Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/05/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
05/05/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 16-14117
|
05/05/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 16-14119
|
05/05/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick. | | 16-14141
|
05/06/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Durney & Brennan LTD. Check No. 8392. | | |
05/12/2016 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Misty Hubert stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 03/08/16, 03/22/16. | | 16-15010
|
05/13/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries | | 16-15103
|
05/18/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy off District Court Docket Entries. | | 16-15724
|
05/25/2016 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 16-16470
|
05/25/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement). | | 16-16475
|
05/25/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 16-16501
|
05/25/2016 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Certificate of Service re: Docketing Statement (Served on Settlement Judge). | | 16-16548
|
06/07/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. | | 16-17711
|
06/14/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. | | 16-18602
|
06/15/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 31, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. | | 16-18739
|
06/20/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries | | 16-19218
|
07/26/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. | | 16-23232
|
08/31/2016 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 16-27086
|
09/06/2016 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 16-27556
|
10/05/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | | 16-30991
|
10/10/2016 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | | 16-31504
|
10/10/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Docket Entries. | | 16-31531
|
12/05/2016 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 19, 2016. | | 16-37473
|
12/19/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Leave of Court To File Opening Brief In Excess of Type-Volume Limitation. | | 16-39349
|
12/19/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vols 1 - 3 part 1. | | 16-39363
|
12/19/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vols 3 part 2 - 5 part 1. | | 16-39364
|
12/19/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 5 part 2 - 7 Part 1. | | 16-39366
|
12/19/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 7 part 2 - 9 part 1. | | 16-39368
|
12/19/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 9 Part 2 - 11. | | 16-39369
|
12/19/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellants' Appendix Vol 12 - 14 part 1. | | 16-39371
|
12/19/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Vol 14 part 2 - 15. | | 16-39372
|
12/22/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on December 19, 2016. Answering Brief due: 30 days. | | 16-39927
|
12/22/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 16-39928
|
12/28/2016 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae of the Nevada Justice Association in Support of Appellants. (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER 02/01/17 ORDER.) | | 16-40357
|
01/13/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answering Brief due: February 6, 2017. | | 17-01478
|
02/01/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall detach the amicus brief from the motion and file it separately. | | 17-03687
|
02/01/2017 | Brief | Filed Brief of Amicus Curiae of the Nevada Justice Association in Support of Appellants. | | 17-03688
|
02/03/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Deadline For Respondent to File Answering Brief. | | 17-04052
|
02/15/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Confession of Errors. | | 17-05390
|
02/15/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation. The clerk shall file the answering brief and appendix received via E-Flex on February 13, 2017. Reply Brief due: 30 days. | | 17-05436
|
02/15/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 17-05441
|
02/15/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | | 17-05442
|
02/22/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for a confession of errors on the ground that respondent has failed to timely file the answering brief. No good cause appearing, the motion is denied. | | 17-06109
|
03/17/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellants' Reply Brief. | | 17-08970
|
03/17/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Appendix (Vol. 16). | | 17-08971
|
03/17/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Transmit. | | 17-08972
|
03/17/2017 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
04/04/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Transmit Document. The clerk of the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court, in a sealed envelope, the "Verified Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim and Establishment of Special Needs Trust" filed under seal on August 12, 2015, in case No. 13 TRT 00028 1B. | | 17-11147
|
04/05/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Copy of District Court Docket Entries. | | 17-11406
|
04/11/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Verified Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim and Establishment of Special Needs Trust (Under Seal) Filed Aug. 12, 2015. (SEALED). | | |
04/20/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting Appeal For Decision Without Oral Argument. | | 17-13237
|
07/28/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar. | | 17-25077
|
08/03/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, September 26, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City. | | 17-25847
|
09/11/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 17-30408
|
09/26/2017 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Panel. NNP17 - JH/RP/LS. | | |
12/28/2017 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 133 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 115. NNP17-JH/RP/LS | | 17-44730
|
01/22/2018 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 18-02940
|
01/22/2018 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
01/29/2018 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 23, 2018. | | 18-02940
|