Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/01/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
04/01/2014 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 14-10201
|
04/01/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 14-10206
|
04/03/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Craig W. Drummond, P.C. Check No. 2340. | | |
04/04/2014 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Howard Roitman. | | 14-10739
|
04/21/2014 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Other. The premediation conference will be held on May 28, 2014 at 2:00 pm. | | 14-12791
|
04/24/2014 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant shall have until April 28, 2014, to file and serve the docketing statement. | | 14-13241
|
04/28/2014 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 14-13759
|
05/30/2014 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 22, 2014 at 11:00 am. | | 14-17564
|
06/02/2014 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Settlement Program Report. The settlement judge must recuse himself as settlement judge in this matter. | | 14-17871
|
06/12/2014 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. Issued Amended Notice of Assignment to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. New Settlement Judge: Richard A. Harris. | | 14-19297
|
07/21/2014 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for Thursday, September 18, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. | | 14-23643
|
09/24/2014 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 14-31771
|
09/26/2014 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 14-32119
|
10/14/2014 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/29/14 To Court Reporter: Michelle L. Ramsey. | | 14-34139
|
12/22/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion for Enlargement of Time (Opening Brief and Appendix). | | 14-41745
|
12/22/2014 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening brief and appendix due: January 26, 2015. | | 14-41749
|
01/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Volume 1. | | 15-01927
|
01/20/2015 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix - Volume 2. | | 15-01928
|
01/26/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 15-02822
|
02/24/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Answering Brief and Appendix. | | 15-05809
|
02/24/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Motion Approved. Answering Brief and Appendix due: March 27, 2015. | | 15-05889
|
03/27/2015 | Brief | Filed Respondent New York-New York Hotel & Casino's Answering Brief. | | 15-09301
|
03/27/2015 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix. | | 15-09302
|
04/27/2015 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Reply Brief due: May 4, 2015. | | 15-12681
|
05/04/2015 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. | | 15-13610
|
05/04/2015 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
01/12/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, February 11, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 16-00982
|
01/29/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 16-03092
|
02/11/2016 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP16-JH/NS/KP. | | |
10/05/2017 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre. Pickering, J., dissenting. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 77. SNP16-KP/JH/RP | | 17-33806
|
10/18/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice Of Appearance Of Counsel On Behalf Of Respondent. Todd L. Bice, Esq., Dustun H. Holmes, Esq., and Robert A. Ryan, Esq. of the law firm Pisanelli Bice PLLC appearing as counsel for respondent. | | 17-35697
|
10/19/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Petition for Rehearing due: November 6, 2017. | | 17-35777
|
10/19/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Verified Bill of Costs and Request for Costs. | | 17-35885
|
10/24/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Objection To Appellants' Verified Bill Of Costs And Request For Costs. | | 17-36363
|
11/07/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition For Rehearing. | | 17-38223
|
11/07/2017 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Todd L. Bice | | |
11/20/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Answer due: 15 days. | | 17-39896
|
11/30/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answer to respondent's petition for rehearing due: December 19, 2017. | | 17-41324
|
12/12/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellants' Motion to Extend Time to File an Answer to Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. | | 17-42734
|
12/14/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion extension of time to file an answer to the petition for rehearing in this case. Appellant was previously granted a 14-day extension of time. The motion is denied. | | 17-43151
|
12/19/2017 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Answer to Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. | | 17-43900
|
01/04/2018 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Pickering, J., dissenting. | | 18-00519
|
01/22/2018 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition For En Banc Reconsideration. | | 18-02751
|
03/21/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Appellants' Answer due: 15 days. | | 18-10991
|
04/05/2018 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellants' Answer to Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 18-13034
|
04/27/2018 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." Pickering, J., dissenting. EN BANC | | 18-16086
|
05/23/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Costs. These charges are not allowable under NRAP 39(c) and therefor are disallowed. | | 18-19699
|
05/23/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 18-19741
|
05/23/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
06/05/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 29, 2018. | | 18-19741
|