Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/13/2024 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
08/13/2024 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 24-28465
|
08/13/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 7 days. (SC) | | 24-28467
|
08/13/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Law Firm Affiliation for Jeffrey F. Barr. (SC) | | 24-28495
|
08/13/2024 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Reno Carson Messenger Service (Jeffrey Barr). Check no. 1207. (SC) | | |
08/14/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 14 days. Docketing Statement due: 21 days. Opening brief due: 120 days. (SC) | | 24-28767
|
08/16/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellants' (Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee) Unopposed Motion to Expedite Appeal. (SC) | | 24-29242
|
08/20/2024 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Joint Docketing Statement. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED ON 8/21/24) (SC) | | |
08/20/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Expedite. Appellants filed an unopposed motion for expedited briefing. Having reviewed the motion to expedite, it is granted. Appellants shall have until August 23, 2024, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondents shall have until September 13, 2024, to file and serve answering briefs. Appellants shall file any reply brief by September 20, 2024. The clerk of this court shall schedule this appeal for oral argument before the full court on the next available calendar date in October 2024, and this court will expedite its consideration of this matter to the extent that its docket permits. (SC) | | 24-29615
|
08/21/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Striking Deficient Document. Order Striking Deficient Docketing Statement. Corrected Docketing Statement due: 7 days from the date of this order. (SC) | | 24-29794
|
08/21/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument would be of assistance in resolving the issues presented in this matter. Accordingly, oral argument is scheduled for October 8, 2024, at 10:00 a.m., in Carson City. The parties shall have 2 minutes of uninterrupted argument at the beginning of each side's presentation in addition to 15 minutes each of argument time. The argument shall be limited to a total of 34 minutes. (SC) | | 24-29915
|
08/23/2024 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. (SC). | | 24-30244
|
08/23/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) | | 24-30349
|
08/23/2024 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix to Opening Brief- Vols. 1 and 2. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED ON 8/26/24) (SC) | | |
08/23/2024 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellants' Amended Joint Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 24-30351
|
08/23/2024 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellants' Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/2/2024. To Court Reporter: Deposition Solutions, LLC. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC) | | 24-30353
|
08/23/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' Notice of Completion and Delivery of Transcripts. (SC) | | 24-30354
|
08/26/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Striking Deficient Document. Order Striking Deficient Joint Appendix Volumes 1 and 2. Corrected Joint Appendix due: 7 days from the date of this order. (SC) | | 24-30599
|
08/27/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' (Vet Voice Foundation and the Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans) Notice of Appearance for David Fox. (SC) | | 24-30703
|
09/03/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Indexes to Appellants' Joint Appendix to Opening Brief. (SC) | | 24-31780
|
09/03/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 1. (SC) | | 24-31785
|
09/03/2024 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Joint Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 2. (SC) | | 24-31789
|
09/12/2024 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 24-33488
|
09/13/2024 | Brief | Filed Respondents' (Vet Voice Foundation and Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans) Intervenor- Answering Brief. (SC) | | 24-33843
|
09/13/2024 | Brief | Filed Respondents' (Francisco Aguilar and State of Nevada, Lorena Portillo, Lynn Marie Goya, Jan Galassini, and Cari-Ann Burgess) Answering Brief. (SC) | | 24-33876
|
09/16/2024 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 24-34087
|
09/20/2024 | Motion | Filed Motion - KTVN Media Request for Oral Argument. (SC) | | 24-34926
|
09/20/2024 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC) | | 24-34947
|
09/23/2024 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. (SC) | | |
09/24/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Media Request. A request having been made by Amy Serrano with KTVN 2 News seeking access to the Supreme Court oral arguments for the purpose of photographic or electronic coverage of the hearing to be held on October 8, 2024, beginning at 10:00 a.m., in the Carson City courtroom, in the above-entitled matter; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings, for news purposes and not for commercial exploitation. (SC) | | 24-35273
|
09/24/2024 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 24-35416
|
09/25/2024 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 24-35524
|
09/25/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' (Vet Voice Foundation and the Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans) Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument for David Fox. (SC) | | 24-35661
|
09/26/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' (Lorena Portillo and Lynn Marie Goya) Notice of Appearance of Counsel at Oral Argument for Claudia Aguayo. (SC) | | 24-35863
|
09/26/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' (Francisco Aguilar and State of Nevada) Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument for Laena St. Jules. (SC) | | 24-35926
|
09/27/2024 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. (SC) | | 24-36058
|
09/27/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' (Cari-Ann Burgess and Jan Galassini) Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument for Herbert Kaplan. (SC) | | 24-36139
|
09/30/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellants' (Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Scott Johnston, and Republican National Committee) Unopposed Motion to Associate Counsel for Chris Murray. (SC) | | 24-36274
|
09/30/2024 | Motion | Filed Appellants' (Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Scott Johnston, and Republican National Committee) Unopposed Motion to Associate Counsel for Michael Francisco. (SC) | | 24-36275
|
10/01/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant Republican National Committee has filed motions to associate foreign attorneys Michael Francisco and Chrostopher O. Murray. Attached to the motions are copies of district court orders admitting these attorneys to practice in the underlying matter. Accordingly, a motion to associate in this court is not necessary. The motions are treated as notices of appearance and approved. The clerk shall add Mr. Francisco and Mr. Murray as counsel of record for Republican National Committee. (SC) | | 24-36623
|
10/03/2024 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries for 9/30/2024. (SC) | | 24-37121
|
10/08/2024 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC) | | |
10/11/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' (Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Scott Johnston, and Republican National Committee) Rule 31(e) Notice of Supplemental Authority. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED ON 10/14/24) (SC) | | |
10/14/2024 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Striking Deficient Document. Order Striking Deficient Supplemental Authority. Corrected Supplemental Authority due: 7 days from the date of this order. (SC) | | 24-38533
|
10/15/2024 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellants' (Donald J. Trump for President 2024, Inc., Scott Johnston, and Republican National Committee) Rule 31(e) Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 24-38831
|
10/16/2024 | Brief | Filed Respondents' (Vet Voice Foundation and Nevada Alliance for Retired Americans) Intervenor-Respondents' Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC) | | 24-38980
|
10/28/2024 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Herndon, J., concurring: Pickering, J., concurring in the result only. En Banc. (SC) | | 24-40423
|
11/20/2024 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur.(SC) | | 24-44122
|
11/20/2024 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC) | | |
01/15/2025 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on 1/10/25. (SC) | | 24-44122
|