Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/17/2022 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal. (SC) | | |
06/17/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 22-19297
|
06/21/2022 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Minutes. (SC) | | 22-19575
|
07/01/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Attorney General to Obtain and Transmit Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal Log or Other Log Maintained by the Prison. Due: 30 days. (SC) | | 22-20808
|
08/01/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. The Nevada Attorney General shall have until August 15, 2022, to file and serve the notice of appeal log or other log maintained by the prison. (SC) | | 22-24081
|
08/01/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Emergency Motion to Stay the Remittitur pending Application to the Supreme Court of the United States for a Writ of Certiorari. (SC) | | 22-24109
|
08/12/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for Jaimie A. Stilz. (SC) | | 22-25292
|
08/12/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice to Order to Obtain and Transmit Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal Log or Other Log. (SC) | | 22-25294
|
08/24/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for a Joinder in Appeals. (SC) | | 22-26472
|
08/26/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing, Directing Transmission of the Record on Appeal, and Deny Motion. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal. Appellant's pro se motion to stay issuance of the remittitur is denied as premature because no disposition has been entered in this matter. (SC). | | 22-26833
|
09/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Emergency Motion pursuant to NRAP 27(e) as a Continued and Retroactive Joinder of Merited Intervention Worthy of Upmost Attension. (SC) | | 22-28054
|
09/12/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed, pro se, a "joinder of appeals." To the extent appellant requests the appointment of counsel and the production of documents, the request is denied. Any other relief requested in the joinder is also denied. (SC) | | 22-28480
|
09/19/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed, in pro se, an "Emergency Motion Pursuant to NRAP 27(e) as a Continued and Retroactive Joinder of Merited Intervention Worthy of the Utmost Attention." The motion does not comply with the requirements for an emergency motion under NRAP 27(e) and thus is not treated as an emergency. Any relief requested in the motion is denied. (SC) | | 22-29356
|
09/20/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (C357927) Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-29496
|
09/20/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (C357927) Vol. 2. (SC) | | 22-29497
|
09/20/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (C357927) Vol. 3. (SC) | | 22-29500
|
09/20/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (A-22-853203-W) Vol. 1. (SC) | | 22-29502
|
09/20/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (A-22-853203-W) Vol. 2. (SC) | | 22-29505
|
09/20/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (A-22-853203-W) Vol. 3. (SC) | | 22-29507
|
09/21/2022 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Document in regards to the August 26, 2022 Order (An Emergency Notice of Formal Objection to Chief Justice Parraguirre). (SC) | | 22-29666
|
09/21/2022 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Document (Emergency Intervention). (SC) | | 22-29667
|
09/26/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (SEALED) pages 13-35 and 76-78. (SC) | | |
09/26/2022 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. (SEALED) pages 86-93. (SC) | | |
09/28/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Emergency Intervention and Motion to Compel. (SC) | | 22-30436
|
09/28/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Emergency Ex Parte En Banc as a Letter of Motion and Renewed Petition for a Writ of Mandamus and other Interpleadings not Limited to a Meritorious Intervention. (SC) | | 22-30438
|
10/03/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has now filed "emergency" pro se objections in which he states that he has no issue with the order but explains that he has never participated in a PSI interview or been provided with a PSI. Appellant requests an intervention and an order setting hearing de novo. The motion is denied. (SC) | | 22-31091
|
10/05/2022 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. Transcripts Requested: 9/20/16, 9/30/16, and 7/14/21. (SC) | | 22-31384
|
10/10/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed a pro se "Emergency Intervention and Motion to Compel Regarding Events Not Limited to that of December 27, 2021, as Renewed Request for De Novo in Order to Reset Time for Proper Notice to the Supreme Court of Nevada and it's Court of Appeals" and an "Emergency Ex Parte En Banc as a Letter of Motion and Renewed Petition for a Writ of Mandamus and Other Interpleadings Not Limited to a Meritorious Intervention. Appellant should include any such argument in his opening brief or informal brief. Any other relief requested within the documents is denied. (SC) | | 22-31846
|
10/25/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Emergency Ex Parte Motion for the Appointment of Counsel on Appeal. (SC) | | 22-33520
|
10/25/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Emergency Motion under NRAP 27(e), Pursuant to NRAP 2 as a Retroactive "Joinder of Appeal" in it's Meritorious Intervention of Prima Facie Worthiness. (SC) | | 22-33526
|
11/04/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. Appellant's pro se motion for the appointment of counsel is denied at this time. Appellant's pro se "Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e), Pursuant to NRAP 2 as a Retroactive 'Joinder of Appeal' in it's Meritorious Intervention of Prima Facie Worthiness" is also denied. (SC) | | 22-34715
|
11/04/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney for Aaron D. Ford. (SC) | | 22-34836
|
