Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/11/2021 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
02/11/2021 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 21-04115
|
02/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 21-04118
|
02/11/2021 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from John R. Bailey. (SC) | | |
02/11/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellants - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 21-04159
|
02/16/2021 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellants: 14 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief. (SC) | | 21-04475
|
02/16/2021 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 21-04553
|
02/22/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (John R. Bailey, Dennis L. Kennedy, Sarah E. Harmon and Joseph A. Liebman of the law firm Bailey Kennedy hereby enter their appearance as counsel of record for appellants). (SC) | | 21-05179
|
02/24/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata to Notice of Appearance. (SC) | | 21-05420
|
02/24/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondents' Notice of Appearance for Mark E. Ferrario, Donald L. Prunty, and Tami D. Cowden. (SC) | | 21-05483
|
03/02/2021 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate That No Transcript is Being Requested. (SC) | | 21-06080
|
03/05/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Consolidate (Nos. 82467/82552). (SC) | | 21-06518
|
03/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Opposition to Motion to Consolidate and Countermotion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 21-07316
|
03/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Reply in Support of Appellants' Motion to Consolidate; and Response to Respondents' Counter-Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC) | | 21-07986
|
04/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellants in Docket No. 82467 have filed motions to consolidate that appeal with the petition for a writ of mandamus in Docket No. 82552. Respondents in Docket No. 82467 oppose the motion to consolidate and have filed a countermotion to dismiss the appeal for lack of jurisdiction. This court defers ruling on the motion to dismiss. The motion for consolidation is granted. Having reviewed the writ petition and supporting documents in Docket No. 82552, it appears that an answer may assist this court in resolving the matter. Appellants/petitioners shall have until June 16, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 82467. Respondents/real parties in interest shall have 30 days from service of the opening brief to file and serve a combined answer to the writ petition in Docket No. 82552 and answering brief in Docket No. 82467. Appellants/petitioners shall have 30 days from service of the combined answer/answering brief within which to file and serve any combined reply to the answer and reply brief on appeal. Nos 82467/82552. (SC) | | 21-10395
|
06/14/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-17020
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. Nos. 82467/82552(SC) | | 21-17025
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 2. Nos. 82467/82552(SC) | | 21-17024
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 3. Nos. 82467/82552(SC) | | 21-17026
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 4. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-17029
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 5. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-17028
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 6. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-17030
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 7. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-17031
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 8. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-17033
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol.9 . Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-17035
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 10. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-17036
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 11. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-17037
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 12. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-17038
|
06/14/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 13. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-17041
|
07/01/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants/Petitioners' Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 82467/82552. (SC) | | 21-18945
|
07/08/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Response to Motion Joint Opposition to Motion to Consolidate. (82467/82552/83135) Nos. 82467/82552. (SC) | | 21-19697
|
07/13/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondents/real parties in interest shall have until July 28, 2021, to file and serve their combined answering brief in Docket No. 82467 and answer to writ petition in Docket No. 82552. Nos. 82467/82552. (SC) | | 21-20067
|
07/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 82457/82552. (SC) | | 21-20430
|
07/28/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Daniel F. Polsenberg, Joel D. Henriod and Abraham G. Smith of Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP appear as counsel for Barbara D. Richardson). Nos. 82467/82552. (SC) | | 21-21935
|
07/28/2021 | Brief | Filed Joint Combined Answering Brief (In Docket No. 82467) and Answer to Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief (In Docket No. 82552). Nos. 82467/82552. (SC) | | 21-21937
