Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/22/2018 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality. | | |
03/22/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 18-11208
|
03/22/2018 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | | 18-11212
|
03/23/2018 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin. | | 18-11351
|
04/03/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Cross-Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | | |
04/03/2018 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) | | 18-12654
|
04/06/2018 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from McLetchie Shell. Check no. 2000. (Cross-Appeal) | | |
04/11/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 18-13891
|
04/12/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for June 11, 2018, at 9:30 am. | | 18-14123
|
04/23/2018 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | | 18-15416
|
05/24/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Amended. ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 14, 2018, at 9:30 am. | | 18-20048
|
08/16/2018 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 18-31761
|
08/17/2018 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. | | 18-31879
|
08/20/2018 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Corrected Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant/cross-respondent and respondent/cross-appellant shall each have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form. Appellant/Cross-Respondent Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. | | 18-32042
|
08/29/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/03/17, 08/10/17. To Court Reporter: None listed. | | 18-33774
|
08/29/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/13/17. To Court Reporter: Robin Page. | | 18-33775
|
08/30/2018 | Transcript Request | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/3/17, 8/10/17 and 12/13/17. To Court Reporter: Robin Page. | | 18-33921
|
09/21/2018 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/13/17. | | 18-36977
|
10/15/2018 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Firm Name. (McLetchie Law, f/k/a McLetchie Shell) | | 18-40331
|
11/20/2018 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 18-904994
|
11/20/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Joint Appendix Volume I. (SC) | | 18-904996
|
11/20/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Joint Appendix Volume II. (SC) | | 18-905001
|
11/20/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Joint Appendix Volume III. (SC) | | 18-905003
|
11/20/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Joint Appendix Volume IV. (SC) | | 18-905005
|
11/20/2018 | Appendix | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Joint Appendix Volume V. (SC) | | 18-905008
|
12/21/2018 | Appendix | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix - Volume I. (SC) | | 18-909936
|
12/21/2018 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Answering Brief and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 18-910036
|
01/04/2019 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Combined Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 19-00522
|
01/04/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal due: February 11, 2019. | | 19-00547
|
01/08/2019 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/03/17, 08/10/17. (SC) | | 19-01040
|
02/12/2019 | Brief | Filed Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 19-06472
|
02/20/2019 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal due: March 12, 2019. (SC) | | 19-07966
|
03/13/2019 | Brief | Filed Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. (SC) | | 19-11067
|
03/13/2019 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
07/22/2019 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC). | | 19-30832
|
10/17/2019 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED." En Banc. (SC). | | 19-43056
|
11/12/2019 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 19-46260
|
11/12/2019 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
11/26/2019 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 15, 2019. (SC) | | 19-46260
|