Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/18/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. | | |
09/18/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 18-36396
|
09/18/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 18-36398
|
09/18/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Attorney Michael K. Wall of Hutchinson & Steffen, PLLC appearing as counsel for respondents. | | 18-36485
|
09/21/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Dickinson Wright. Check no. 2254. | | |
09/24/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 18-37134
|
09/27/2018 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael H. Singer. | | 18-37952
|
10/11/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 18-39936
|
10/15/2018 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibits: Attachments to Docking Statement Civil Appeals. | | 18-40434
|
10/30/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for November 8, 2018, at 10:00 am. | | 18-42606
|
11/09/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC). | | 18-903616
|
11/09/2018 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 18-903685
|
01/08/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. (SC) | | 19-01196
|
01/10/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/01/18. To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza. | | 19-01629
|
02/04/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 21, 2019. (SC). | | 19-05321
|
02/22/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 19-08215
|
02/22/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 1. (SC) | | 19-08225
|
02/22/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 2 Part 1. (SC) | | 19-08227
|
02/22/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 2 Part 2. (SC) | | 19-08228
|
02/22/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 3 Part 1. (SC) | | 19-08230
|
02/22/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 3 Part 2. (SC) | | 19-08231
|
02/22/2019 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. (SC) | | 19-08232
|
03/13/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Respondents Dave Sandin and Sandin & Co.'s Answering Brief (First Request). (SC) | | 19-11239
|
03/13/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondents Dave Sandin and Sandin & Co.'s Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-11245
|
04/16/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Answering Brief. Respondent Oregon Mutual Insurance Company's Answering Brief due: 14 days. (SC). | | 19-16557
|
04/19/2019 | Motion | Filed Respondent Oregon Mutual Insurance Company's Motion to Remove Them from Service List and Caption. (SC) | | 19-17358
|
04/19/2019 | Motion | Filed Exhibit to Respondent Oregon Mutual Insurance Company's Motion to Remove Them from Service List and Caption. (SC) | | 19-17372
|
04/24/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondents Dave Sandin and Sandin & Co.'s Answering Brief. (SC) | | 19-17916
|
05/09/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing Respondent. Respondent Oregon Mutual Insurance Company has filed a motion to be removed from the service list and caption of this appeal. The motion is granted. The clerk shall remove OMI as a respondent to this appeal. OMI's request for attorney fees is denied. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 30 days. (SC). | | 19-20399
|
06/06/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: June 24, 2019. (SC) | | 19-24494
|
06/24/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 19-27108
|
06/25/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
09/16/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | 19-38597
|
09/16/2019 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
09/16/2019 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
01/22/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Gibbons, C.J., dissenting. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. | | 20-03058
|
01/22/2020 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Gibbons, C.J., dissenting. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. (SC). | | |
02/05/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
02/05/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Review. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 02/06/2020). (SC) | | |
02/06/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Supreme Court. (COA) | | |
02/06/2020 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. (COA) | | |
02/06/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document - Appellant's Petition for Review. (SC) | | 20-05142
|
02/07/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Review. (SC) | | 20-05413
|
03/04/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Review. Respondents' Answer due: 14 days. (SC) | | 20-08627
|
03/17/2020 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent Dave Sandin and Sandin & Co.'s Answer to Petition for Review. (SC). | | 20-10422
|
04/22/2020 | Post-Judgment Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition for Review. "Review denied." NRAP 40B. fn1 [The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] (SC). | | 20-15185
|
05/18/2020 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 20-18771
|
05/18/2020 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
06/12/2020 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 21, 2020. (SC) | | 20-18771
|