|
07/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondents' Appendix - Volume 1. Nos. 82467/82552. (SC) | | 21-21938
|
07/30/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. Appellants/petitioners.in these matters have filed motions to consolidate the petition in Docket No. 83135 with the consolidated appeal and writ petition in Docket Nos. 82467 and 82552. The motion is denied at this time. 82467/82552/83135. (SC) | | 21-22231
|
08/25/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellants' reply brief in Docket No. 82467 and reply to answer in Docket No. 82552 due: September 10, 2021. (SC) | | 21-24763
|
09/10/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellants/Petitioners' Motion to Seal Exhibit 2 in Volume 1 of 2 of the Reply Appendix. Nos. 82467/82552. (SC) | | 21-26313
|
09/10/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellants/Petitioners' Reply in Support of (1) Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief (No. 82552), and (2) Appellants' Opening Brief (No. 82467). Nos. 82467/82552. (SC) | | 21-26318
|
09/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants/Petitioners' Reply Appendix - Volume 1 of 2. Nos. 82467/82552. (SC) | | 21-26319
|
09/10/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's/Petitioners' Reply Appendix - Volume 2 of 2. Nos. 82467/82552. (SC) | | 21-26320
|
09/13/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 82467/82552. (SC) | | |
09/16/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Errata to Certificate of Service for: (A) Appellants/Petitioners' Reply in Support of (1) Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief (No. 82552), and (2) Appellants' Opening Brief (No.82467); (B) Reply Appendix (Volumes 1 and 2); (C) Appellants/Petitioners' Motion to Seal Exhibit 2 in Volume 1 of 2 of the Reply Appendix; and (D) Exhibit 2 in Volume 1 of 2 of the Reply Appendix (Proposed for Filing Under Seal). Nos. 82467/82552. (SC) | | 21-26903
|
09/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellants/petitioners' unopposed motion for leave to file a portion of the reply appendix under seal is granted. SRCR 3(4)(f), (g). The clerk shall file the portion of the appendix received on September 13, 2021, under seal. Nos. 82467/82552. (SC) | | 21-27868
|
09/28/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellants/Petitioners' Reply Appendix - Exhibit 2 to Volume 1 of 2 (SEALED). Nos. 82467/82552. (SC) | | |
10/12/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent (Pro Hac Vice) Michael P. McNamara Notice of Change of Address. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-29296
|
11/17/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion to Stay Related District Court Action Pending Resolution of Appeal and/or Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-33033
|
11/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Stay. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-33872
|
12/03/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Real party in interest/respondent Barbara D. Richardson's motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to the motion for stay is granted. Richardson shall have until December 8, 2021, to file and serve any opposition. fn1 [We note that while the motion was purportedly filed on behalf of all respondents/real parties in interest, it was not signed by counsel of record for those parties. Thus, no action will be taken on the motion to the extent it seeks relief on behalf of those parties.] Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-34533
|
12/08/2021 | Motion | Filed Real Parties in Interest Opposition to Motion for Stay. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-35056
|
12/15/2021 | Motion | Filed Petitioner's Reply In Support of Motion to Stay Related District Court Action Pending Resolution of Appeal and/or Petition for Extraordinary Writ Relief. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 21-35674
|
12/28/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Stay. The district court proceedings shall be stayed pending further order of this court. Nos. 82467/82552. (SC) | | 21-36812
|
03/03/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter is scheduled for oral argument on April 4, 2022, at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 60 minutes. Nos 82467/82552. (SC) | | 22-06865
|
03/22/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-08928
|
03/23/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 22-09125
|
03/31/2022 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Continue Oral Argument Due to Settlement in Principle. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 22-10125
|
04/01/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Oral Argument. The motion to continue the oral argument of this matter is granted. The oral argument presently scheduled for April 4, 2022, at 1:30 p.m. is vacated. The parties shall, within 30 days of the date of this order, file either a status report or a stipulation to dismiss. Nos. 82467/82552. (SC) | | 22-10154
|
04/05/2022 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Dismiss Consolidated Appeal. Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 22-10581
|
04/05/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service (Stipulation to Dismiss). Nos. 82467/82552 (SC) | | 22-10582
|
04/08/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, and cause appearing, "this appeal and original petition for a writ of mandamus are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued. Nos 82467/82552. (SC) | | 22-11098
|