Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/30/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due for Appeal. (SC) | | |
09/30/2020 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SC) | | 20-35851
|
09/30/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (SC) | | 20-35855
|
10/06/2020 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Key Insurance Company. Check no. 176734. (SC) | | |
10/06/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 21 days. (SC). | | 20-36657
|
10/06/2020 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel. (SC). | | 20-36701
|
10/27/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Civil Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-39311
|
10/27/2020 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge for the Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-39321
|
10/27/2020 | Docketing Statement | Filed Appellant's Proof of Service on Settlement Judge for Docketing Statement. (SC) | | 20-39357
|
11/03/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 16, 2020, at 2:00 pm. (SC). | | 20-40073
|
12/19/2020 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. (SC) | | 20-45930
|
12/22/2020 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 14 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 20-46221
|
12/28/2020 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. The deadlines for filing documents in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Respondent may file any reply within 14 days from the date that appellant's response is served. (SC) | | 20-46639
|
01/27/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Memorandum in Response to Order to Show Cause. (SC) | | 21-02546
|
02/12/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant: Transcript Request Form due: 14 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. (SC) | | 21-04324
|
03/22/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Firm Name (Erich N. Storm, Esq. is no longer with Storm Legal Group, now know as Desert Ridge Legal Group). (SC) | | 21-08123
|
03/22/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Ryan M. Venci, Danielle A. Kolkoski, Robert L. Thompson and Israel P. Whitbeck of Desert Ridge Legal Group (formerly known as Storm Legal Group as counsel for Appellant). (SC) | | 21-08127
|
03/25/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Transcript Request Form, Opening Brief, and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-08593
|
03/26/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Attorneys Ryan M. Venci, Danielle A. Kolkoski, Robert L. Thompson, and Israel P. Whitbeck of Desert Ridge Legal Group have filed a notice of appearance as counsel for appellant. The clerk shall add these attorneys to this court's docket as appellant's counsel. The notice further informs this court that the firm Storm Legal Group has changed its name to Desert Ridge Legal Group and that attorney Erich N. Storm has left the firm and will no longer represent appellant. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall remove Mr. Storm from the docket. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the transcript request form and opening brief and appendix is granted as follows. Transcript request form due: 7 days. Opening brief and appendix due: May 13, 2021. (SC) | | 21-08776
|
06/09/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to File Documents. The transcript request form was due by April 2, 2021, and the opening brief and appendix were due to be filed by May 13, 2021. To date, appellant has not filed either document. Appellant shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve the transcript request form and opening brief and appendix. (SC) | | 21-16520
|
07/30/2021 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Thomas A. Larmore and Disassociation of Israel P. Whitbeck. (SC) | | 21-22187
|
07/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to Filed Transcript Request Form, Opening Brief, and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-22197
|
07/30/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Extend Time to File Transcript Request Form, Opening Brief, and Appendix. (SC) | | 21-22234
|
08/16/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion and Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Counsel for appellant shall, within 14 days from the date of this order, pay the sum of $500 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of such payment. However, these sanctions shall be automatically vacated if appellant files and serves the transcript request form and the opening brief and appendix within 7 days from the date of this order. (SC) | | 21-23719
|
08/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief. Vol. 1. (SC) | | 21-24595
|
08/23/2021 | Transcript | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. (SC) | | 21-24599
|
08/23/2021 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC) | | 21-24602
|
09/23/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/23/21). (SC) | | |
09/23/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1 (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED 09/23/21). (SC) | | |
09/23/2021 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Respondent's Answering Brief and Appendix - Volume 1. (SC) | | 21-27541
|
09/29/2021 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-27994
|
09/29/2021 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC) | | 21-27995
|
09/29/2021 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix to Answering Brief. Vol. 1 (SC) | | 21-27998
|
10/01/2021 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. NRAP 31(b)(3)(B). The answering brief and appendix were filed on September 29, 2021. Appellant shall have until November 1, 2021, to file and serve a reply brief if deemed necessary. (SC) | | 21-28195
|
11/16/2021 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. (SC) | | |
03/09/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for April 14, 2022, at 1:00 p.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-07547
|
03/10/2022 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion for Continuance of Oral Argument. (SC) | | 22-07665
|
03/23/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Continue Oral Argument. Cause appearing, we grant respondent's March 10, 2022, motion to continue the oral argument of this matter. We hereby vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for April 14, 2022, at 1:00 p.m., and direct the clerk of this court to reschedule this appeal for oral argument before the Southern Nevada Panel on September 14, 2022, in Las Vegas. (SC) | | 22-09103
|
07/12/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Rescheduling Oral Argument. Pursuant to this court's March 23, 2022, order, oral argument is rescheduled in this appeal for September 14, 2022, at 11:00 a.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC) | | 22-21805
|
07/12/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Notice of Appearance for Martina L. Jaccarino, Thomas A. Larmore is no long with Desert Ridge Legal Group. (SC) | | 22-21860
|
07/13/2022 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant's Proof of Service for Notice of Appearance. (SC) | | 22-22025
|
08/31/2022 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC) | | 22-27379
|
09/14/2022 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/DH. (SC). | | |
11/03/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Each party shall have until November 14, 2022, to file a supplemental brief addressing this issue. The supplemental brief shall not exceed 10 pages or 4,667 words and shall otherwise comply with the provisions of NRAP 32. No extensions of time will be granted. (SC) | | 22-34579
|
11/14/2022 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Brief. (SC) | | 22-35677
|
11/15/2022 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Briefing. (SC) | | 22-35957
|
11/16/2022 | Motion | Filed Motion to Submit Late Respondent's Supplemental Briefing. (SC) | | 22-36041
|
11/17/2022 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent filed an untimely motion for an extension of time to file a supplemental brief. Having considered the motion and despite its untimeliness, we grant it. Respondent's supplemental brief was filed on November 15, 2022. (SC) | | 22-36128
|
12/22/2022 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Herndon. 138 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 83. SNP22-JH/LS/DH. (SC). | | 22-40136
|
01/17/2023 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. (SC) | | 23-01434
|
01/17/2023 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.(SC). | | |
01/27/2023 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court County Clerk on January 18, 2022. (SC) | | 23-01434
|