Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 79715
Short Caption:BOLDEN (JASON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):82090, 82306, 84293
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C334635Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/01/2019Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee waived. Criminal. (SC)
10/01/2019Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC)19-40726
11/08/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. (SC)19-45954
11/18/2019Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. (SC)19-47201
01/29/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC)20-04051
02/03/2020MotionFiled Court Reporter's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript. (SC).20-04652
02/13/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Court Reporter Brittany Amoroso's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: March 23, 2020. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 28, 2020. (SC).20-05957
03/10/2020TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Brittany Amoroso stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 05/28/19, 0529/19, 05/30/19 and 07/23/19. (SC)20-09414
04/28/2020MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request). (SC).20-16076
05/08/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 29, 2020. (SC).20-17506
07/27/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Documents. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 14 days. (SC)20-27316
07/29/2020Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Letter Regarding Appellate Counsel. (SC)20-27676
07/29/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service - Proper Person Letter Regarding Appellate Counsel Due date: 10 days.20-27680
08/07/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a letter expressing concern that his appointed counsel has not communicated with him or filed the opening brief. This court entered an order on July 27, 2020, directing appellant's counsel Benjamin J. Nadig to file the opening brief and appendix within 14 days. This court trusts that Mr. Nadig will comply with this court's order. (SC)20-29158
08/10/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)20-29405
08/10/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 2 of 3. (SC)20-29407
08/10/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 1 of 3. (SC)20-29408
08/10/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Vol. 3 of 3. (SC)20-29409
08/28/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice to the Court as to Assigned Appointmant of Counsel for Direct Appeal. (SC)20-31801
08/28/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-31804
09/08/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Deputy District Attorney John T. Niman Appearing as Counsel for Respondent. (SC)20-33014
09/08/2020BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)20-33017
09/08/2020AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. (SC)20-33019
09/09/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court takes no action regarding appellant's "Notice to the Court as to Assigned Appointmant [sic] of Counsel for Direct Appeal." (SC)20-33186
10/06/2020Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person "Motion to Suspend Briefing and Direct Appeal, Dismiss Appellate Counsel and Appoint Alternative Appellate Counsel". (SC)20-36670
10/14/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has submitted a pro se motion that requests the discharge of his appointed counsel and the appointment of a new attorney. The motion is denied. (SC)20-37667
10/23/2020Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. (SC)
11/10/2020Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Memorandum to the Supreme Court. (SC)20-41188
11/10/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Memorandum to the Supreme Court.20-41190
11/18/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a memorandum informing this court that his counsel has not provided him with copies of the documents filed in this appeal or his client file. This court takes no action regarding the memorandum, but trusts that counsel will provide appellant with copies and the file as appropriate. (SC)20-42040
11/24/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Certificate of Service - Memorandum to the Supreme Court. (SC)20-42904
07/08/2021Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Cadish/Pickering/Herndon. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Cadish/Pickering/Herndon. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 28. NNP21-EC/KP/DH. (SC).21-19528
07/14/2021Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Letter Counsel. (SC)21-20284
07/15/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court issued an opinion affirming the judgment of conviction on July 8, 2021. Appellant has filed a letter asserting that his attorney, Benjamin Nadig, has failed to communicate with him or to send him his files. This court trusts that Mr. Nadig will communicate with appellant as necessary and send appellant all necessary documents. The clerk of this court shall provide appellant with a copy of this court's July 8, 2021, opinion. (SC)21-20414
07/21/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-21132
08/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. (SC)21-22339
08/11/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled State's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)21-23318