11/14/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk shall remove Jaimie Stilz as counsel of record for respondent. Respondent remains represented by Attorney General Aaron Ford and the Clark County District Attorney. To the extent Stilz suggests that the Attorney General also be removed as counsel, this court declines to do so as the State of Nevada is an interested party in this matter. (SC) | | 22-35679
|
12/05/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Emergency Motion for the Production of Transcripts. (SC) | | 22-38140
|
12/07/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Emergency Motion for production of Documents. (SC) | | 22-38497
|
12/08/2022 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Emergency Ex-Parte En Banc Motion for the Appointment of Counsel. (SC). | | 22-38622
|
12/15/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. Appellant has filed a pro se motion for the production of transcripts. The motion is denied at this time. Appellant has also filed pro se motions that appear to ask (1) that this court direct the district court to provide him with copies of certain documents and (2) for the appointment of counsel. The motions are denied at this time. (SC) | | 22-39301
|
01/11/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document "Emergency Interpleading's and Motion to Compel" (SC). | | 23-00893
|
01/11/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document "Motion to Expedite Appeal" (SC). | | 23-00894
|
01/11/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document "Motion to Expedite Case." (SC). | | 23-00896
|
01/11/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document "Motion to Expedite Briefing." (SC). | | 23-00897
|
01/11/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document "Motion for Production of Complete Case Transcripts." (SC). | | 23-00900
|
01/18/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document "ExParte Emergency Response." (SC). | | 23-01745
|
01/20/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. Appellant has filed five pro se motions containing various requests for relief. All requests for relief in the motions are denied. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief or an informal brief for pro se parties. (SC) | | 23-01971
|
01/27/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's pro se motion for reconsideration of this court's December 15, 2022, order is denied. (SC) | | 23-02681
|
01/31/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Compel an Answer From Aaron D. Ford. (SC). | | 23-02954
|
01/31/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed, in pro se, a document entitled "Emergency Letter of Motion." Attached thereto is what appears to be appellant's opening brief. The clerk shall detach the opening brief from the "Emergency Letter of Motion" filed on January 31, 2023, and file it separately. Respondent shall have until March 2, 2023, to file and serve any answering brief. Any relief requested within the "Emergency Letter of Motion" is denied. (SC) | | 23-03034
|
01/31/2023 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Opening Brief. (SC) | | 23-03035
|
02/07/2023 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief(s) III. (SC). | | 23-03666
|
02/07/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time and Emergency Motion Under EJDC A-17-758861-C and NRAP 27(e) to Compel an Answer from Respondents not Limited to Aaron Ford, Alexander Chen and Bernstein and Poisson. (SC). | | 23-03671
|
02/10/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Appellant's Opening Brief and Renewed Request for Transcripts as a Motion for Extension of Time and Continued Motion for Reinstatement of all Briefing Schedules in all Case of Matthew Travis Houston. (SC). | | 23-04126
|
02/13/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document "Emergency Motion for Reconsideration Under EJDC No. A-17-758861-C." (PER 2/17/23, DETACHED DOCUMENTS AND MAILED BACK UNFILED) (SC). | | 23-04277
|
02/13/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's pro se motion filed on February 7, 2023, is denied. (SC) | | 23-04306
|
02/15/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Appellant's Proper Person Document "Motion to Stay Remittitur, Motion for an Order to Suppress Hearing from December 6th, 2021 and Motion for an order to Taleen Pandukht to read Direct Appeal and Factual Evidence". (SC) | | 23-04711
|
02/17/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant has filed, in pro se, documents that purport to be an opening brief and motions requesting various forms of relief. Attached to the documents are a law library check out request form, inmate request forms, and a petition and supplemental petition for review of decisions of the Court of Appeals in other appeals. The clerk shall detach these documents from the opening briefs filed February 10 and 13, 2023, and return them unfiled. Any relief requested in the February 10 and 13, 2023, documents is denied. Appellant's pro se motion filed on February 15, 2023, is also denied. (SC) | | 23-04970
|
02/28/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Notice of Appearance for John. T. Afshar. (SC) | | 23-06002
|
02/28/2023 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 23-06004
|
03/01/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion to Appoint Counsel. (SC). | | 23-06104
|
03/01/2023 | Transcript Request | Filed Proper Person Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/20/16, 09/30/16, 07/14/21 To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC). | | 23-06108
|
03/01/2023 | Motion | Filed Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Consolidate all Appeals of Matthew Travis Houston. (SC). | | 23-06110
|
03/09/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. Appellant's pro se motions to appoint counsel and to consolidate all pending appeals are denied. (SC) | | 23-07202
|
03/20/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person's Motion "Ex Parte Certificate for Payment of Reparations and Emergency Status Check." (SC) | | 23-08463
|
