Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/07/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. (SC) | | |
02/07/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SC) | | 20-05309
|
02/07/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. (SC) | | 20-05311
|
02/10/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Document - Confidential Civil Cover Sheet. (SC) | | |
02/11/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Mills & Mills Law Group, LLC. Check no. 2187. (SC) | | |
02/11/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kristine M. Kuzemka. (SC) | | 20-05756
|
02/24/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement (REJECTED PER 02/25/20 NOTICE). | | |
02/25/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document (Docketing Statement). (SC). | | 20-07538
|
02/25/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC). | | 20-07628
|
03/03/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Respondent's Response to Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-08439
|
03/20/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 25, 2020, at 1:00 PM. (SC) | | 20-11006
|
03/25/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 20-11533
|
04/01/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC). | | 20-12472
|
04/13/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 4/13/20). (SC) | | |
04/13/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 20-13946
|
04/14/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. REJECTED PER 4/14/20 NOTICE). (SC) | | |
04/14/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Transcript Request. (SC) | | 20-14099
|
04/29/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts:11/27/18. (SC) | | 20-16232
|
05/14/2020 | Transcript | Filed Appellant's Certificate of Service - Transcript Re: All Pending Motions. (SC) | | 20-18429
|
05/15/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/23/19, 5/2/19, 5/22/19, 7/18/19, 10/11/19, 10/21/19 To Court Reporter: None listed. (SC) | | 20-18558
|
05/22/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/23/19, 5/2/19, 5/22/19, 7/18/19, 10/11/19, 10/21/19. (SC) | | 20-19653
|
05/26/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Confidential Civil Cover Sheet. (SC) | | |
06/30/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 20-24212
|
06/30/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1 (REJECTED PER 7/1/20 NOTICE). (SC) | | |
06/30/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2 (REJECTED PER 7/1/20 NOTICE). (SC) | | |
07/01/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Appendix to Opening Brief. Corrected appendix due: 5 days. (SC) | | 20-24327
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume I (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL). (SC) | | |
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VII (REJECTED PER PHONE CALL). (SC) | | |
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume I. (SC) | | 20-24821
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume II. (SC) | | 20-24823
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume II (DUPLICATE). (SC) | | |
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume III. (SC) | | 20-24826
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume IV. (SC) | | 20-24827
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume V. (SC) | | 20-24829
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VI. (SC) | | 20-24830
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VII. (SC) | | 20-24831
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume VIII. (SC) | | 20-24832
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume IX. (SC) | | 20-24834
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume X. (SC) | | 20-24835
|
07/06/2020 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Volume XI. (SC) | | 20-24837
|
07/28/2020 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: August 13, 2020. (SC) | | 20-27434
|
08/13/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 8/13/20) | | |
08/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol VI - X. (SC) | | 20-29941
|
08/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol XVI. (SC) | | 20-29946
|
08/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol XI-XV. (SC) | | 20-29947
|
08/13/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (SC) | | 20-29977
|
08/13/2020 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief Vol I - Vol V (SC) | | 20-30006
|
08/14/2020 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 20-30177
|
09/09/2020 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC) | | 20-33174
|
09/09/2020 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
10/28/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | 20-39522
|
10/28/2020 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
09/30/2021 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. Author: Bulla, J. Majority: Gibbons/Tao/Bulla. 137 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 60. Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB. (SC). | | |
10/26/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
10/26/2021 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 21-30834
|
10/26/2021 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC) | | |
11/04/2021 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 28, 2021. (SC) | | 21-30834
|