09/23/2021Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing and Amending Opinion. On July 8, 2021, this court issued an opinion affirming the judgment of conviction in this matter, We now amend that opinion. On page 8 of the advance opinion, 491 P.3d at 26, the paragraph before subsection II.B is amended to add, after the third sentence: This evidence "was sufficient to show that a crime had been committed and that there were reasonable grounds to believe that [Bolden] had committed it." With these changes, we deny rehearing. NRAP 40(c). (SC).21-27479
09/23/2021Opinion/DispositionalFiled Amended Authored Opinion. Before: Cadish/Pickering/Herndon. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Cadish/Pickering/Herndon. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 28. NNP21-EC/KP/DH. (OPINION WITHDRAWN PER ORDER FILED 2/3/22). (SC).21-27482
10/06/2021Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's petition for en banc reconsideration due: October 21, 2021. (SC)21-28721
10/21/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)21-30376
10/28/2021MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)21-31169
10/28/2021BriefFiled Amicus Brief of Amici Curiae Clark County Public Defender, Clark County SPD and NACJ in support of Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 8/4/22). (SC)
11/02/2021Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent's Answer due: 14 days. (SC)21-31542
11/03/2021MotionFiled State's Opposition to Amicus' Motion for Permission to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Appellant's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)21-31648
11/08/2021MotionFiled Reply In Support of Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae. (SC)21-32109
11/16/2021Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)21-32915
02/03/2022Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Granting En Banc Reconsideration. This court's previous opinion in this matter is hereby withdrawn. Pickering, J., dissenting. EN BANC (SC)22-03770
02/04/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. We conclude that supplemental briefing is warranted. Appellant's supplemental brief due: 14 days. Respondent shall have 14 days to respond. (SC)22-03840
02/17/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Supplemental Brief and Appendix. (Third Request)(SC)22-05376
02/25/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellant shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file and serve the supplemental brief in compliance with this court's February 4, 2022, Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Respondent shall have 14 days from service of appellant's supplemental brief to file and serve its response. (SC)22-06224
04/08/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Document. To date appellant has not filed the supplemental brief or otherwise communicated with this court. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the supplemental brief. Respondent shall have 14 days from the date of service of the supplemental brief to file and serve a response. (SC)22-11102
04/12/2022BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 4/13/22) (SC)
04/13/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC)22-11612
04/18/2022BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 5/20/22) (SC)
05/02/2022BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief. (SC)22-13803
05/20/2022Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC)22-16101
05/20/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Docket No. 79715 is a direct appeal from a judgment of conviction in which appellant is represented by counsel. Docket No. 84293 is a pro se appeal from an order denying a postconviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Appellant, acting pro se, has filed a motion in Docket No. 84293 to consolidate the appeals. The appeals are in substantially different procedural postures and are not appropriate for consolidation. The motion is denied. Nos. 79715/84293. (SC)22-16126
05/27/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Third Motion for Extension of Time For Filing of Supplemental Brief. (SC)22-16962
05/27/2022BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Brief. (REJECTED PER ORDER FILED 5/31/22). (SC)
05/31/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall reject the supplemental brief filed on May 27, 2022. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a brief that contains a certificate indicating that the supplemental brief complies with the page/word limits applicable to reply briefs. (SC)22-17211
06/08/2022BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Brief. (SC)22-18281
06/08/2022MotionFiled Appellant's Fourth Motion for Extension of Time For Filing of Supplemental Brief. (SC)22-18285
06/13/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the supplemental brief ordered by this court is granted. The supplemental brief was filed on June 8, 2022. Respondent's response was filed on May 2, 2022. (SC)22-18734
08/04/2022Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Proposed amici Clark County Public Defender, Clark County Special Public Defender, and Nevada Attorneys for Criminal Justice have filed a motion for leave to file a brief of amici curiae in support of appellant's petition for en banc reconsideration. Respondent opposes the motion and proposed amici have filed a reply. Having considered the motion, opposition, and reply, the motion is denied. The clerk of this court shall strike the amicus brief filed on October 28, 2021. (SC)22-24437
08/04/2022Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." EN BANC Pickering, J., concurring. (SC)22-24438
08/30/2022RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)22-27126
08/30/2022Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed (SC)
09/15/2022RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 31, 2022. (SC)22-27126