03/20/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document "Emergency Supplement and Ex Parte Motion to Consolidate" (SC) | | 23-08468
|
03/20/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Filed Proper Person Notice of Formal Objection and Response. (SC). | | 23-08569
|
03/20/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document "Notice of Formal Objection and Ex Parte Emergency Declaration of Default Judgments Regarding Defendants No,. 82 No.83 and No. 84. (SC). | | 23-08577
|
03/22/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person's Motion "For Enlargement of Time to File a Continued Response". (SC) | | 23-08842
|
03/23/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion "for En Banc Reconsideration under NRAP 40" (SC) | | 23-08939
|
03/28/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document "Emergency Status Check." (SC). | | 23-09440
|
03/31/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Any and all relief requested in the pro se documents filed on March 20, 22, 23, and 28, 2023, is denied. (SC) | | 23-09933
|
04/04/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion "To Compel an Answer from Aaron D. Ford and Status Check in All Cases" (SC) | | 23-10307
|
04/05/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person "Motion to Exceed Page Limits and Appellant's Response to John T. Afshar and Brian P. Clark Part 2". (SC) | | 23-10425
|
04/06/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Any relief requested in appellant's pro se motion filed on April 4, 2023, is denied. The clerk shall provide appellant a copy of the docket sheet in this matter. (SC) | | 23-10473
|
04/07/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person "Supplemental Brief" (SC) | | 23-10697
|
04/12/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. Appellant has filed pro se documents in which he appears to ask this court to consider several attached exhibits. The documents are treated as motions. The motions are denied. This court will not consider the exhibits attached to appellant's April 5 and 7, 2023, filings. Any other relief requested in the filings is denied. (SC) | | 23-11315
|
04/13/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person "Motion for an Extension of Time to File Answering Brief's and Motion for Reconsideration in All Cases, Specifically 23-09933". (SC) | | 23-11401
|
04/14/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for the Appointment of Counsel. (SC) | | 23-11512
|
04/21/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's pro se motions for the appointment of counsel are denied at this time. Any other relief requested in the motions is also denied. (SC) | | 23-12478
|
04/25/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document "Emergency Letter of Motion." (Supplemental Reply Brief Attached). (SC). | | 23-12840
|
05/02/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person's Petition for Rehearing and Motion for Clarification Under NRAP 3C/27E. (SC) | | 23-13698
|
05/02/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person's Motion to Exceed Page Limit and Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 23-13719
|
05/05/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Any relief requested in the pro se documents filed on April 25, 2023, and May 2, 2023, is denied. (SC) | | 23-14222
|
05/19/2023 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Emergency Motion to Vacate Affirmation. (SC) | | 23-15862
|
05/19/2023 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC) | | |
05/25/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's May 19, 2023, "emergency letter of motion?request for documents," which appears to request parts of the district court record from district court and court of appeals law clerks, does not appear to seek relief from this court. Any request for relief from this court contained therein is denied. (SC) | | 23-16470
|
05/31/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document "Motion for Clarification." (SC). | | 23-16979
|
06/01/2023 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person's Document - Emergency Objection to Page Number Eleven of Respondent's Answering Brief Filed February 28th, 2023, in Case Number 84886. (SC) | | 23-17270
|
06/06/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's pro se motion for clarification does not appear to seek any relief from this court. Accordingly, this court takes no action on the motion. Appellant has also filed a pro se objection to a portion of the answering brief. The objection relates to the merits of the appeal. Accordingly, it is treated as a supplemental reply brief and will be considered at the time of disposition of this appeal. (SC) | | 23-17887
|
06/30/2023 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 23-20972
|
06/30/2023 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
07/27/2023 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part and Dismissing in Part. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED in part and DISMISSED in part." fn1 [ We have reviewed the document that Houston filed with this court on July 25, 2023, and we conclude no relief is warranted.] COA-MG/BB/DW (SC) | | |
08/30/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Motions. Appellant has filed a pro se motion for an extension of time to file a petition for rehearing en banc. The motion is granted to the following extent. Appellant's petition for rehearing or petition for review due: September 13, 2023. Any other relief requested in the motion is denied. The clerk shall file this order in this court and the Supreme Court. This court takes no action on appellant's pro se transcript request form at this time. Appellant's pro se motions filed on August 10 and 21, 2023, are denied. (SC) | | 23-28471
|
09/20/2023 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals.(SC) | | |
09/20/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-30864
|
09/20/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) | | |
10/02/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 09/21/23. (SC) | | 23-30864
|
10/19/2023 | Other | Returned Proper Person's Unfiled Document. (SC) | | 23-34115
|