Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
This document is currently unavailable. If you need a copy of this document, please contact Clerk's Office at (775)684-1600.
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 51920
Short Caption:CARRIGAN VS. COMM'N ON ETHICSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):51850
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 07OC012451BClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:District Judge Earl for Chief Justice ParraguirrePanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/05/2012 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/05/2012How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/25/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/25/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)08-16267
06/30/2008MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Expedited Appeal.08-16601
06/30/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/29/07. To Court Reporter: Eric Nelson.08-16604
06/30/2008Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/12/08. To Court Reporter: Jackie Adams.08-16605
06/30/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.08-16608
07/03/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Request for Transcript of Proceedings (Jackie Adams).08-17046
07/03/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Request for Transcript of Proceedings (Eric Nelson).08-17047
07/16/2008TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 08/29/07. Court Reporter: Eric Nelson.08-18214
07/21/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jackie Adams stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/12/08.08-18766
07/22/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. we conclude that an expedited briefing schedule is appropriate, and therefore, we grant appellant's motion. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Upon the completion of briefing, we will expedite our resolution of this appeal as the court's docket permits.08-18913
07/24/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief.08-19091
07/24/2008AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols 1-4.08-19093
08/25/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief.08-21848
08/25/2008BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Amicus Curiae Brief of the Legislature of the State of Nevaqda in Support of the Commission on Ethics of the State of Nevada08-21925
09/24/2008BriefFiled Reply Brief.08-24662
09/24/2008AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Supplement to Joint Appendix.08-24664
10/28/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Disclosure of Non-Disqualifying Interest. I see no reason to recuse myself from consideration of this appeal. Ron Parraguirre.08-27678
02/02/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on March 3, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. (En Banc)09-02843
02/17/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.09-04098
03/03/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/10/2009OtherDisqualification of Justice Parraguirre.
03/10/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Voluntary recusal of Justice Parraguirre.09-06027
07/29/2010Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed." Before the Court EN BANC. Fn1-[The Honorable Ron Parraguirre, Chief Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Author: Douglas, Michael L.. Majority: Douglas/Hardesty/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons. Dissent: Pickering. 126 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 28. EN BANC.10-19578
08/24/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur.10-21627
08/24/2010Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
08/27/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 25, 2010. REMITTITUR RECALLED PER ORDER FILED ON 9/22/10.10-21627
08/31/2010MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Stay Issuance of the Remittitur10-22369
09/01/2010MotionFiled Response to Motion. Notice of Non-Opposition.10-22415
09/22/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Recalling Remittitur. We recall the remittitur issued by this court on August 24, 2010. Thereafter the reissuance of the remittitur shall be stayed for 120 days.10-24349
10/13/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Versuslaw, Inc. and West Group regardng corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 52733, 46417, 55290/55551, 49207, 51920, 52492, 53521, 53168.10-27164
11/03/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. The petition for a writ of certiorari was filed 10/27/10 and placed on the docket 10/29/10 as Case No. 10-568.10-28782
12/16/2010MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Stay Issuance of the Remittitur.10-32918
12/16/2010MotionFiled Notice of Non-Opposition.10-32941
12/27/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Stay Reissuance of Remittitur until final dispostion has been rendered by the Supreme Court of the United States.10-33704
01/18/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. The petition for a writ of certiorari is granted.11-01689
03/09/2011Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from US Supreme Court requesting certified copies of all documents filed in this case.11-07669
03/17/2011Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to US Supreme Court enclosing a certified copy of this court's record, vols. 1 through 3.11-08705
07/05/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Substitution of Counsel for Appellant - (The Capitol Company substituted as attorney of record for appellant Michael Carrigan in the place and stead of The Sparks City Attorney)11-19747
07/13/2011MotionFiled Motion To Associate Counsel (Rachel M. McKenzie, Esq.).11-21060
07/13/2011MotionFiled Motion to Associate Counsel (Mark S. Davies, Esq.).11-21061
07/13/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Motion (Mark Davies, Esq).11-21069
07/14/2011MotionFiled Motion for Additional Briefing and Argument.11-21091
07/15/2011Order/IncomingFiled Mandate and Judgment from Supreme Court of the United States.11-21386
07/19/2011MotionFiled Response to Appellant's Motion for Additional Briefing and Argument.11-21774
07/26/2011MotionFiled Reply in Support of Motion for Additional Briefing and Argument.11-22464
07/28/2011OtherRecord of Proceedings in the Nevada Supreme Court, Vols. 1 through 3, returned to this office by the U.S. Supreme Court. (See 3/17/11 docket entry.)
