Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/18/2016 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality. | | |
03/18/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 16-08679
|
03/18/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 16-08682
|
03/22/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. | | 16-09094
|
03/29/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 16-09822
|
03/29/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (Docketing Statement) | | 16-09828
|
03/29/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Holland & Hart for Respondent. | | 16-09849
|
04/04/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service of Docketing Statement to Settlement Judge. | | 16-10390
|
04/04/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of Notice of Appearance. | | 16-10419
|
04/04/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Vivienne Raskowsky as counsel for the Appellant). | | 16-10425
|
04/04/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Rickisha Hightower-Singletary as counsel for the Appellant). | | 16-10451
|
04/07/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 5/18/16 @ 10:00 a.m. | | 16-10940
|
04/11/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. Upon further discussion with counsel, this matter should be exempt from the program. | | 16-11224
|
04/12/2016 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief. | | 16-11327
|
05/12/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion Requesting Permission to Enter in to the Record The Motion to Stay Pending Appeal and the Transcript of the May 5, 2016 Hearing on the Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. | | 16-14941
|
05/16/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | | 16-15202
|
05/17/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/05/16. To Court Reporter: Martha Szramek. | | 16-15403
|
05/20/2016 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Martha Szramek stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 05/05/16. | | 16-15912
|
06/29/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for leave to supplement the record on appeal with the motion and transcript from a May 5, 2016, hearing on a motion to stay pending appeal. No opposition has been filed, and the transcript has been delivered. Accordingly, we deny the motion. | | 16-20311
|
06/29/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing of the Opening Brief to August 8, 2016 | | 16-20324
|
06/29/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: August 8, 2016. | | 16-20418
|
08/04/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing of the Opening Brief to August 23, 2016. | | 16-24215
|
08/12/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The parties have filed a second stipulation extending the time for filing the opening brief. We elect to treat the stipulation as a joint motion for an extension of time, and grant the motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 23, 2016. | | 16-25056
|
08/22/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. (Appellant counsel, William McKean/Attorney General). | | 16-25969
|
08/24/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 16-26331
|
08/24/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume I. | | 16-26333
|
08/24/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume II. | | 16-26334
|
08/24/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix - Volume III. | | 16-26335
|
08/31/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief in Support of the Opening Brief (Amicus Curiae Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada) due: September 16, 2016. | | 16-27053
|
09/19/2016 | Motion | Filed The Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae. (Amicus Brief is Attached.) | | 16-28973
|
09/20/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation To Extend Time To File Answering Brief. | | 16-29159
|
09/20/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: October 21, 2016. | | 16-29176
|
09/21/2016 | Motion | Filed Respondent Dollar Loan Center, LLC's Opposition To The Legal Aid Center Of Southern Nevada, Inc.'s Motion For Leave to File Brief Of Amicus Curiae. | | 16-29394
|
09/28/2016 | Motion | Filed Reply to Respondent Dollar Loan Center, LLC's Opposition to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae. | | 16-30227
|
09/29/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada has filed a motion for leave to file an amicus brief in support of the appellant. We deny the motion for leave to file a brief of amicus curiae. | | 16-30399
|
10/21/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 16-33100
|
11/10/2016 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 16-35079
|
11/10/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: December 21, 2016. | | 16-35081
|
12/19/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 16-39351
|
12/19/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
01/12/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata To Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 17-01255
|
04/26/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, June 6, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 17-13842
|
05/22/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Notice of Supplemental Authority. | | 17-16952
|
05/22/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 17-16980
|
05/31/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Solicitor General Vandyke appearing on behalf of appellant, The State of Nevada Department of Business and Industry, Financial Institutions Division.) | | 17-18186
|
06/06/2017 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
06/08/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Clarification. | | 17-19071
|
06/19/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Response to Appellant's Notice of Clarification. | | 17-20283
|
06/21/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of Appellant's Notice of Clarification. | | 17-20507
|
12/26/2017 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and Remanded." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Pickering, J., dissenting. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 103. (OPINION WITHDRAWN PER ORDER FILED 3/1/18) | | 17-44424
|
01/16/2018 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. | | 18-02092
|
01/16/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Patrick John Reilly. | | |
01/29/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice. | | 18-03999
|
03/01/2018 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting Petition for Rehearing and Withdrawing Opinion. We withdraw our opinion that appears at 133 Nev., Adv. Op. 103 (Dec. 26, 2017), grant the petition for rehearing, and submit this matter for decision without further briefing or additional oral argument. | | 18-08134
|
03/01/2018 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Pickering, J., dissenting.134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 15. EN BANC | | 18-08138
|
03/26/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 18-11652
|
03/26/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
04/06/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 29, 2018. | | 18-11652
|