Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/21/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
09/21/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED) (SC) | | |
09/21/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-34598
|
09/21/2020 | Filing Fee | E-Payment $250.00 from Kathleen A. Wilde. (SC) | | |
09/22/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 20-34847
|
09/23/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (SC). | | 20-34979
|
10/13/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-37615
|
10/15/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for November 3, 2020, at 10:00 am. (SC). | | 20-37934
|
11/10/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 20-41194
|
11/17/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-41799
|
11/25/2020 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Request for Transcripts. Transcripts requested: 06/02/15, 10/28/15, 09/22/16, 01/12/17, 06/16/20. Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. (SC). | | 20-43027
|
02/12/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendices. (First Request)(SC) | | 21-04344
|
02/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until April 16, 2021, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-05769
|
03/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Case Nos. 81810 and 82517. (SC) | | 21-08868
|
04/02/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's response to appellant's motion to consolidate case nos. 82517 and 81810 due: April 19, 2021. (SC) | | 21-09620
|
04/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Stay Briefing, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-10252
|
04/19/2021 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/3/20, 1/12/21. (SC) | | 21-11254
|
04/19/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Response to Motion to Consolidate Appeals. (SC) | | 21-11304
|
04/23/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, Granting Motions to Consolidate, and Granting Motions for Extension of Time. Respondent has filed a motion to dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 82517 for lack of jurisdiction. The motion to dismiss is denied. Appellant's motions to consolidate these appeals are granted. These appeals are hereby consolidated. Appellant's motions to stay briefing, or for an extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix are granted to the following extent. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single appendix and a single opening brief that raises all issues in these appeals. Nos 81810/82517(SC) | | 21-11756
|
05/24/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 21-14749
|
05/24/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to File Appellant's Appendix, Volumes 2-5, Under Seal. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 21-14750
|
05/24/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 21-14865
|
05/24/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 21-14866
|
06/04/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file under seal the appendix volumes 2-5 received on May 26, 2021. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 21-16078
|
06/04/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's (SEALED) Appendix Vols. 2-5. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | |
06/18/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's answering brief due: July 7, 2021. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 21-17578
|
07/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 21-19497
|
07/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 2. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 21-19498
|
07/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 3. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 21-19499
|
07/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 4. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 21-19500
|
07/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 5. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 21-19501
|
07/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 6. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 21-19502
|
07/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 7. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 21-19503
|
07/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 8. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 21-19504
|
07/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 9. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 21-19505
|
07/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 10. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 21-19507
|
07/07/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 11. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 21-19508
|
07/07/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 21-19513
|
07/08/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: July 9, 2021. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 21-19653
|
07/09/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 21-19837
|
08/09/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief (First Request). Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 21-23016
|
08/09/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: September 8, 2021. (SC) | | 21-23088
|
09/07/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Election Not to File a Reply Brief. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 21-25948
|
09/08/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | |
09/29/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC). | | 21-28026
|
09/29/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred to Court of Appeals. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC). | | |
11/17/2021 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Court of Appeals-MG/JT/BB Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | |
12/03/2021 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Review. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 21-34550
|
12/14/2021 | Case Status Update | Transferred from Court of Appeals. (SC) | | |
12/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Review. Appellant's answer due: 14 days. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 21-35880
|
12/21/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice regarding notice of intent to file Amicus. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 21-36444
|
12/29/2021 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Answer to Petition for Review due: January 13, 2022. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 21-37051
|
01/14/2022 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time File Answer to Petition for Review. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 22-01481
|
01/24/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Answer to Petition for Review due: January 27, 2022. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 22-02396
|
01/28/2022 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Answer to Petition for Review. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 22-02857
|
02/14/2022 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Granting Petition for Review, Directing Supplemental Briefing and Inviting Amicus Curiae. Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief due: 21 days. Respondent shall file and serve a supplemental answering brief within 21 days after service of appellant's brief. Appellant shall then have 14 days after service of respondent's supplemental answering brief to file and serve any supplemental reply brief. Both parties shall serve their briefs on the State Bar's Family Law Section. Should the Family Law Section or any other amicus consent to participate as amicus curiae, its amicus brief must be filed within 7 days of the date of brief of the party whose position they are supporting is filed and comply with the requirements of NRAP 29. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 22-04961
|
03/04/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief due: March 21, 2022. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 22-07023
|
03/14/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 22-07968
|
03/21/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 22-08909
|
03/22/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Amended Certificate of Service for Appellant's Supplemental Opening Brief. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 22-09005