07/29/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Additional Briefing and Motions to Associate Counsel. Appellant's: Supplemental brief due: 30 days. Nevada attorneys John W. Griffith and Matthew M. Griffin, of The Capitol Company, shall be responsible for all matters presented by Ms. McKenzie and Mr. Davies in this matter.11-22887
08/02/2011MotionFiled Joint Motion for Clarification Regarding Supplemental Briefing.11-23324
08/08/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion Regarding Supplemental Brief page Limits. The supplemental opening brief and supplemental answering brief shall be no longer than 30 pages and any supplemental reply brief shall be no longer than 15 pages.11-23829
08/22/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Yvonne Nevarz-Goodson for Adriana Fralick).11-25556
08/22/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Mandate and Judgment of the Supreme Court of the United States.11-25558
08/22/2011MotionFiled Motion to Associate Counsel - John P. Elwood.11-25559
08/22/2011MotionFiled Motion to Associate Counsel - Jeremy C. Marwell.11-25560
08/23/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service of Notice of Mandate and Judgment of the Supreme Court of the United States.11-25571
08/29/2011BriefFiled Supplemental Brief of Appellant Michael A Carrigan.11-26253
09/27/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to Associate Counsel and to Waive Admission Fees. Respondent The Commission on Ethics has filed motions to associate Washington, D.C., attorneys John P. Elwood and Jeremy C. Marwell of the law firm Vinson & Elkins, LLP, in this matter pursuant to SCR 42. Mr. Elwood and Mr. Maxwell shall be permitted to appear on behalf of respondent in this appeal. No admission fees shall be required of Mr. Elwood or Mr. Maxwell.11-29431
09/29/2011BriefFiled Supplemental Brief for Respondent The Commission on Ethics State of Nevada.11-29664
10/13/2011BriefFiled Supplemental Reply Brief for Appellant Michael A. Carrigan.11-31589
10/14/2011MotionFiled Legislature's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief.11-31652
10/14/2011MotionFiled Appellant Michael A. Carrigan's Opposition to Nevada Legislature's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief.11-31834
10/18/2011MotionFiled Legislature's Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief.11-32088
10/20/2011MotionFiled Response of the Commission on Ethics of the State of Nevada to the Nevada Legislature's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief.11-32421
11/01/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. The clerk of this court is directed to return, unfiled, the proposed amicus brief, provisionally received in this court on October 14, 2011.11-33547
01/27/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for March 5, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City for 30 minutes before the En Banc Panel.12-02917
02/22/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.12-05678
03/05/2012Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
04/03/2012Order/IncomingFiled Executive Order. Honorable Alan R. Earl, District Judge, appointed to sit in the place of Justice Parraguirre.12-10592
11/27/2013Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Pickering, C.J. Majority: Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty/Saitta/Earl. Douglas, J., with whom Cherry, J., dissenting. Fn1[After oral argument, the Honorable Allan R. Earl, Judge of the Eighth Judicial District Court, was designated by the Governor to sit in place of the Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Justice, who voluntarily recused himself.] 129 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 95. EN BANC13-35859
12/23/2013RemittiturIssued Remittitur.13-38900
12/23/2013Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
12/31/2013RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 24, 2013.13-38900