Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/19/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. | | |
12/19/2016 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | | 16-39284
|
12/19/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. | | 16-39287
|
12/23/2016 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Shumway Van LLC. Check No. 50285. | | |
12/27/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days. | | 16-40198
|
12/29/2016 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley. | | 16-40531
|
01/17/2017 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Docketing Statement due: January 31, 2017. | | 17-01702
|
01/23/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for: TBA. | | 17-02464
|
01/30/2017 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | | 17-03215
|
02/01/2017 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 17-03610
|
02/02/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is scheduled for the following date: February 8, 2017. | | 17-03894
|
02/16/2017 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 17-05618
|
02/22/2017 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 17-06123
|
03/09/2017 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/15/15, 12/8/16, and 12/14/16. To Court Reporter: Not provided. | | 17-08108
|
05/23/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | | 17-17316
|
05/23/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 22, 2017. | | 17-17318
|
06/23/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 17-20890
|
06/26/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 17-21205
|
07/05/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply to Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | | 17-22157
|
07/06/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 24, 2017. | | 17-22338
|
07/24/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. | | 17-24497
|
07/24/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. | | 17-24499
|
07/24/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. | | 17-24500
|
07/24/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. | | 17-24501
|
07/24/2017 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume 5. | | 17-24502
|
07/25/2017 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 17-24603
|
08/16/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance and Request for Special Notice (Steven Silva as counsel for the Respondent). | | 17-27461
|
08/16/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Brief. | | 17-27463
|
08/16/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: September 25, 2017. | | 17-27474
|
09/12/2017 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance - Attorney Michael Wall of Hutchison & Steffen, PLLC appearing as counsel for respondent. | | 17-30615
|
09/15/2017 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request). | | 17-31232
|
10/23/2017 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: October 25, 2017. | | 17-36188
|
10/25/2017 | Brief | Filed Respondent Treasure Island LLC's Answering Brief. | | 17-36742
|
11/17/2017 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Reply Brief. | | 17-39871
|
11/17/2017 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: December 27, 2017. | | 17-39873
|
12/27/2017 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | 17-44697
|
01/25/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Reply Brief due: January 26, 2018. | | 18-03536
|
01/29/2018 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. | | 18-03856
|
02/08/2018 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 11 days. | | 18-05268
|
02/22/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 18-06825
|
02/22/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Reply Brief. | | 18-06878
|
02/22/2018 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
04/05/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals. | | 18-12954
|
06/06/2019 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Filed Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. Author: Tao, J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 19. (SC) | | |
06/07/2019 | Other | Justice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal | | |
08/26/2019 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
08/26/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC). | | 19-35536
|
08/26/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC). | | |
09/06/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 29, 2019. (SC) | | 19-35536
|