|
03/28/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 22-09619
|
03/29/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Adjust Due Date to File Supplemental Answering Brief. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 22-09756
|
03/31/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On March 21, 2022, appellant filed a brief in which counsel indicated an intent to submit this matter on the opening brief and record previously filed. The Family Law Section of the State Bar of Nevada and Trinity Advocates have filed motions for an extension of time to file amicus curiae briefs. Any amicus brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. Respondent shall have 44 days from the date of this order to file the supplemental answering brief. Because appellant did not file a supplemental opening brief, no reply brief is permitted. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 22-10054
|
04/14/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance for Amicus Curiae (The American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyer). Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 22-11892
|
04/15/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion for Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae (The American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyer). Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 22-11932
|
05/02/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Amicus Curiae Brief (Trinity Advocates). Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 22-13859
|
05/02/2022 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers Amicus Curiae in Support of Reversal of the Court of Appeals Decision. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 22-13933
|
05/02/2022 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers Amicus Curiae in Support of Reversal of the Court of Appeals Decision. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 22-13942
|
05/02/2022 | Brief | Filed Joinder to Brief Family Law Section of the State Bar of Nevada's Joinder in the American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers' Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Reversal of the Court of Appeals Decision. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 22-13945
|
05/11/2022 | Brief | Filed Amicus Brief American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers Amicus Curiae in Support of Reversal of the Court of Appeals Decision. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 22-15013
|
05/16/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Answering Brief. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 22-15516
|
05/20/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyer National has filed a motion for leave to file an amicus brief. The motion for leave to file an amicus brief is granted. The amicus brief was filed on May 2, 2022. Proposed amicus curiae the Family Law Section of the State Bar of Nevada has filed a joinder to the AAML's amicus brief. Cause appearing, the joinder is approved. Trinity Advocates has filed a second motion for an extension of time, until May 9, 2022, to file its amicus brief. To date, Trinity Advocates has not submitted a proposed amicus brief for filing. Accordingly, the motion is denied. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 22-16134
|
08/08/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument on September 8, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 22-24759
|
08/25/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Oral Argument Reminder Notice | | 22-26559
|
09/08/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. (SC) | | |
12/01/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. Cadish, J., with whom Pickering, J., agrees, concurring. fn1 [The Honorable Abbi Silver having retired, this matter was decided by a six-justice court.] 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 78. En Banc. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC). | | 22-37742
|
12/16/2022 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's petition for rehearing due: January 3, 2023. (SC) | | 22-39585
|
01/03/2023 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 23-00110
|
01/04/2023 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing and Request for Issuance of Remittitur. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 23-00220
|
01/10/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC). | | 23-00835
|
01/27/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's petition for rehearing due: February 2, 2023. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 23-02645
|
02/02/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC). | | 23-03316
|
02/02/2023 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Chad F. Clement. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC). | | |
02/14/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Rehearing. Answer due: 14 days. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 23-04447
|
02/27/2023 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 23-05981
|
03/30/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC) | | 23-09746
|
04/17/2023 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Cadish and Pickering, JJ,. dissenting - EN BANC. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 23-11641
|
05/12/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Stay of Remittitur Pending Petition for Writ of Certiorari. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 23-15010
|
05/12/2023 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Response to Motion for Stay of Remittitur Pending Petition for Writ of Certiorari. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 23-15100
|
05/19/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion for Stay of Remittitur Pending Petition for Writ of Certiorari. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 23-15969
|
06/01/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Stay of Remittitur. The motion for a stay is granted to the following extent. Issuance of the remittitur shall be stayed until September 11, 2023. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by September 11, 2023, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall remain in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by September 11, 2023, the clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur. Appellant shall continue to comply with the December 31, 2020, order. Nos. 81810/82517 (SC) | | 23-17233
|
09/18/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER 10/23/23 ORDER). (SC) | | 23-30391
|
09/18/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. (REMITTITUR RECALLED PER 10/23/23 ORDER). (SC) | | |
09/27/2023 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Erich Martin's Emergency Motion to Recall Remittur and Reinstate and Continue Stay Pending Petition for Writ of Certiorari Proceedings Under NRAP 27(e)
Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 23-31724
|
10/02/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on 09/20/23. (SC) | | 23-30391
|
10/04/2023 | Motion | Filed Motion Supplement to Appellant Erich Martin's Emergency Motion to Recall Remittitur and Reinstate and Continue Stay Pending Petition for Writ of Certiorari Proceedings Under NRAP 27(e)Nos.81810/82517(SC) | | 23-32518
|
10/11/2023 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court. (Motion for leave to proceed as a veteran is denied.) (SC) | | 23-33241
|
10/23/2023 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant filed a motion to recall the remittitur and extend the stay on September 27, 2023, seeking relief by September 29, 2023. On October 4, 2023, appellant filed a supplement to the emergency motion to recall remittitur and extend stay. The motion to recall the remittitur is granted to the following extent. The remittitur issued on September 18, 2023, is recalled and this appeal is reinstated. Issuance of the remittitur shall be stayed until December 18, 2023. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by December 18, 2023, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. Id. If such notice is not received by December 18, 2023, the remittitur shall issue. Appellant shall continue to comply with the December 31, 2020, district court order. Nos. 81810/82517. (SC) | | 23-34405
|