Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/04/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
10/04/2019 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 19-41265
|
10/04/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 19-41269
|
10/10/2019 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Hurtik Law. Check no. 4998. (SC) | | |
10/10/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC) | | 19-42039
|
10/11/2019 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel (SC). | | 19-42187
|
10/30/2019 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 19-44702
|
10/31/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. | | 19-44853
|
11/07/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 10, 2019, at 2:00 pm. (SC). | | 19-45859
|
11/08/2019 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service (Docketing Statement - Settlement Judge). (SC) | | 19-45988
|
12/09/2019 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation. The settlement conference set for December 10, 2019, has been vacated. (SC). | | 19-49876
|
12/12/2019 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC). | | 19-50337
|
12/27/2019 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/08/19, 04/09/19, 04/10/19, 04/11/19, 06/19/19, 06/20/19 and 06/21/19. To Court Reporter: Valori Weber. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 12/30/19). (SC) | | |
12/30/2019 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (SC) | | 19-52309
|
01/02/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Request for Transcript (First Request). (DETACHED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST FORM AND RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 1/8/20). (SC) | | 20-00073
|
01/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Returning Transcript Request Form Unfiled. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve a transcript request form that fully complies with NRAP 9(a). (SC) | | 20-00927
|
01/15/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/08/19, 04/09/19, 04/10/19, 04/11/19, 06/19/19, 06/20/19 and 06/21/19. To Court Reporter: Court Reporter for Eighth Judicial District Court Department 15 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 01/16/20). (SC) | | |
01/16/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 20-02107
|
01/21/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/08/19, 04/09/19, 04/10/19, 04/11/19, 06/19/19, 06/20/19 and 06/21/19. To Court Reporter: Court Reporter Eighth Judicial District Court Department 15. (SC) | | 20-02885
|
02/18/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Matthew Yarbrough stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/08/19, 04/09/19, 04/10/19, 04/11/19, 06/19/19, 06/20/19 and 06/21/19. (SC) | | 20-06417
|
03/11/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 25, 2020. (SC). | | 20-09599
|
03/24/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule (Opening Brief). (SC) | | 20-11302
|
03/31/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 24, 2020. (SC). | | 20-12275
|
04/23/2020 | Motion | Filed Second Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule. (SC) | | 20-15483
|
04/29/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 8, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-16188
|
05/07/2020 | Motion | Filed Third Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule (Opening Brief). (SC) | | 20-17352
|
05/13/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until May 22, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-18241
|
05/22/2020 | Motion | Filed Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule. (SC). | | 20-19580
|
05/29/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule. (SC). | | 20-20406
|
06/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondents' Response in Limited Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule. (SC) | | 20-20922
|
06/04/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions. Appellant shall have until June 12, 2020, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-21070
|
06/16/2020 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal Pursuant to NRAP 31(d)(1). (SC) | | 20-22394
|
06/16/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Appeal Pursuant to NRAP 31(d)(1). (SC) | | 20-22451
|
06/19/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC). | | 20-22898
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1. (SC). | | 20-22899
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2. (SC). | | 20-22901
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3. (SC). | | 20-22902
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4. (SC). | | 20-22903
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5. (SC). | | 20-22905
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6. (SC). | | 20-22906
|
06/19/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 7. (SC). | | 20-22907
|
07/08/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. The motion to dismiss is denied. Respondents shall have until July 20, 2020, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC) | | 20-25206
|
07/17/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-26273
|
07/17/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC) | | 20-26274
|
08/20/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (REJECTED PER 08/21/20 NOTICE). (SC). | | |
08/21/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. (Reply Brief). (SC). | | 20-30882
|
08/22/2020 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule. (SC) | | 20-30972
|
08/25/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief is granted to the following extent. Appellant's reply brief due: August 28, 2020. (SC) | | 20-31341
|
08/25/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC). | | 20-31411
|
08/26/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC). | | |
03/03/2021 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP21 - EC/KP/DH (SC) | | 21-06238
|
03/29/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 21-08861
|
03/29/2021 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
04/09/2021 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 31, 2021. (SC) | | 21-08861
|