24/2024 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion Emergency Response to Order Filed December 11, 2023. Nos. 86972/87443(SC) | | 24-02762
|
02/02/2024 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Petition to Establish Actual Innocence. (SC) | | 24-04147
|
03/06/2024 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC) | | |
03/29/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The relief requested by appellant in documents filed on January 10, 2024; January 24, 2024; and February 2, 2024, is denied. Nos. 86972/87443 (SC) | | 24-11322
|