Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/08/2015 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. | | |
05/08/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Filed certified copy of proper person notice of appeal. | | 15-14153
|
05/08/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 15-14155
|
05/12/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Confidential Civil Cover Sheet (SEALED). | | |
05/27/2015 | Motion | Filed Motion for Application and Affidavit to Proceed on Appeal In Forma Pauperis. | | 15-16129
|
06/15/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Entry And Transmission Of Written Order. District Court Order due: 30 days. | | 15-18073
|
07/13/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice of Entry of Order. (District court order granted permission to proceed In Forma Pauperis) | | 15-21227
|
07/17/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Waiving Filing Fee. Appellant seeks a waiver of the filing fee for this appeal. This motion is granted, no filing fee is due for this appeal. | | 15-21745
|
07/22/2015 | Case Status Update | Pilot Program Civil Appeals. Order and documents mailed to proper person appellant. Civil proper person transcript request form due: 15 days. Civil proper person appeal statement due: 40 days. | | |
07/28/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. (Order filed 3/20/15; NOE filed 3/20/15; Order filed 4/9/15; NOE filed 4/10/15; and Motion filed 5/1/15) | | 15-22831
|
08/04/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form (08/28/14, 10/09/14, 03/25/15). | | 15-23470
|
08/31/2015 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | | 15-26312
|
09/01/2015 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for Stay Pending Appeal Pursuant to NRAP 8. | | 15-26515
|
09/08/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record due: 30 days. | | 15-27031
|
09/11/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Response to Motion for Stay. Respondent's Response to Motion for Stay due: September 14, 2015. | | 15-27604
|
09/15/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Pursuant to S.C.R. 46. | | 15-27850
|
09/16/2015 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal VOL 1. | | 15-28082
|
09/16/2015 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal VOL 2. | | 15-28083
|
09/16/2015 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal VOL 3. | | 15-28084
|
09/16/2015 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal VOL 4. | | 15-28085
|
09/16/2015 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
09/21/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. We grant the motion to withdraw as counsel of record for respondent. The clerk shall remove attorney Peter J. Bellon and Bellon & Maningo, Ltd. from the docket of this appeal. Notice of Appearance due: 30 days. We suspend the time for respondent to file a response to appellant's motion for stay directed in our order of September 11, 2015, pending further order of this court. | | 15-28514
|
09/22/2015 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal pages 57-87, 148, 214-220, 431-440 and 727-729 (SEALED). | | |
10/26/2015 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document received October 23, 2015. | | 15-32534
|
11/02/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. We direct the clerk of this court to transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial screening. Parties' Notices of Appearance of Counsel or LACSN's Notice due: 60 days. | | 15-33303
|
12/29/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel (Tami Cowden and Moorea L. Katz as counsel for the Appellant). | | 15-39887
|
12/31/2015 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel (Eric Pepperman as counsel for Respondent). | | 15-40210
|
01/05/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Compliance with NRAP 9 and Setting Briefing Schedule. This appeal no longer stands submitted for decision on appellant's civil proper person appeal statement and the record. Transcript Request Form due: 14 days. Opening Brief (Replacement or Supplement) and Appendix (optional) due: 90 days. We direct appellant's counsel to consider the propriety of appellant's pro se motion for stay and to inform this court within 15 days whether they intend to proceed with a motion for stay or withdraw appellant's pro se motion. | | 16-00235
|
01/19/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/28/14, 10/9/14 and 3/24/15. To Court Reporter: Court Reporter, Dept. T. | | 16-01890
|
01/20/2016 | Motion | Filed Response to Order Dated January 5, 2016. | | 16-01978
|
01/20/2016 | Other | Chief Justice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms - Kemp, Jones & Coulthard, LLP | | |
01/25/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Joinder to Appellant's Request For Transcripts of Proceedings. | | 16-02393
|
02/01/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Motion for Stay due: 15 days. | | 16-03372
|
02/17/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Stay Enforcement of the District Court's March 18, 2015 Order. | | 16-04984
|
02/29/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to stay the district court's order prohibiting appellant's fiancé from being alone with appellant's children. We deny the motion. | | 16-06407
|
03/04/2016 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/28/14, 10/09/14 and 3/24/15. | | 16-07014
|
04/04/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 18, 2016. | | 16-10414
|
04/11/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 1 of 2. | | 16-11201
|
04/11/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 2 of 2. | | 16-11202
|
04/12/2016 | Brief | Filed Replacement Opening Brief of Appellant. | | 16-11267
|
05/02/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. | | 16-13666
|
05/02/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: June 1, 2016. | | 16-13668
|
06/03/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 16-17447
|
06/23/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: July 1, 2016. | | 16-19601
|
06/24/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 16-19807
|
06/24/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening | | |
11/29/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 16-36960
|
12/21/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, February 7, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City. | | 16-39742
|
01/04/2017 | Motion | Filed Joint Motion to Move Oral Argument. | | 17-00257
|
01/05/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Motion and Rescheduling Oral Argument. Cause appearing, the motion to move oral argument of this matter is granted. The oral argument scheduled for February 7, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. is hereby vacated. This matter will be rescheduled on the next available calendar in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | | 17-00413
|
02/23/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument.Argument is scheduled for Monday, April 3, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. | | 17-06264
|
03/20/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 17-09209
|
04/03/2017 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter From Las Vegas Review-Journal to Request Camera Access to the Nevada Supreme Court Arguments Scheduled for Monday, April 3 (via fax). | | 17-10894
|
04/03/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Media Request. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings. Wesley Juhl of the Las Vegas Review Journal is designated as the pool coordinator. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 10:00 a.m. | | 17-10916
|
04/03/2017 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
09/27/2017 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Fn2[The Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/Gibons/Pickering/Hardesty/Stiglich. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 69. EN BANC | | 17-32848
|
10/23/2017 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 17-36241
|
10/23/2017 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
11/03/2017 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by the District Court Clerk on October 26, 2017. | | 17-36241
|