Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/18/2004 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
10/18/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 04-19285
|
12/09/2004 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: September 10, 2004. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. | | 04-22491
|
01/05/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This is an appeal from an order of the district court denying appellant's post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus in a capital case. On November 29, 2004, appellant submitted an untimely transcript request form and docketing statement. Appellant's counsel was requested to file an appropriate motion for an extension of time. To date, appellant has failed to file the requisite motion. In the interest of judicial efficiency, we direct the clerk to file the late transcript request form and docketing statement. We admonish appellant's counsel for failing to file an appropriate motion for leave to file the late documents. | | 05-00285
|
01/05/2005 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 04-21666
|
01/05/2005 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: September 10, 2004. To Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn.
(The Transcript of 09/10/04 was filed on 12/09/04). | | 04-21668
|
02/09/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 05-02619
|
02/14/2005 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed on 12/01/04; Notice of Entry of Order filed on 12/15/04. Due Date: 10 days | | |
02/16/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed February 9, 2005. Appellant shall have until March 11, 2005, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | | 05-03108
|
02/22/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on 12/1/04. | | 05-03461
|
02/22/2005 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: 12/15/04. | | 05-03462
|
03/14/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. 45 days requested. | | 05-04963
|
03/25/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed March 14, 2005. Appellant shall have until April 25, 2005, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NARP 31(a)(1). | | 05-05889
|
04/21/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 05-07825
|
05/03/2005 | Brief | Received Opening Brief. | | 05-08651
|
05/03/2005 | Appendix | Received Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. | | 05-08652
|
05/03/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed April 21, 2005. The clerk shall file the appendix received on May 3, 2005. However, the clerk shall not file the 46-page opening brief provisionally submitted on May 3, 2005, pending the filing and resolution of a motion for leave to file a brief in excess of 30 pages. | | 05-08693
|
05/03/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 and 2. | | 05-08652
|
05/04/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Opening Brief. | | 05-08736
|
05/19/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. to file an opening brief in excess of 30 pages. The clerk shall file the 46-page opening brief received on May 3, 2005. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | | 05-09825
|
05/19/2005 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 05-08651
|
06/22/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 50 pages. | | 05-12303
|
06/22/2005 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 05-12304
|
07/22/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 05-14555
|
07/29/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed July 22, 2005. Appellant shall have until August 22, 2005, to file and serve the reply brief. | | 05-15094
|
08/23/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 05-16668
|
08/24/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant's counsel shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this court should not summarily reject those assignments of district court error for which counsel has failed to provide a record sufficient to enable this court to review and consider the issue presented. Alternatively, appellant's counsel shall have 30 days to file a supplemental appendix. We grant appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief. Appellant's counsel shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the reply brief. | | 05-16815
|
09/06/2005 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause filed on August 24, 2005. | | 05-17484
|
09/26/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief and Supplemental Appendix. | | 05-19023
|
09/27/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed September 26, 2005. Counsel shall have to and including September 30, 2005, to file and serve the reply brief and supplemental appendix. | | 05-19120
|
09/28/2005 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice to the Court Regarding Supplemental Appendix. | | 05-19196
|
09/28/2005 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 05-19197
|
09/28/2005 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Reply Brief. Vols. 1 through 20. | | 05-19198
|
09/28/2005 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
10/03/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Supplemental Briefing on Retroactivity Issue. | | 05-19610
|
10/03/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File Amended Brief. | | 05-19612
|
10/18/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed October 3, 2005. The clerk shall file the amended answering brief submitted on October 3, 2005. Appellant shall have 20 days to file and serve a supplemental brief of not more than 20 pages. The State shall have 20 days thereafter to file and serve a 20 page supplemental answering brief. Upon the filing of the supplemental answering brief, this appeal shall stand submitted for decision without oral argument unless otherwise ordered by this court. | | 05-20603
|
10/18/2005 | Brief | Filed Amended Brief. Amended Respondent's Answring Brief. | | 05-19613
|
11/08/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of time to file Supplemental Brief. | | 05-22042
|
11/14/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Supplemental brief due: December 7, 2005. | | 05-22323
|
12/12/2005 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief. | | 05-24242
|
12/22/2005 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the supplemental brief received on December 13, 2005. Respondent shall have 20 days to file and serve a supplemental answering brief of not more than 20 pages. | | 05-24915
|
12/22/2005 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Brief as Ordered by this Court. | | 05-24283
|
01/17/2006 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 06-01106
|
02/15/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 06-03322
|
02/23/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Counsel for appellant filed a motion requesting an extension of time to file a supplemental reply brief. The motion makes no attempt to demonstrate why a supplemental reply brief is necessary. Appellant's motion is hereby denied. | | 06-04093
|
03/16/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Oral Argument. We consolidate these appeals for the limited purpose of hearing oral argument. The clerk shall schedule the appeals for oral argument before the en banc court in June 2006 in Carson City. The oral argument shall be limited to a total of 60 minutes. Nos. 44094/44297 - consolidated for the limited purpose of hearing oral argument. | | 06-05696
|
04/21/2006 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 60 minutes in Carson City on June 13, 2006, at 1:30 p.m. (En Banc) | | |
05/09/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Continue Oral Argument Set for June 13, 2006. | | 06-09723
|
05/12/2006 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Continue Oral Argument. | | 06-10041
|
05/24/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. These appeals were previously consolidated for the purpose of oral argument before the en banc court. We deny the motion to reschedule the oral argument in this court. The oral sixty minute argument currently set for June 13, 2006, in Carson City, shall proceed as scheduled. Nos. 44094/44297 - consolidated for oral argument. | | 06-10997
|
05/30/2006 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | |
05/31/2006 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Authorities. Per NRAP 31(d). Nos. 44094/44297 - consolidated for oral argument only. | | 06-11406
|
06/13/2006 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. EN BANC | | |
11/16/2006 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Hardesty, J. I concur: Parraguirre, J. Becker, J., with whom Douglas, J., agrees, concurring in part and dissenting in part. Rose, C.J., with whom Maupin and Gibbons, JJ., agree, concurring in part and dissenting in part. 122 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 93. EN BANC. | | 06-23502
|
12/05/2006 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 06-24798
|
12/08/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed December 5, 2006. Petition for Rehearing due: 5 days. (faxed order to Christopher Oram) | | 06-25102
|
12/11/2006 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. | | 06-25217
|
12/22/2006 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). Fn1[The Honorable Robert E. Rose, Chief Justice and the Honorable Nancy A. Becker, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] | | 06-26298
|
01/16/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 07-01058
|
01/16/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
01/22/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 19, 2007. | | 07-01058
|
08/06/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. to Recall the Remittitur. | | 07-17264
|
08/10/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. State's Opposition to Motion to Recall Remittitur. | | 07-17718
|
08/17/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to file Reply and Reply to State's Opposition to Motion to Recall Remittitur. | | 07-18210
|
09/11/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. to Recall the Remittitur. This court has already denied rehearing in this appeal, and Rippo has not alleged any misapprehension of fact or law that would warrant rehearing at this juncture. Accordingly, the motion is denied. fn1[On August 17, 2007, Rippo filed a motion for leave to file a reply to the State's opposition. Cause appearing, the motion is granted.] | | 07-20016
|
09/11/2007 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. | | |