Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/14/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
08/14/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
08/14/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-30189
|
08/26/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Lindsey Licari. Check no. 5811. (SC) | | |
08/27/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Regarding Deadlines. (SC) | | 20-31727
|
09/01/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Stay of Execution of Divorce Decree. (SC) | | 20-32225
|
09/01/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Notice - Copy of Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on 8/5/20. (SC) | | 20-32234
|
09/04/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Certificate of Mailing (Notice of Appeal and Transcript Request). (SC) | | 20-32757
|
09/11/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Transmission of Record and Denying Motion for Stay. Record due: 30 days. Appellant has filed a motion for a stay of execution of the divorce decree appealed from. It appears from a review of the district court docket entries that appellant filed a motion for a stay in the district court on June 2, 2020, and the district court has not yet ruled on the motion. Accordingly, the motion is denied without prejudice. (SC) | | 20-33607
|
09/21/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal - Volumes 4-19 (SEALED). (SC) | | |
09/22/2020 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal SEALED Volumes 1 - 3. (SC) | | |
09/23/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Certificate of Mailing. (SC) | | 20-35068
|
09/25/2020 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Letter Regarding Removal from Rena Hughes Court with Attachments. (RETURNED UNFILED PER 10/2/20 ORDER). (SC) | | 20-35381
|
09/29/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Certificate of Mailing (Letter to Supreme Court). (SC) | | 20-35663
|
10/01/2020 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Maria Balagtas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/7/2020 and 2/12/2020. (SC) | | 20-36112
|
10/02/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This court takes no action regarding appellant's motion to remove her case from the district court. The clerk of this court shall return appellant's "Motion to Dismiss Due to Fraud on the Court" unfiled. (SC) | | 20-36272
|
10/26/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (SC) | | 20-39168
|
11/03/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion for Stay Form for Parties Without Attorneys. (SC) | | 20-40068
|
11/03/2020 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief. (SC) | | 20-40069
|
11/10/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed, in pro se, a second motion for stay pending appeal. The motion is denied without prejudice. (SC) | | 20-41096
|
11/17/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's "Motion to Extend Time to Submit Full Briefing Motion in Lieu of Fasttrack Statement." (SC) | | 20-41990
|
11/17/2020 | Transcript | Filed SEALED Transcripts of Proceedings: 02/07/2020 and 02/12/2020. (SC) | | |
11/17/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Receipt of Copy of Transcripts with a copy of Transcript Video Services Certification of Transcripts/Notification of Completion. (SC) | | 20-41994
|
11/18/2020 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/7/20 and 2/12/20. To Court Reporter: Tiffany Skaggs. (SC) | | 20-42135
|
11/18/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days - Appellant's Transcript Request Form. (SC) | | 20-42137
|
11/19/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Plaintiff's Motion for Leave of the Court for Full Briefing and Removal From the Fast Track Program. (SC) | | 20-42330
|
11/19/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant's motion to "Extend Time to Submit Full Briefing Motion in Lieu of Fasttrack [sic] Statement" is denied. (SC) | | 20-42389
|
11/20/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Emergency Motion and Request for Injunction. Action needed by 11/24/2020. (SC) | | 20-42488
|
11/20/2020 | Appendix | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Appendix for Emergency Motion and Request for Injunction. Action needed by 11/24/2020. (SC) | | 20-42490
|
11/25/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Stay Form for Parties Without Attorneys. (SC) | | 20-43162
|
11/30/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motions. Appellant has filed an "Emergency Motion and Request for Injunction. Action needed by 11/24/2020." The motion is denied. Appellant's motion "for Leave of the Court for Full Briefing and Removal From the Fast Track Program" is denied. (SC) | | 20-43225
|
12/04/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Emergency Motion Pursuant to NRAP 27E to Recuse Grayson Moulton. Action needed by 12.10.2020. (SC) | | 20-44060
|
12/04/2020 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Appellants Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus Pursuant to 18 USC S 3771 and Appellants Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to 18 USC S 2263 and Appellant's Motion for Protection Order and Appellants Motion to Unseal D-18-573154-D. Action Needed by 12/10/2020. (SC) | | 20-44061
|
12/04/2020 | Appendix | Filed Proper Person Appellant's Appendix For: Appellants Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus Pursuant to 18 USC S 3771 and Appellants Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to 18 USC S 2263 and Appellant's Motion for Protection Order and Appellants Motion to Unseal D-18-573154-D. Action Needed by 12/10/2020. (SC) | | 20-44065
|
12/23/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Stay. Appellant has filed a second motion for a stay of the divorce decree and of any sale of the martial property pending resolution of this appeal. The motion is granted. fn1[Appellant's emergency motion to recuse respondent's counsel Grayson Moulton and emergency petition for writ of mandamus are denied. To the extent appellant seeks a stay in those documents, the request is moot in light of this order, and to the extent those documents seek relief directed to persons and entities not before this court or argue the merits of this appeal, they are improperly sought by motion.] (SC) | | 20-46320
|
02/08/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision/To Screening. (SC) | | |
03/16/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | 21-07535
|
03/16/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. (SC). | | |
09/28/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Partially Lift Stay (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/29/21) (TRANSFERRED TO COURT OF APPEALS). (SC) | | 21-27937
|
10/25/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent's Certificate of Service. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON 10/26/21) Nos. 81635/82166 (SC) | | |
10/26/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Nos. 81635/82166 (SC) | | 21-30798
|
03/28/2022 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's decree of divorce in this case, and because, as noted above, Lindsey made no arguments pertaining to the denial of her post-judgment motions for relief, we likewise affirm the district court's denial of those motions." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB Nos. 81635/82166. (SC) | | |
04/22/2022 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. Nos. 81635/82166. (SC) | | |
04/22/2022 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Nos. 81635/82166. (SC) | | 22-12736
|
04/22/2022 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 81635/82166. (SC) | | |
05/20/2022 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 25, 2022. Nos. 81635/82166. (SC) | | 22-12736
|