Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/08/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Norman Azevedo - cash. | | |
01/08/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 10-00713
|
01/08/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. | | 10-00714
|
01/13/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Evidentiary Appendix in Support of Petitioner Southern California Edison's Original Petition for Writ of Mandamus (CD - submitted with document). | | 10-01085
|
01/19/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave of Court Pursuant to N.R.A.P. 29(f) for Later Filing of Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Southern California Edison's Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 10-01422
|
01/21/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 30 days. | | 10-01716
|
01/29/2010 | Brief | Received Amicus Brief. Via E-Flex. Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Southern California Edison's Petition for Writ of Mandamus. FILED PER ORDER OF 3/5/10. | | |
02/22/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer to Southern California Edison's Petition for Writ of Mandamus | | 10-04715
|
02/22/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Respondent's Appendix in Opposition to Petitioner Southern CA Edison's Original Petition for Writ of Mandamus | | 10-04716
|
02/25/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 10-05041
|
02/26/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. this court does not require a motion for leave to be filed by Clark County. No action is required with respect to its motion, and the clerk shall file the amicus curiae brief received on February 25, 2010. | | 10-05199
|
02/26/2010 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief. Clark County's Amicus Curiae Brief in Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 10-05202
|
02/26/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. to Clark County's Amicus Brief. | | |
03/02/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File a Reply to the Department's Answer to Writ Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Clark County's Amicus Curiae Brief. | | 10-05514
|
03/03/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Paul Johnson (Counsel for Amicus Curaie - Clark County). | | 10-05555
|
03/03/2010 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief. Amicus Curiae Brief of the Legislature of the State of Nevada in Support of Taxation of the State of Nevada and In Opposition to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 10-05577
|
03/05/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motions for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief and Reply. We direct the clerk of this court to file the proposed amici curiae brief received on 1/20/10. The clerk shall file the reply received on March 2. 2010. | | 10-05854
|
03/05/2010 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief. Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Southern California Edison's Petition for Writ of Mandamus | | 10-05858
|
03/05/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Reply to Answer to Petition. Edison's Reply to the Department's Answer to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Clark County's Amicus Curiae Brief. | | 10-05515
|
03/09/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File a Reply to the Amicus Curiae Brief of the Legislature of the State of Nevada. | | 10-06131
|
03/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to File Reply. The clerk of this court shall file the reply received on March 9, 2010. | | 10-06669
|
03/12/2010 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief. Edison's Reply to the Amicus Curiae Brief of the Legislature of the State of Nevada. | | 10-06132
|
08/11/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Edison's Request for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Edison's Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 10-20780
|
08/11/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Change of Attorney Information for pro hac vice Charles Read. (New law firm.) | | 10-20782
|
09/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Authorities. We direct the clerk of this court to return unfiled petitioner's supplemental authority received on August 11, 2010. | | 10-24664
|
10/08/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for November 2, 2010 at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City before the En Banc Court. | | 10-26328
|
10/19/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate Petitions for Writ of Mandamus 55228 and 56740. | | 10-27323
|
10/20/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 10-27390
|
10/25/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Consolidate. | | 10-27837
|
10/25/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion to Consolidate Petitions For Writ of Mandamus. | | 10-27921
|
11/01/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion of Amici Curiae to Participate in Oral Argument. | | 10-28512
|
11/02/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. This court concludes that the participation of amici curiae Nevada Taxpayers Association and the Council on State Taxation is warranted, and the motion is therefore granted. | | 10-28602
|
11/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Oral Argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
05/26/2011 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "We grant the petition and direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus directing the district court to vacate its order that provides that the matter will proceed as an NRS Chapter 233B petition for judicial review and to instead allow the matter to proceed as filed, an independant action." Before the court EN BANC. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/Saitta/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 127 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 22 | | 11-15521
|
05/26/2011 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of mailed to Norman J. Azevedo for service upon Judge James Todd Russell. | | |
06/02/2011 | Writ | Filed Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge James Todd Russell on 05/31/2011. | | 11-16227
|
06/13/2011 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing On Judicial Estoppel. (Respondent State of Nevada Department of Taxation). | | 11-17527
|
06/13/2011 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibits to Petition For Rehearing on Estoppel. | | 11-17536
|
07/07/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Petitioner: Answer due: 15 days. | | 11-20239
|
07/14/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. | | 11-21222
|
07/20/2011 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for Rehearing. | | 11-21904
|
08/24/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 50262/52496, 54779, 55159, 49732, 51629, 53436/54173, 55228, 50668, 57649, 53518, 54165, 46623, and 53225/53340. (Letter entered in 50262 as document no. 11-26481.) | | |
09/20/2011 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | | 11-28697
|
09/21/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service of Order Denying Rehearing. | | 11-28806
|
10/17/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing. | | 11-31889
|
10/17/2011 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
04/13/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to Publishers with Corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 52861, 54332, 55228, 53872, 59506, 54703, 55200, 58774. (Letter entered in 52861 as document no. 12-12068.) | | |